Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "J67" Class 0-6-0T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR DP (Dept) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
327 7327 8490 68490 03/1890 05/1958 05/1950
to J69
Kings Lynn 68.17 68.30
328 7328 8491 68491 03/1890 06/1958 02/1917
to J69
Leicester (G.C.) 68.25 68.46
329 7329 8492 68492 03/1890 06/1956 St Margarets 66.25 66.46
330 7330 8493 68493 03/1890 10/1954 Kings Lynn 64.58 65.46
331 7331 8494 68494 03/1890 04/1958 07/1945
to J69
Kings Lynn 68.08 68.46
332 7332 8495 68495 04/1890 05/1958 12/1940
to J69
Norwich Thorpe 68.08 68.38
333 7333 04/1890 09/1939 49.42
334 7334 8496 68496 04/1890 05/1956 Stratford 66.08
335 7335 8497 68497 04/1890 09/1960 02/1917
to J69
Bury St Edmunds 70.42 70.55
336 7336 8498 68498 44 04/1890 08/1959 08/1951
to J69
Ipswich 69.33 72.80
337 7337 8499 68499 04/1890 16/09/1962 07/1904
to J69
Carlisle Upperby 72.42 71.21
338 7338 8500 68500 05/1890 01/1961 12/1909
to J69
Stratford 70.67 70.30
339 7339 8501 68501 05/1890 08/1960 10/1904
to J69
Norwich Thorpe 70.25 70.80
340 7340 8502 68502 05/1890 02/1961 12/1903
to J69
Kings Lynn 70.75
341 7341 8503 68503 05/1890 01/1957 09/1902
to J69
Parkhead 66.67
342 7342 8504 68504 05/1890 01/1956 09/1902
to J69
Thornton Junction 65.67
343 7343 8505 68505 05/1890 11/1953 08/1903
to J69
St Margarets 63.5
344 7344 8506 05/1890 10/1940 10/1913
to J69
50.42 70.13
345 7345 8507 68507 05/1890 06/1960 09/1903
to J69
Stratford 70.08 70.80
346 7346 8508 68508 05/1890 02/1961 01/1904
to J69
Stratford 70.75 69.38
397 7397 8509 68509 11/1890 03/1954 Stratford 63.33
398 7398 8510 68510 11/1890 09/1959 03/1950
to J69
Ipswich 68.83 68.96
399 7399 8511 68511 11/1890 12/1956 St Margarets 66.08
400 7400 8512 68512 11/1890 04/1957 02/1951
to J69
Hitchin (GNR) 66.42 66.54
401 7401 8513 68513 11/1890 10/1960 06/1952
to J69
Stratford 69.92 70.63
402 7402 11/1890 05/1937 46.5
403 7403 8514 68514 12/1890 07/1955 Kings Lynn 64.58
404 7404 12/1890 05/1937 46.42
405 7405 8515 68515 12/1890 01/1957 Kings Lynn 66.08 66.21
406 7406 12/1890 07/1937 46.58
11 7011 8516 68516 12/1890 04/1957 Cambridge 66.33 66.54
408 7012 8517 68517 12/1890 03/1956 Cambridge 65.25 65.54
13 7013 8518 68518 12/1890 02/1958 Ipswich 67.17 67.29
14 7014 8519 68519 01/1891 08/1958 04/1950
to J69
Parkeston Quay 67.58 67.71
15 7015 8520 68520 01/1891 08/1959 02/1950
to J69
Stratford 68.58 68.71
16 7016 8521 68521 01/1891 08/1956 Parkeston Quay 65.58
17 7017 01/1891 06/1937 46.42
18 7018 8522 68522 01/1891 03/1961 03/1950
to J69
Stratford 70.17 70.29
19 7019 8523 68523 01/1891 12/1955 Stratford 64.92
20 7020 01/1891 06/1937 46.42
347 7347 8524 68524 02/1892 06/1959 01/1905
to J69
Polmont 67.33
348 7348 8525 68525 02/1892 12/1953 12/1903
to J69
St Margarets 61.83 68.88
349 7349 8526 68526 03/1892 10/1960 05/1904
to J69
Stratford 68.58 66.46
350 7350 8527 68527 03/1892 06/1958 12/1909
to J69
Colwick 66.25 67.71
351 7351 8528 68528 03/1892 10/1959 12/1903
to J69
Boston 67.58 66.79
352 7352 8529 68529 03/1892 08/1958 08/1906
to J69
Lincoln 66.42 68.97
353 7353 8530 68530 03/1892 02/1961 01/1905
to J69
Cambridge 68.92
354 7354 8531 68531 03/1892 08/10/1955 10/1903
to J69
Wrexham Rhosddu 63.58 67.46
335 7335 8532 68532 43 03/1892 12/1958 05/1904
to J69
Stratford 66.75 70.55
356 7356 8533 68533 03/1892 07/1953 10/1911
to J69
Polmont 61.33 61.46
357 7357 8534 68534 04/1892 08/1954 11/1904
to J69
Stratford 62.33 62.54
358 7358 8535 68535 04/1892 08/1959 12/1904
to J69
Thornton Junction 67.33 67.79
359 7359 8536 68536 04/1892 02/1958 06/1904
to J69
Cambridge 65.83 66.04
360 7360 8537 68537 04/1892 06/1958 10/1903
to J69
Lincoln 66.17 66.38
361 7361 8538 68538 04/1892 09/1961 09/1906
to J69
Stratford 69.42 69.55
362 7362 8539 04/1892 10/1940 03/1917
to J69
48.5
363 7363 8540 68540 05/1892 01/1956 Trafford Park (LMS) 63.67
364 7364 05/1892 01/1931 05/1919
to J69
38.67 38.78
365 7365 8541 68541 05/1892 08/1958 11/1904
to J69
Hitchin (GNR) 66.25 66.80
366 7366 8542 68542 05/1892 16/09/1962 09/1905
to J69
Bishops Stortford 70.33 70.63
367 7367 8543 68543 45 04/1894 11/1959 07/1904
to J69
Boston 65.58 68.46
368 7368 8544 68544 04/1894 01/1955 10/1906
to J69
Polmont 60.75
369 7369 8545 68545 04/1894 02/1961 11/1904
to J69
Stratford 66.83 66.88
370 7370 8546 68546 05/1894 05/1958 12/1904
to J69
New England 64 64.29
371 7371 8547 68547 05/1894 04/1956 02/1907
to J69
Upminster 61.92
372 7372 8548 68548 05/1894 11/1953 12/1904
to J69
Stratford 59.5
373 7373 8549 68549 05/1894 11/02/1962 11/1906
to J69
Stratford 67.75 67.80
374 7374 8550 68550 06/1894 07/1961 12/1904
to J69
Thornton Junction 67.08 67.13
375 7375 8551 68551 06/1894 06/1957 11/1904
to J69
Eastfield 63 63.12
376 7376 8552 68552 06/1894 09/1961 07/1906
to J69
Eastfield 67.25 67.38
377 7377 8553 68553 10/1895 12/1958 08/1946
to J69
Lincoln 63.17 63.29
378 7378 8554 68554 10/1895 07/1961 07/1904
to J69
Stratford 65.75 65.79
379 7379 8555 68555 10/1895 05/1958 01/2019
to J69
Thornton Junction 62.58 62.87
380 7380 8556 68556 10/1895 16/09/1962 07/1904
to J69
Stratford 66.92 67.21
381 7381 8557 68557 10/1895 10/1959 11/1907
to J69
Stratford 64 64.13
382 7382 8558 68558 11/1895 01/1961 08/1946
to J69
Lincoln 65.17 65.21
383 7383 8559 68559 11/1895 04/1956 07/1904
to J69
Upminster 60.42 60.62
384 7384 8560 68560 11/1895 01/1961 11/1945
to J69
Boston 65.17 65.21
385 7385 8561 68561 11/1895 07/1958 10/1907
to J69
Stratford 62.67 63.12
386 7386 8562 68562 12/1895 08/1956 02/1904
to J69
St Margarets 60.67
387 7387 8563 68563 12/1895 10/1960 02/1906
to J69
Stratford 64.83 64.96
388 7388 8564 12/1895 10/1940 12/1904
to J69
44.83 62.13
389 7389 8565 68565 12/1895 06/08/1962 09/1904
to J69
Hatfield 66.67 66.79
390 7390 8566 68566 12/1895 09/1962 09/1905
to J69
South Lynn 66.75 67.13
391 7391 8567 68567 01/1896 08/1957 05/1913
to J69
Parkhead 61.58 61.71
392 7392 8568 68568 01/1896 05/1958 09/1904
to J69
St Margarets 62.33 62.45
393 7393 8569 68569 01/1896 06/1960 08/1906
to J69
Stratford 64.42 64.54
394 7394 8570 68570 01/1896 09/1961 08/1909
to J69
Melton Constable 65.67 65.71
395 7395 8571 68571 02/1896 12/1960 11/1910
to J69
Parkeston Quay 64.83 65.37
396 7396 8572 68572 02/1896 29/11/1954 Hatfield 58.75 59.45
265 7265 8573 68573 04/1896 08/1960 12/1908
to J69
Stratford 64.33 64.54
266 7266 8574 68574 04/1896 01/1959 12/1907
to J69
Stratford 62.75 63.04
267 7267 8575 68575 04/1896 10/1960 05/1912
to J69
Stratford 64.5 64.54
268 7268 8576 68576 04/1896 03/1958 12/1910
to J69
Stratford 61.92 62.04
269 7269 8577 68577 05/1896 10/11/1960 02/1912
to J69
Stratford 64.5 64.55
270 7270 8578 68578 05/1896 01/1961 04/1910
to J69
Stratford 64.67 65.13
271 7271 8579 68579 05/1896 01/1960 11/1908
to J69
Bury St Edmunds 63.67 63.79
272 7272 8580 06/1896 10/1940 02/1908
to J69
44.33
273 7273 8581 68581 06/1896 09/1959 01/1908
to J69
Boston 63.25 63.37
274 7274 8582 06/1896 10/1940 03/1908
to J69
44.33
255 7255 03/1899 05/1937 38.17
256 7256 8583 68583 03/1899 04/1958 Cambridge 59.08 59.37
257 7257 8584 68584 03/1899 08/1955 Walton on the Hill 56.42
258 7258 8585 68585 03/1899 06/1958 09/1947
to J69
Trafford Park (LMS) 59.25 59.37
259 7259 03/1899 05/1937 38.17
260 7260 8586 68586 03/1899 05/1956 Norwich Thorpe 57.17
261 7261 8587 68587 04/1899 10/1959 06/1946
to J69
Lincoln 60.5 60.62
262 7262 8588 68588 04/1899 05/1958 06/1953
to J69
New England 59.08 59.21
263 7263 8589 68589 04/1899 01/1956 Stratford 56.75
264 7264 8590 68590 04/1899 29/09/1955 Stratford 56.42
199 7199 12/1899 07/1937 37.58
200 7200 8606 68606 12/1899 03/1955 Stratford 55.25 55.62
201 7201 12/1899 07/1937 37.58
202 7202 12/1899 07/1937 37.58
203 7203 8591 68591 12/1899 01/1960 11/1948
to J69
Stratford 60.08 61.62
204 7204 8592 68592 12/1899 07/1955 Stratford 55.58
205 7205 12/1899 05/1937 37.42
206 7206 8593 68593 12/1899 01/1958 Stratford 58.08 58.37
207 7207 8594 68594 01/1900 11/1955 Stratford 55.83
208 7208 8595 68595 01/1900 01/1957 Norwich Thorpe 57
305 7305 8596 68596 06/1900 11/1959 09/1910
to J69
Parkeston Quay 59.42 59.46
190 7190 8597 68597 07/1900 10/1955 South Lynn 55.25
191 7191 8598 68598 07/1900 05/1957 04/1913
to J69
Gorton 56.83 56.96
192 7192 8599 68599 07/1900 11/1959 12/1911
to J69
Lincoln 59.33 59.38
193 7193 8600 68600 07/1900 16/09/1962 07/1914
to J69
Kings Lynn 62.17
194 7194 8601 68601 07/1900 10/1959 04/1915
to J69
Stratford 59.25 62.46
195 7195 8602 68602 07/1900 10/1959 10/1913
to J69
Lowestoft 59.25 59.38
196 7196 8603 68603 08/1900 03/1958 12/1916
to J69
Norwich Thorpe 57.58 57.70
197 7197 8604 08/1900 10/1940 03/1912
to J69
40.17
198 7198 8605 68605 08/1900 07/1958 10/1916
to J69
Hitchin (GNR) 57.92 58.46
160 7160 8607 68607 06/1901 05/1958 04/1913
to J69
Stratford 56.92 57.21
161 7161 8608 68608 06/1901 10/1958 Stratford 57.33 57.54
162 7162 8609 68609 06/1901 16/09/1962 06/1952
to J69
Cambridge 61.25 61.38
163 7163 8610 68610 06/1901 01/1957 12/1921
to J69
Lincoln 55.58 55.71
164 7164 8611 68611 06/1901 07/1955 Lowestoft 54.08 54.20
165 7165 8612 68612 07/1901 06/1961 05/1912
to J69
Stratford 59.92 59.96
166 7166 8613 68613 07/1901 09/1961 05/1911
to J69
Stratford 60.17 60.29
167 7167 8614 07/1901 10/1940 07/1910
to J69
39.25
168 7168 8615 08/1901 10/1940 04/1912
to J69
39.17
169 7169 8616 68616 08/1901 11/1958 Colchester 57.25 57.46
82 7082 8628 68628 08/1904 02/1958 Yarmouth South Town 53.5 53.62
86 7086 8632 68632 09/1904 05/1958 03/1944
to J69
New England 53.67 54.28
47 7047 8643 68643 08/1912 11/1959 07/1945
to J68
Stratford 47.25 47.45