Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1395 Week
» 13100 Month
» 344589 Year
» 421176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "J69" Class 0-6-0T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR DP (Dept) Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
327 7327 8490 68490 03/1890 07/1904
from J67
05/1958 Kings Lynn 68.17 68.30
328 7328 8491 68491 03/1890 07/1908
from J67
06/1958 Leicester (G.C.) 68.25 68.46
329 7329 8492 68492 03/1890 09/1902
from J67
06/1956 St Margarets 66.25 66.46
331 7331 8494 68494 03/1890 07/1945
from J67
04/1958 Kings Lynn 68.08 68.46
332 7332 8495 68495 04/1890 12/1940
from J67
05/1958 Norwich Thorpe 68.08 68.38
333 7333 04/1890 08/1908
from J67
09/1939 49.42
334 7334 8496 68496 04/1890 02/1903
from J67
05/1956 Stratford 66.08
335 7335 8497 68497 04/1890 02/1917
from J67
09/1960 Bury St Edmunds 70.42 70.55
336 7336 8498 68498 44 04/1890 08/1951
from J67
08/1959 Ipswich 69.33 72.80
337 7337 8499 68499 04/1890 07/1904
from J67
16/09/1962 Carlisle Upperby 72.42 71.21
338 7338 8500 68500 05/1890 12/1909
from J67
01/1961 Stratford 70.67 70.30
339 7339 8501 68501 05/1890 06/1946
from J67
08/1960 Norwich Thorpe 70.25 70.80
340 7340 8502 68502 05/1890 12/1903
from J67
02/1961 Kings Lynn 70.75
341 7341 8503 68503 05/1890 09/1902
from J67
01/1957 Parkhead 66.67
342 7342 8504 68504 05/1890 09/1902
from J67
01/1956 Thornton Junction 65.67
343 7343 8505 68505 05/1890 08/1903
from J67
11/1953 St Margarets 63.5
344 7344 8506 05/1890 10/1913
from J67
10/1940 50.42 70.13
345 7345 8507 68507 05/1890 09/1903
from J67
06/1960 Stratford 70.08 70.80
346 7346 8508 68508 05/1890 01/1904
from J67
02/1961 Stratford 70.75 69.38
398 7398 8510 68510 11/1890 03/1950
from J67
09/1959 Ipswich 68.83 68.96
400 7400 8512 68512 11/1890 02/1951
from J67
04/1957 Hitchin (GNR) 66.42 66.54
401 7401 8513 68513 11/1890 06/1952
from J67
10/1960 Stratford 69.92 70.63
12 7012 8517 68517 12/1890 02/1951
from J67
03/1956 Cambridge 65.25 65.54
14 7014 8519 68519 01/1891 04/1950
from J67
08/1958 Parkeston Quay 67.58 67.71
15 7015 8520 68520 01/1891 02/1950
from J67
08/1959 Stratford 68.58 68.71
18 7018 8522 68522 01/1891 03/1950
from J67
03/1961 Stratford 70.17 70.29
347 7347 8524 68524 02/1892 01/1905
from J67
06/1959 Polmont 67.33
348 7348 8525 68525 02/1892 12/1903
from J67
12/1953 St Margarets 61.83 68.88
349 7349 8526 68526 03/1892 05/1904
from J67
10/1960 Stratford 68.58 66.46
350 7350 8527 68527 03/1892 12/1909
from J67
06/1958 Colwick 66.25 67.71
351 7351 8528 68528 03/1892 12/1903
from J67
10/1959 Boston 67.58 66.79
352 7352 8529 68529 03/1892 05/1954
from J67
08/1958 Lincoln 66.42 68.97
353 7353 8530 68530 03/1892 01/1905
from J67
02/1961 Cambridge 68.92
354 7354 8531 68531 03/1892 10/1903
from J67
08/10/1955 Wrexham Rhosddu 63.58 67.46
335 7335 8532 68532 43 03/1892 05/1904
from J67
12/1958 Stratford 66.75 70.55
356 7356 8533 68533 03/1892 10/1911
from J67
07/1953 Polmont 61.33 61.46
357 7357 8534 68534 04/1892 11/1904
from J67
08/1954 Stratford 62.33 62.54
358 7358 8535 68535 04/1892 12/1904
from J67
08/1959 Thornton Junction 67.33 67.79
359 7359 8536 68536 04/1892 06/1904
from J67
02/1958 Cambridge 65.83 66.04
360 7360 8537 68537 04/1892 10/1903
from J67
06/1958 Lincoln 66.17 66.38
361 7361 8538 68538 04/1892 09/1906
from J67
09/1961 Stratford 69.42 69.55
362 7362 8539 04/1892 03/1917
from J67
10/1940 48.5
363 7363 8540 68540 05/1892 11/1904
from J67
01/1956 Trafford Park (LMS) 63.67
364 7364 05/1892 05/1919
from J67
01/1931 38.67 38.78
365 7365 8541 68541 05/1892 11/1904
from J67
08/1958 Hitchin (GNR) 66.25 66.80
366 7366 8542 68542 05/1892 02/1945
from J67
16/09/1962 Bishops Stortford 70.33 70.63
367 7367 8543 68543 45 04/1894 07/1904
from J67
11/1959 Boston 65.58 68.46
368 7368 8544 68544 04/1894 10/1906
from J67
01/1955 Polmont 60.75
369 7369 8545 68545 04/1894 11/1904
from J67
02/1961 Stratford 66.83 66.88
370 7370 8546 68546 05/1894 12/1904
from J67
05/1958 New England 64 64.29
371 7371 8547 68547 05/1894 02/1907
from J67
04/1956 Upminster 61.92
372 7372 8548 68548 05/1894 12/1904
from J67
11/1953 Stratford 59.5
373 7373 8549 68549 05/1894 11/1906
from J67
11/02/1962 Stratford 67.75 67.80
374 7374 8550 68550 06/1894 12/1904
from J67
07/1961 Thornton Junction 67.08 67.13
375 7375 8551 68551 06/1894 11/1904
from J67
06/1957 Eastfield 63 63.12
376 7376 8552 68552 06/1894 07/1906
from J67
09/1961 Eastfield 67.25 67.38
377 7377 8553 68553 10/1895 07/1906
from J67
12/1958 Lincoln 63.17 63.29
378 7378 8554 68554 10/1895 07/1904
from J67
07/1961 Stratford 65.75 65.79
379 7379 8555 68555 10/1895 01/2019
from J67
05/1958 Thornton Junction 62.58 62.87
380 7380 8556 68556 10/1895 07/1904
from J67
16/09/1962 Stratford 66.92 67.21
381 7381 8557 68557 10/1895 11/1907
from J67
10/1959 Stratford 64 64.13
382 7382 8558 68558 11/1895 08/1946
from J67
01/1961 Lincoln 65.17 65.21
383 7383 8559 68559 11/1895 07/1904
from J67
04/1956 Upminster 60.42 60.62
384 7384 8560 68560 11/1895 03/1908
from J67
01/1961 Boston 65.17 65.21
385 7385 8561 68561 11/1895 10/1907
from J67
07/1958 Stratford 62.67 63.12
386 7386 8562 68562 12/1895 02/1904
from J67
08/1956 St Margarets 60.67
387 7387 8563 68563 12/1895 02/1906
from J67
10/1960 Stratford 64.83 64.96
388 7388 8564 12/1895 12/1904
from J67
10/1940 44.83 62.13
389 7389 8565 68565 12/1895 09/1904
from J67
06/08/1962 Hatfield 66.67 66.79
390 7390 8566 68566 12/1895 09/1905
from J67
09/1962 South Lynn 66.75 67.13
391 7391 8567 68567 01/1896 05/1913
from J67
08/1957 Parkhead 61.58 61.71
392 7392 8568 68568 01/1896 09/1904
from J67
05/1958 St Margarets 62.33 62.45
393 7393 8569 68569 01/1896 08/1906
from J67
06/1960 Stratford 64.42 64.54
394 7394 8570 68570 01/1896 08/1909
from J67
09/1961 Melton Constable 65.67 65.71
395 7395 8571 68571 02/1896 11/1910
from J67
12/1960 Parkeston Quay 64.83 65.37
396 7396 8572 68572 02/1896 10/1909
from J67
29/11/1954 Hatfield 58.75 59.45
265 7265 8573 68573 04/1896 12/1908
from J67
08/1960 Stratford 64.33 64.54
266 7266 8574 68574 04/1896 12/1907
from J67
01/1959 Stratford 62.75 63.04
267 7267 8575 68575 04/1896 05/1912
from J67
10/1960 Stratford 64.5 64.54
268 7268 8576 68576 04/1896 12/1910
from J67
03/1958 Stratford 61.92 62.04
269 7269 8577 68577 05/1896 02/1912
from J67
10/11/1960 Stratford 64.5 64.55
270 7270 8578 68578 05/1896 04/1910
from J67
01/1961 Stratford 64.67 65.13
271 7271 8579 68579 05/1896 11/1908
from J67
01/1960 Bury St Edmunds 63.67 63.79
272 7272 8580 06/1896 02/1908
from J67
10/1940 44.33
273 7273 8581 68581 06/1896 01/1908
from J67
09/1959 Boston 63.25 63.37
274 7274 8582 06/1896 03/1908
from J67
10/1940 44.33
258 7258 8585 68585 03/1899 09/1947
from J67
06/1958 Trafford Park (LMS) 59.25 59.37
261 7261 8587 68587 04/1899 06/1946
from J67
10/1959 Lincoln 60.5 60.62
262 7262 8588 68588 04/1899 06/1953
from J67
05/1958 New England 59.08 59.21
203 7203 8591 68591 12/1899 11/1948
from J67
01/1960 Stratford 60.08 61.62
305 7305 8596 68596 06/1900 09/1910
from J67
11/1959 Parkeston Quay 59.42 59.46
190 7190 8597 68597 07/1900 08/1913
from J67
10/1955 South Lynn 55.25
191 7191 8598 68598 07/1900 04/1913
from J67
05/1957 Gorton 56.83 56.96
192 7192 8599 68599 07/1900 10/1944
from J67
11/1959 Lincoln 59.33 59.38
193 7193 8600 68600 07/1900 01/1945
from J67
16/09/1962 Kings Lynn 62.17
194 7194 8601 68601 07/1900 04/1915
from J67
10/1959 Stratford 59.25 62.46
195 7195 8602 68602 07/1900 10/1913
from J67
10/1959 Lowestoft 59.25 59.38
196 7196 8603 68603 08/1900 12/1916
from J67
03/1958 Norwich Thorpe 57.58 57.70
197 7197 8604 08/1900 03/1912
from J67
10/1940 40.17
198 7198 8605 68605 08/1900 10/1916
from J67
07/1958 Hitchin (GNR) 57.92 58.46
160 7160 8607 68607 06/1901 04/1913
from J67
05/1958 Stratford 56.92 57.21
162 7162 8609 68609 06/1901 08/1915
from J67
16/09/1962 Cambridge 61.25 61.38
163 7163 8610 68610 06/1901 12/1921
from J67
01/1957 Lincoln 55.58 55.71
165 7165 8612 68612 07/1901 05/1912
from J67
06/1961 Stratford 59.92 59.96
166 7166 8613 68613 07/1901 05/1911
from J67
09/1961 Stratford 60.17 60.29
167 7167 8614 07/1901 07/1910
from J67
10/1940 39.25
168 7168 8615 08/1901 04/1912
from J67
10/1940 39.17
51 7051 8617 68617 05/1904 07/1958 Stratford 54.17 54.62
52 7052 8618 68618 05/1904 08/1958 Lincoln 54.25 54.79
53 7053 8619 68619 05/1904 10/1961 Stratford 57.42 57.46
54 7054 8620 05/1904 10/1940 36.42
55 7055 8621 68621 05/1904 16/09/1962 Stratford 58.33 58.71
56 7056 8622 06/1904 10/1940 36.33
57 7057 8623 68623 06/1904 02/1961 St Margarets 56.67 56.71
58 7058 8624 06/1904 10/1940 36.33
59 7059 8625 68625 06/1904 01/1959 Yarmouth South Town 54.58 54.71
60 7060 8626 68626 06/1904 03/05/1962 Stratford 57.92 58.04
81 7081 8627 08/1904 10/1940 36.17
82 7082 8628 68628 08/1904 02/1958 Yarmouth South Town 53.5 53.62
83 7083 8629 68629 08/1904 11/1959 Colchester 55.25 55.37
84 7084 8630 68630 08/1904 01/1959 Stratford 54.42 54.54
85 7085 8631 68631 08/1904 07/1958 Stratford 53.92 54.04
86 7086 8632 68632 09/1904 05/1958 New England 53.67 54.28
87 7087 8633 68633 09/1904 24/11/1960 Stratford 56.17 Prs Preserved
88 7088 8634 09/1904 10/1940 36.08 56.12
89 7089 8635 68635 09/1904 16/09/1962 Dunfermline Upper 58 58.37
90 7090 8636 68636 09/1904 01/1959 Colchester 54.33 54.45