Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 162 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 13098 Month
» 344587 Year
» 421174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Holmes "J83" Class 0-6-0T


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
795 9795 8442 68442 08/1900 08/01/1962 Kipps 61.42
796 9796 8443 68443 08/1900 02/1961 Kipps 60.5
797 9797 8444 68444 09/1900 01/1960 Kipps 59.33
798 9798 8445 68445 09/1900 08/10/1962 Kipps 62.08
799 9799 8446 68446 09/1900 03/1956 Dundee Tay Bridge 55.5
800 9800 8447 68447 09/1900 02/1961 Eastfield 60.42
801 9801 8448 68448 09/1900 08/10/1962 St Margarets 62.08
802 9802 8449 68449 09/1900 09/1958 St Margarets 58
803 9803 8450 68450 09/1900 12/1957 St Margarets 57.25
804 9804 8451 68451 09/1900 02/1958 Thornton Junction 57.42
805 9805 8452 68452 03/1901 06/1958 Dundee Tay Bridge 57.25
806 9806 8453 68453 03/1901 08/10/1962 Thornton Junction 61.58
807 9807 8454 68454 03/1901 12/02/1962 St Margarets 60.92
808 9808 8455 68455 03/1901 05/1956 Dundee Tay Bridge 55.17
809 9809 8456 68456 03/1901 01/1961 Thornton Junction 59.83
810 9810 8457 68457 03/1901 03/1960 Haymarket 59
811 9811 8458 68458 03/1901 18/01/1962 Thornton Junction 60.83
812 9812 8459 68459 03/1901 05/1961 Thornton Junction 60.17
813 9813 8460 68460 04/1901 11/1958 Haymarket 57.58
814 9814 8461 68461 04/1901 06/1958 Kipps 57.17
815 9815 8462 04/1901 09/1947 46.42
816 9816 8463 68463 04/1901 11/1958 St Margarets 57.58
817 9817 8464 68464 04/1901 03/1958 St Margarets 56.92
818 9818 8465 68465 04/1901 08/1957 Dunfermline Upper 56.33
819 9819 8466 68466 04/1901 12/1958 Dundee Tay Bridge 57.67
820 9820 8467 68467 04/1901 09/1959 Thornton Junction 58.42
821 9821 8468 68468 04/1901 06/1959 Eastfield 58.17
822 9822 8469 68469 04/1901 10/1956 Perth South 55.5
823 9823 8470 68470 04/1901 08/10/1962 St Margarets 61.5
824 9824 8471 68471 04/1901 08/1961 Polmont 60.33
825 9825 8472 68472 04/1901 12/02/1962 St Margarets 60.83
826 9826 8473 68473 04/1901 05/1956 Haymarket 55.08
827 9827 8474 68474 04/1901 04/1958 St Margarets 57
828 9828 8475 68475 05/1901 03/1958 Eastfield 56.83
829 9829 8476 68476 05/1901 03/1956 Eastfield 54.83
830 9830 8477 68477 05/1901 29/12/1962 St Margarets 61.58
831 9831 8478 68478 05/1901 11/1958 Haymarket 57.5
832 9832 8479 68479 05/1901 08/10/1962 Eastfield 61.42
833 9833 8480 68480 05/1901 03/1959 Eastfield 57.83
834 9834 8481 68481 05/1901 12/02/1962 Haymarket 60.75