Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 164 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1395 Week
» 13100 Month
» 344589 Year
» 421176 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "J88" Class 0-6-0T


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
836 9836 8320 68320 12/1904 06/1960 St Margarets 55.5
837 9837 8321 68321 12/1904 06/1958 Thornton Junction 53.5
838 9838 8322 68322 12/1904 12/1958 Thornton Junction 54
839 9839 8323 68323 12/1904 10/1956 Thornton Junction 51.83
840 9840 8324 68324 01/1905 07/1958 Polmont 53.5
841 9841 8325 68325 01/1905 03/1961 St Margarets 56.17
842 9842 8326 68326 09/1905 10/1959 Eastfield 54.08
843 9843 8327 68327 09/1905 07/1958 Eastfield 52.83
844 9844 8328 68328 09/1905 03/1958 Haymarket 52.5
845 9845 8329 68329 10/1905 02/1959 Kipps 53.33
846 9846 8330 68330 10/1905 08/1958 Eastfield 52.83
847 9847 8331 68331 10/1905 03/1959 Eastfield 53.42
233 9233 8332 68332 03/1909 08/1960 Thornton Junction 51.42
234 9234 8333 68333 03/1909 03/1958 Eastfield 49
235 9235 8334 68334 03/1909 06/1959 St Margarets 50.25
236 9236 8335 68335 03/1909 08/10/1962 Dundee Tay Bridge 53.58
237 9237 8336 68336 04/1909 28/05/1962 Eastfield 53.08
238 9238 8337 68337 04/1909 11/1955 Thornton Junction 46.58
66 9066 8338 68338 04/1912 09/1961 St Margarets 49.42
114 9114 8339 68339 04/1912 10/1958 Haymarket 46.5
116 9116 8340 68340 05/1912 02/1958 St Margarets 45.75
117 9117 8341 68341 05/1912 19/11/1954 Thornton Junction 42.5
118 9118 8342 68342 05/1912 12/02/1962 Stirling 49.75
119 9119 8343 68343 06/1912 10/1960 Kipps 48.33
121 9121 8344 68344 06/1912 01/1961 Kipps 48.58
130 9130 8345 68345 07/1912 29/12/1962 Eastfield 50.42
132 9132 8346 68346 07/1912 08/10/1962 Stirling 50.25
152 9152 8347 68347 07/1912 08/1958 Eastfield 46.08
277 9277 8348 68348 09/1919 08/1958 St Margarets 38.92
290 9290 8349 68349 09/1919 08/1960 Eastfield 40.92
288 9288 8353 68350 10/1919 16/07/1962 Polmont 42.75
289 9289 8354 68351 10/1919 09/1960 Stirling 40.92
87 9087 8350 68352 11/1919 07/1962 St Margarets 42.67
271 9271 8351 68353 11/1919 12/02/1962 Thornton Junction 42.25
279 9279 8352 68354 11/1919 06/1960 Polmont 40.58