Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 41 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3307 Week
» 19958 Month
» 213802 Year
» 724904 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "K3" Class 2-6-0


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1000 4000 1800 61800 03/1920 13/07/1962 Doncaster 42.33
1001 4001 1801 61801 06/1920 17/04/1962 March 41.83
1002 4002 1802 61802 09/1920 07/03/1960 Lincoln 39.5
1003 4003 1803 61803 10/1920 13/07/1961 Doncaster 40.75
1004 4004 1804 61804 12/1920 31/03/1962 Woodford Halse 41.25
1005 4005 1805 61805 12/1920 16/09/1962 New England 41.75
1006 4006 1806 61806 04/1921 07/03/1960 Lincoln 38.92
1007 4007 1807 61807 05/1921 04/11/1962 Immingham 41.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1965
1008 4008 1808 61808 07/1921 25/09/1961 Colwick 40.17
1009 4009 1809 61809 08/1921 03/03/1962 Kings Cross 40.58
17 1810 61810 08/1924 15/08/1962 New England 38
28 1811 61811 08/1924 04/11/1962 Lincoln 38.25
32 1812 61812 08/1924 16/09/1962 Doncaster 38.08
33 1813 61813 09/1924 09/04/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.58
36 1814 61814 09/1924 27/12/1961 Hull Dairycoates 37.25
38 1815 61815 10/1924 11/07/1960 Stratford 35.75
39 1816 61816 10/1924 31/05/1962 Sheffield Darnall 37.58
46 1817 61817 10/1924 16/09/1962 March 37.92
52 1818 61818 10/1924 05/03/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.42
53 1819 61819 10/1924 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 38.17
58 1820 61820 10/1924 04/11/1962 Lincoln 38.08
69 1821 61821 10/1924 16/09/1962 Immingham 37.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
73 1822 61822 10/1924 04/11/1962 Lincoln 38.08
75 1823 61823 11/1924 29/12/1959 St Margarets 35.08
80 1824 61824 11/1924 05/07/1961 Woodford Halse 36.67
91 1825 61825 11/1924 16/09/1962 New England 37.83
92 1826 61826 11/1924 16/09/1962 Colwick 37.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
109 1827 61827 11/1924 16/09/1962 Colwick 37.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
111 1828 61828 11/1924 20/03/1961 Lincoln 36.33
112 1829 61829 12/1924 28/02/1962 Doncaster 37.17
113 1830 61830 12/1924 04/11/1962 Doncaster 37.92
114 1831 61831 12/1924 16/09/1962 Colwick 37.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
116 1832 61832 12/1924 03/11/1962 Woodford Halse 37.92
118 1833 61833 12/1924 20/09/1961 Colwick 36.75
120 1834 61834 12/1924 15/05/1962 March 37.42
121 1835 61835 01/1925 16/09/1963 New England 38.67
125 1836 61836 01/1925 08/02/1960 Doncaster 35.08
126 1837 61837 01/1925 27/04/1962 Colwick 37.25
127 1838 61838 01/1925 21/03/1960 Woodford Halse 35.17
134 1839 61839 01/1925 09/01/1962 Doncaster 37
135 1840 61840 02/1925 16/09/1962 March 37.58
140 1841 61841 02/1925 31/03/1962 Woodford Halse 37.08
141 1842 61842 02/1925 21/08/1961 Woodford Halse 36.5
143 1843 61843 02/1925 03/11/1962 Woodford Halse 37.75
146 1844 61844 02/1925 05/06/1961 Thornaby 36.33
153 1845 61845 02/1925 16/09/1962 Lincoln 37.58
156 1846 61846 02/1925 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.83
158 1847 61847 02/1925 10/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.83
159 1848 61848 03/1925 16/09/1962 Lincoln 37.5
163 1849 61849 03/1925 17/04/1961 Cambridge 36.08
167 1850 61850 03/1925 06/1961 Doncaster 36.25
170 1851 61851 03/1925 25/11/1961 Woodford Halse 36.67
178 1852 61852 03/1925 18/07/1961 Colwick 36.33
180 1853 61853 03/1925 18/12/1962 Ardsley 37.75
184 1854 61854 03/1925 29/10/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.58
186 1855 61855 03/1925 06/07/1959 St Margarets 34.33
188 1856 61856 03/1925 17/12/1962 Ardsley 37.75
191 1857 61857 04/1925 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37.67
195 1858 61858 04/1925 26/04/1961 Carlisle Upperby 36
200 1859 61859 04/1925 04/11/1962 Lincoln 37.58
203 1860 61860 08/1925 16/11/1961 Colwick 36.25
202 1861 61861 08/1925 12/01/1962 New England 36.42
204 1862 61862 08/1925 16/01/1962 March 36.42
206 1863 61863 09/1925 Gorton 06/06/1960 06/1945
to K5
Stratford 34.75
207 1864 61864 09/1925 16/09/1962 New England 37
208 1865 61865 09/1925 06/1961 Woodford Halse 35.75
227 1866 61866 10/1925 19/10/1961 Lincoln 36
228 1867 61867 10/1925 04/11/1962 Doncaster 37.08
229 1868 61868 10/1925 10/05/1962 Doncaster 36.58
231 1869 61869 12/1925 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 37
1300 1870 61870 04/1929 12/07/1962 Colwick 33.25
1312 1871 61871 05/1929 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 33.58
1318 1872 61872 06/1929 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 33.5
1331 1873 61873 06/1929 08/05/1962 Colwick 32.92
1345 1874 61874 07/1929 22/05/1961 Hull Dairycoates 31.83
1364 1875 61875 07/1929 10/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 33.42
1365 1876 61876 07/1929 17/09/1959 St Margarets 30.17
1367 1877 61877 08/1929 24/07/1962 Colwick 32.92
1368 1878 61878 08/1929 06/08/1959 St Margarets 30
1386 1879 61879 09/1929 16/06/1959 St Margarets 29.75
1387 1880 61880 10/1929 16/09/1962 March 32.92
1388 1881 61881 10/1929 21/04/1960 St Margarets 30.5
1389 1882 61882 10/1929 28/05/1960 Woodford Halse 30.58
1391 1883 61883 10/1929 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 33.17
1392 1884 61884 11/1929 23/07/1962 Hull Dairycoates 32.67
1394 1885 61885 11/1929 03/11/1959 St Margarets 30
1395 1886 61886 11/1929 16/09/1962 March 32.83
1396 1887 61887 11/1929 02/03/1962 Doncaster 32.33
1397 1888 61888 12/1929 25/09/1961 Colwick 31.75
1398 1889 61889 12/1929 04/11/1962 Immingham 32.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
2761 1890 61890 07/1930 16/09/1962 March 32.17
2762 1891 61891 07/1930 12/09/1961 Lincoln 31.17
2763 1892 61892 07/1930 30/10/1961 Hull Dairycoates 31.25
2764 1893 61893 07/1930 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 32.42
2765 1894 61894 07/1930 30/10/1961 Colwick 31.25
2766 1895 61895 07/1930 18/07/1962 Doncaster 32
2767 1896 61896 08/1930 14/05/1962 Colwick 31.75
2768 1897 61897 08/1930 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 32.33
2769 1898 61898 08/1930 07/02/1959 Carlisle Upperby 28.5
1100 1899 61899 03/1931 18/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 31.75
1101 1900 61900 03/1931 04/03/1960 St Margarets 29
1102 1901 61901 03/1931 27/12/1961 Hull Dairycoates 30.75
1106 1902 61902 03/1931 03/07/1961 Hull Dairycoates 30.33
1108 1903 61903 04/1931 23/11/1961 Hull Dairycoates 30.58
1117 1904 61904 03/1931 05/06/1961 Hull Dairycoates 30.25
1118 1905 61905 03/1931 04/11/1962 Lincoln 31.67
1119 1906 61906 04/1931 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 31.67
1121 1907 61907 04/1931 16/09/1962 Colwick 31.42
1125 1908 61908 04/1931 19/01/1962 Mexborough 30.75
1133 1909 61909 04/1931 01/04/1960 St Margarets 29
1135 1910 61910 04/1931 21/07/1962 Woodford Halse 31.25
1137 1911 61911 05/1931 11/1959 St Margarets 28.5
1141 1912 61912 05/1931 16/09/1962 Kings Cross 31.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1965
1154 1913 61913 05/1931 17/02/1962 Woodford Halse 30.75
1156 1914 61914 05/1931 23/08/1962 Colwick 31.25
1158 1915 61915 05/1931 16/09/1962 March 31.33
1162 1916 61916 05/1931 12/1960 Carlisle Upperby 29.58
1164 1917 61917 05/1931 26/11/1962 Ardsley 31.5
1166 1918 61918 06/1931 28/03/1962 March 30.75
1302 1919 61919 07/1934 29/06/1961 Lincoln 26.92
1304 1920 61920 07/1934 18/09/1961 Hull Dairycoates 27.17
1308 1921 61921 07/1934 25/07/1961 March 27
1310 1922 61922 08/1934 07/05/1962 Hull Dairycoates 27.75
1324 1923 61923 08/1934 30/04/1962 Hull Dairycoates 27.67
1306 1924 61924 09/1934 20/12/1960 St Margarets 26.25
2934 1925 61925 09/1934 24/07/1961 Doncaster 26.83
2935 1926 61926 09/1934 10/04/1962 Lincoln 27.58
2936 1927 61927 01/1935 17/07/1961 Hull Dairycoates 26.5
2937 1928 61928 01/1935 05/02/1960 St Margarets 25.08
1325 1929 61929 08/1934 04/07/1962 March 27.92
1332 1930 61930 09/1934 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 28.25
1333 1931 61931 09/1934 24/07/1959 St Margarets 24.83
1339 1932 61932 09/1934 12/02/1962 Hull Dairycoates 27.42
1399 1933 61933 09/1934 04/11/1962 St Margarets 28.17
1307 1934 61934 01/1935 26/11/1962 Ardsley 27.83
1322 1935 61935 01/1935 23/07/1962 Hull Dairycoates 27.5
2938 1936 61936 01/1935 25/11/1961 Carlisle Upperby 26.83
2939 1937 61937 01/1935 12/03/1960 Carlisle Upperby 25.17
2940 1938 61938 01/1935 29/12/1961 Sheffield Darnall 26.92
2425 1939 61939 08/1935 04/11/1962 Immingham 27.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
2426 1940 61940 08/1935 04/05/1962 Doncaster 26.75
2427 1941 61941 08/1935 07/1961 Hull Dairycoates 25.92
2428 1942 61942 08/1935 16/09/1962 March 27.08
2438 1943 61943 08/1935 09/1962 Colwick 27.08 Cut Cohens (Ickles) 1966
2439 1944 61944 09/1935 16/09/1962 Colwick 27
2440 1945 61945 09/1935 26/02/1962 Hull Dairycoates 26.42
2442 1946 61946 09/1935 14/06/1962 March 26.75
2443 1947 61947 09/1935 01/08/1962 Colwick 26.92
2447 1948 61948 09/1935 28/03/1962 March 26.5
2448 1949 61949 09/1935 10/04/1962 Doncaster 26.58
2449 1950 61950 09/1935 04/11/1962 Doncaster 27.17
2450 1951 61951 10/1935 04/11/1962 Doncaster 27.08
2451 1952 61952 10/1935 06/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 27.17
2459 1953 61953 10/1935 14/03/1962 Doncaster 26.42
2461 1954 61954 10/1935 16/09/1962 March 26.92
2463 1955 61955 10/1935 27/05/1960 St Margarets 24.58
2466 1956 61956 10/1935 16/09/1962 Immingham 26.92
2467 1957 61957 11/1935 16/09/1962 Colwick 26.83
2468 1958 61958 11/1935 31/05/1962 Mexborough 26.5
2417 1959 61959 05/1936 13/11/1961 Staveley (G.C.) 25.5
2429 1960 61960 05/1936 16/09/1962 Immingham 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 1963
2445 1961 61961 05/1936 02/10/1961 Doncaster 25.42
2446 1962 61962 05/1936 19/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 26.58
2453 1963 61963 06/1936 16/09/1962 March 26.25
2455 1964 61964 06/1936 07/07/1961 Doncaster 25.08
2458 1965 61965 06/1936 03/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 26.5
2465 1966 61966 06/1936 19/02/1962 Colwick 25.67
2471 1967 61967 07/1936 03/04/1961 Sheffield Darnall 24.75
2472 1968 61968 08/1936 23/10/1961 St Margarets 25.17
2470 1969 61969 10/1936 17/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 26.17
2473 1970 61970 10/1936 04/11/1962 Doncaster 26.08
2498 1971 61971 10/1936 20/03/1961 Colwick 24.42
2499 1972 61972 10/1936 16/09/1962 Doncaster 25.92
3813 1973 61973 11/1936 04/11/1962 Doncaster 26
3814 1974 61974 11/1936 02/07/1962 Immingham 25.67
3815 1975 61975 11/1936 04/09/1961 Low Moor 24.83
3816 1976 61976 11/1936 04/01/1962 Sheffield Darnall 25.17
3817 1977 61977 11/1936 16/09/1962 Colwick 25.83
3818 1978 61978 11/1936 17/08/1961 New England 24.75
3819 1979 61979 12/1936 16/10/1961 New England 24.83
3820 1980 61980 12/1936 17/12/1962 Ardsley 26
3821 1981 61981 12/1936 04/11/1962 Doncaster 25.92
3822 1982 61982 12/1936 16/09/1962 Colwick 25.75
3823 1983 61983 12/1936 10/07/1959 St Margarets 22.58
3824 1984 61984 12/1936 02/11/1962 Ardsley 25.92
3825 1985 61985 01/1937 21/12/1962 Hull Dairycoates 25.92
3826 1986 61986 01/1937 28/05/1962 Hull Dairycoates 25.33
3827 1987 61987 01/1937 19/03/1962 Hull Dairycoates 25.17
3828 1988 61988 01/1937 16/11/1959 St Margarets 22.83
3829 1989 61989 02/1937 19/06/1962 Staveley (G.C.) 25.33
3830 1990 61990 02/1937 13/10/1960 St Margarets 23.67
3831 1991 61991 02/1937 07/05/1959 St Margarets 22.25
3832 1992 61992 02/1937 06/06/1960 St Margarets 23.33