Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 29 Today
» 1044 Yesterday
» 3295 Week
» 19946 Month
» 213790 Year
» 724892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Thompson "L1" Class 2-6-4T


LNER (1946) BR (1st) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
9000 67701 05/1945 12/1960 15.58
9001 67702 22/01/1948 31/10/1960 12.75
9002 67703 23/01/1948 16/09/1962 14.67
9003 67704 06/02/1948 11/1960 12.75
E9004 67705 19/02/1948 12/1960 12.83
E9005 67706 18/02/1948 12/1960 12.83
E9006 67707 27/02/1948 07/1961 13.42
E9007 67708 03/03/1948 12/1960 12.75
E9008 67709 08/03/1948 12/1960 12.75
E9009 67710 18/03/1948 13/10/1962 14.58
E9010 67711 19/03/1948 12/1960 12.75
E9011 67712 25/03/1948 10/1961 13.58
E9012 67713 01/04/1948 10/1961 13.5
69013 67714 09/04/1948 12/1960 12.67
69014 67715 09/04/1948 28/02/1962 13.83
69015 67716 16/04/1948 16/09/1962 14.42
67717 30/04/1948 07/1961 13.25
67718 07/05/1948 18/11/1961 Gorton 13.5
67719 13/05/1948 07/1961 13.17
67720 14/05/1948 12/02/1962 13.75
67721 25/05/1948 26/11/1962 14.5
67722 04/06/1948 10/1961 13.33
67723 04/06/1948 16/09/1962 14.25
67724 11/06/1948 16/09/1962 14.25
67725 12/06/1948 12/1960 12.5
67726 02/07/1948 11/1960 12.33
67727 08/07/1948 13/01/1962 13.5
67728 09/07/1948 09/1961 13.17
67729 16/07/1948 16/09/1962 14.17
67730 06/08/1948 08/1962 14
67731 26/10/1948 16/09/1962 13.92
67732 28/10/1948 07/1961 12.75
67733 01/11/1948 13/10/1962 13.92
67734 03/11/1948 16/09/1962 13.83
67735 05/11/1948 16/09/1962 13.83
67736 08/11/1948 12/1960 12.08
67737 10/11/1948 08/1962 13.75
67738 12/11/1948 07/1961 12.67
67739 17/11/1948 18/11/1961 13
67740 17/11/1948 07/1961 12.67
67741 19/11/1948 29/12/1962 14.08
67742 22/11/1948 21/12/1962 14.08
67743 24/11/1948 20/02/1962 13.25
67744 26/11/1948 29/12/1962 14.08
67745 29/11/1948 29/12/1962 14.08
67746 01/12/1948 31/07/1962 13.58
67747 03/12/1948 09/07/1962 13.58
67748 06/12/1948 15/11/1961 12.92
67749 07/12/1948 29/12/1962 14
67750 09/12/1948 09/12/1961 13
67751 10/12/1948 29/03/1962 13.25
67752 14/12/1948 23/03/1962 13.25
67753 15/12/1948 06/02/1962 13.17
67754 17/12/1948 05/11/1962 13.92
67755 21/12/1948 14/12/1962 14
67756 22/12/1948 29/03/1962 13.25
67757 23/12/1948 31/07/1962 13.58
67758 27/12/1948 09/1961 12.75
67759 29/12/1948 08/10/1962 13.83
67760 30/12/1948 08/1961 12.67
67761 01/1949 14/11/1962 13.83
67762 01/1949 10/1961 12.75
67763 01/1949 30/11/1962 13.83
67764 02/1949 08/1962 13.5
67765 02/1949 29/11/1962 13.75
67766 09/1949 10/12/1962 13.25
67767 09/1949 29/12/1962 13.25
67768 10/1949 02/1961 11.33
67769 10/1949 09/1961 11.92
67770 11/1949 29/12/1962 13.08
67771 11/1949 27/10/1962 12.92
67772 11/1949 13/11/1961 12
67773 12/1949 Neasden 29/12/1962 13
67774 12/1949 Neasden 22/01/1962 12.08
67775 12/1949 Neasden 09/1961 11.75
67776 01/1950 Neasden 29/12/1962 12.92
67777 01/1950 21/12/1962 12.92
67778 01/02/1950 Neasden 04/05/1962 12.25
67779 01/02/1950 Neasden 29/12/1962 12.83
67780 02/1950 29/12/1962 12.83
67781 03/1950 13/10/1962 12.58
67782 03/1950 18/11/1961 11.67
67783 03/1950 19/12/1962 12.75
67784 03/1950 08/11/1962 12.67
67785 04/1950 29/12/1962 12.67
67786 04/1950 29/12/1962 12.67
67787 04/1950 29/12/1962 12.67
67788 05/1950 30/05/1962 12
67789 05/1950 13/10/1962 12.42
67790 05/1950 Kings Cross 02/1961 10.75
67791 06/1950 Hitchin (GNR) 27/11/1962 12.42
67792 06/1950 29/12/1962 12.5
67793 06/1950 21/09/1962 12.25
67794 07/1950 10/1961 11.25
67795 07/1950 03/05/1962 11.83
67796 08/1950 06/11/1962 12.25
67797 08/1950 17/10/1962 12.17
67798 08/1950 Norwich Thorpe 29/12/1962 12.33
67799 09/1950 Kings Cross 29/03/1962 11.5
67800 09/1950 Kings Cross 29/12/1962 12.25