Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 798 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 26326 Month
» 285185 Year
» 796287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

MET/LNER Hally "L2" Class 2-6-4T


MET LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
111 6158 9070 69070 21/03/1925 Neasden 22/10/1948 Neasden 23.58
112 6159 21/03/1925 Neasden 02/01/1943 Neasden 17.83
113 6160 9071 69071 23/03/1925 Neasden 06/10/1948 Neasden 23.58
114 6161 23/03/1925 Neasden 26/05/1943 Neasden 18.17
115 6162 9072 28/03/1925 Neasden 26/01/1946 Neasden 20.83
116 6163 9073 28/03/1925 Neasden 12/05/1945 Neasden 20.17