Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 166 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1397 Week
» 13102 Month
» 344591 Year
» 421178 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "L3" Class 2-6-4T


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
272 5272 9050 69050 12/1914 Immingham 12/03/1955 Woodford Halse 40.25
273 5273 9051 69051 12/1914 Gorton 14/05/1951 Frodingham 36.42
274 5274 9052 69052 02/1915 Gorton 09/08/1954 Northwich 39.5
275 5275 9053 E9053 69053 03/1915 Gorton 17/07/1950 Neasden 35.33
276 5276 9054 69054 04/1915 Gorton 29/08/1949 Neasden 34.33
336 5336 9055 69055 04/1915 Gorton 23/07/1951 Neasden 36.25
337 5337 9056 E9056 69056 05/1915 Gorton 22/01/1951 Neasden 35.67
338 5338 9057 69057 06/1915 Woodford Halse 10/10/1949 Frodingham 34.33
339 5339 9058 69058 11/1915 Neasden 29/08/1949 Frodingham 33.75
340 5340 9059 69059 12/1915 Langwith Junction 29/08/1949 Neasden 33.67
341 5341 9060 69060 06/1916 Neasden 07/06/1954 Frodingham 38
342 5342 9061 69061 06/1916 Neasden 09/02/1953 Neasden 36.67
343 5343 9062 69062 06/1916 Gorton 14/05/1951 Northwich 34.92
344 5344 9063 08/1916 Gorton 25/07/1947 Sheffield Darnall 30.92
345 5345 9064 69064 01/1917 Gorton 24/01/1955 Frodingham 38
366 5366 9065 E9065 69065 02/1917 Langwith Junction 10/05/1954 Frodingham 37.25
367 5367 9066 69066 03/1917 Gorton 17/04/1950 Frodingham 33.08
368 5368 9067 69067 03/1917 Gorton 19/02/1951 Neasden 33.92
369 5369 9068 E9068 69068 04/1917 Gorton 05/06/1950 Neasden 33.17
370 5370 9069 69069 1917 Gorton 07/07/1955 Woodford Halse 38.58