Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NBR/LNER Reid "N15" Class 0-6-2T


NBR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
7 9007 9126 69126 06/1910 12/02/1962 Dawsholm 51.67 Cut Clarkston, Atlas Steelworks (Lanark) 09/1962 52.29
154 9154 9127 69127 06/1910 06/1959 Aberdeen Ferryhill 49 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1959 49.28
209 9209 9128 69128 06/1910 01/10/1962 St Margarets 52.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1964 54.54
210 9210 9129 69129 06/1910 12/1958 Aberdeen Ferryhill 48.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 01/1959 48.62
251 9251 9130 69130 06/1910 12/1957 St Margarets 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1958 47.78
282 9282 9131 69131 07/1910 12/02/1962 Eastfield 51.58 Cut Clarkston, Atlas Steelworks (Lanark) 11/1962 52.37
386 9386 9132 69132 06/1910 11/1960 Motherwell 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 01/1961 50.62
387 9387 9133 69133 06/1910 08/1960 St Margarets 50.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1960 50.29
388 9388 9134 69134 07/1910 03/1961 St Margarets 50.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1961 50.79
389 9389 9135 69135 07/1910 01/10/1962 St Margarets 52.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1963 52.62
390 9390 9136 69136 07/1910 05/1961 Thornton Junction 50.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1961 51.04
391 9391 9137 69137 07/1910 21/05/1962 Polmont 51.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 07/1962 52.04
392 9392 9138 69138 07/1910 01/10/1962 St Margarets 52.25 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 06/1964 53.96
393 9393 9139 69139 07/1910 04/1958 Carlisle Canal 47.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1958 48.03
396 9396 9140 69140 08/1910 06/1958 St Margarets 47.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1959 48.70
397 9397 9141 69141 08/1910 09/1960 St Margarets 50.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 07/1960 49.95
398 9398 9142 69142 08/1910 01/1958 Bathgate 47.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 04/1958 47.70
399 9399 9143 69143 08/1910 09/1960 Motherwell 50.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1961 50.54
907 9907 9144 69144 07/1912 02/1960 St Margarets 47.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1960 47.78
908 9908 9145 69145 07/1912 03/1960 Polmadie 47.67 Cut Connels (Calder) 05/1960 47.87
909 9909 9146 69146 07/1912 07/1959 St Margarets 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1959 47.20
910 9910 9147 69147 08/1912 06/1958 St Margarets 45.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 02/1959 46.53
911 9911 9148 69148 08/1912 06/1958 St Margarets 45.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 03/1959 46.61
912 9912 9149 69149 08/1912 03/1960 St Margarets 47.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 05/1960 47.78
913 9913 9150 69150 08/1912 01/10/1962 St Margarets 50.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1963 50.54
914 9914 9151 69151 08/1912 02/1959 Parkhead 46.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1960 47.53
915 9915 9152 69152 08/1912 12/1958 St Margarets 46.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 01/1959 46.45
916 9916 9153 69153 08/1912 09/1958 Thornton Junction 46.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 08/1959 47.03
917 9917 9154 69154 08/1912 11/1959 St Margarets 47.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 1960
918 9918 9155 69155 08/1912 08/09/1962 Stratford 50.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1963 50.87
919 9919 9156 69156 08/1912 12/02/1962 Bathgate 49.5 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1963 50.87
920 9920 9157 69157 08/1912 04/1958 Parkhead 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1958 45.95
921 9921 9158 69158 08/1912 05/1958 Bathgate 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1958 45.95
922 9922 9159 69159 08/1912 10/1961 Bathgate 49.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1963 50.87
923 9923 9160 69160 08/1912 08/1958 St Margarets 46 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1960 47.53
924 9924 9161 69161 08/1912 08/1960 Parkhead 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1960 48.20
925 9925 9162 69162 08/1912 03/1959 Polmont 46.58 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1960 47.53
926 9926 9163 69163 08/1912 12/02/1962 Eastfield 49.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 07/1962 49.95
219 9219 9185 69185 05/1913 07/1959 St Margarets 46.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 09/1959 46.37
223 9223 9164 69164 05/1913 04/1959 Dundee Tay Bridge 45.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1960 46.79
224 9224 9165 69165 05/1913 05/1960 Parkhead 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1960 47.12
229 9229 9166 69166 05/1913 12/1959 Parkhead 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 01/1960 46.70
230 9230 9167 69167 05/1913 12/1957 St Margarets 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 07/1958 45.20
246 9246 9168 69168 05/1913 02/1960 St Margarets 46.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 03/1960 46.87
252 9252 9169 69169 05/1913 02/1959 Haymarket 45.75 Cut Chalmers (Bonnington, Edinburgh) 12/1959 46.62
257 9257 9170 69170 05/1913 01/1960 Eastfield 46.67 Cut Connels (Calder) 04/1960 46.95
264 9264 9171 69171 05/1913 06/1960 Eastfield 47.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1960 47.28
47 9047 9172 69172 08/1916 11/1958 St Margarets 42.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 08/1959 43.03
54 9054 9173 69173 08/1916 01/1961 St Margarets 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 03/1961 44.61
61 9061 9174 69174 09/1916 11/1958 Carlisle Canal 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 12/1958 42.28
65 9065 9175 69175 09/1916 10/1958 St Margarets 42.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 03/1959 42.52
69 9069 9176 69176 10/1916 08/1959 Dawsholm 42.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1959 42.95
70 9070 9177 69177 12/1916 08/1960 Dawsholm 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1960 43.86
276 9276 9179 69179 01/1917 09/1960 Eastfield 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1960 43.86
453 9453 9180 69180 01/1917 03/1961 Kittybrewster 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 04/1961 44.28
142 9142 9181 69181 02/1917 12/02/1962 Eastfield 45 Cut Clarkston, Atlas Steelworks (Lanark) 11/1962 45.78
165 9165 9182 69182 03/1917 09/1959 Eastfield 42.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1959 42.53
166 9166 9183 69183 03/1917 13/11/1961 Eastfield 44.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 09/1963 46.53
259 9259 9184 69184 03/1917 11/1960 Dawsholm 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 01/1961 43.87
20 9020 9186 69186 02/1920 07/1959 St Margarets 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 10/1959 39.69
22 9022 9187 69187 02/1920 12/1959 Dalry Road 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 03/1960 40.11
29 9029 9188 69188 02/1920 01/10/1962 Eastfield 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 12/1962 42.86
49 9049 9189 69189 02/1920 04/1958 Aberdeen Ferryhill 38.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 06/1958 38.36
96 9096 9190 69190 02/1920 08/1960 Parkhead 40.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1960 40.69
97 9097 9191 69191 02/1920 01/10/1962 Eastfield 42.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1962 42.69
106 9106 9192 69192 02/1920 03/1959 Dunfermline Upper 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 09/1959 39.61
107 9107 9193 69193 03/1920 08/1958 Parkhead 38.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 12/1958 38.78
108 9108 9194 69194 03/1920 10/1960 Parkhead 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1960 40.70
240 9240 9195 69195 03/1920 03/1958 Parkhead 38 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 05/1958 38.19
519 9519 9196 69196 01/1923 01/10/1962 Hamilton (West) 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1963 40.78
520 9520 9197 69197 01/1923 12/1959 Eastfield 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 03/1960 37.19
521 9521 9198 69198 02/1923 06/1960 Parkhead 37.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1960 37.36
522 9522 9199 69199 02/1923 05/1961 Parkhead 38.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1961 38.61
523 9523 9200 69200 03/1923 06/1958 Polmont 35.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 02/1959 35.95
524 9524 9201 69201 03/1923 01/1958 Keith 34.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 03/1958 35.02
525 9525 9202 69202 03/1923 05/1960 Dunfermline Upper 37.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1960 37.28
526 9526 9203 69203 03/1923 06/1958 Dawsholm 35.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 06/1960 37.28
527 9527 9204 69204 03/1923 16/07/1962 Thornton Junction 39.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1962 39.70
528 9528 9205 69205 03/1923 02/1960 Dawsholm 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1960 37.11
71 9071 9178 69178 12/1923 29/12/1962 Motherwell 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1963 39.86
19 9019 9206 69206 10/1923 05/1960 Kipps 36.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1960 36.36
23 9023 9207 69207 11/1923 02/1960 Polmadie 36.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 03/1960 36.36
31 9031 9208 69208 11/1923 11/1959 Dawsholm 36 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1960 36.28
52 9052 9209 69209 11/1923 10/1960 Parkhead 36.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1960 37.03
55 9055 9210 69210 11/1923 10/1957 Parkhead 33.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 02/1958 34.28
60 9060 9211 69211 11/1923 01/10/1962 Haymarket 38.92 Cut P.W. McLellan (Coatbridge) 06/1964 40.61
67 9067 9212 69212 12/1923 01/10/1962 Eastfield 38.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 10/1962 38.86
74 9074 9213 69213 12/1923 10/1959 Parkhead 35.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1960 36.19
75 9075 9214 69214 12/1923 05/1959 Eastfield 35.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 09/1959 35.78
76 9076 9215 69215 12/1923 11/1959 Carlisle Canal 35.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 04/1960 36.36
77 9077 9216 69216 12/1923 12/02/1962 Bathgate 38.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1963 39.53
78 9078 9217 69217 02/1924 10/1959 Dawsholm 35.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 02/1960 36.02
79 9079 9218 69218 02/1924 01/10/1962 Eastfield 38.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Cowlairs) 11/1962 38.78
99 9099 9219 69219 02/1924 05/12/1961 St Margarets 37.83 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 09/1963 39.61
125 9125 9220 69220 03/1924 11/1958 Haymarket 34.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Kilmarnock) 06/1959 35.27
9147 9221 69221 03/1924 07/1961 Dunfermline Upper 37.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 08/1961 37.44
9174 9222 69222 03/1924 05/1959 St Margarets 35.17 Cut Chalmers (Bonnington, Edinburgh) 12/1959 35.78
9225 9223 69223 03/1924 08/1960 Motherwell 36.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 11/1960 36.70
9227 9224 69224 04/1924 01/10/1962 St Margarets 38.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Inverurie) 02/1963 38.86