Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 821 Today
» 932 Yesterday
» 5265 Week
» 14007 Month
» 358186 Year
» 869288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O3" Class 2-8-0


GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
456 3456 3475 63475 12/1913 New England 24/07/1951 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 37.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1951 37.61
457 3457 3476 63476 12/1913 New England 17/03/1952 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 38.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1952 38.27
458 3458 3477 63477 01/1914 New England 08/10/1951 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 37.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1951 37.77
459 3459 3478 63478 01/1914 New England 15/10/1951 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 37.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1951 37.77
460 460N 3460 3479 E3479 63479 02/1914 New England 16/05/1951 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 37.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1951 37.27
462 3462 3480 63480 04/1919 New England 26/03/1951 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 31.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1951 31.94
463 463N 3463 3481 63481 04/1919 New England 02/04/1951 Doncaster 32 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1951 32.02
464 3464 3482 63482 05/1919 Colwick 21/01/1952 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1952 32.69
465 3465 3483 63483 05/1919 New England 02/04/1951 Doncaster 31.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1951 31.94
466 3466 3484 63484 05/1919 New England 16/12/1952 Doncaster 33.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1952 33.61
467 3467 3485 63485 06/1919 New England 26/09/1951 Doncaster 32.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/1951 32.27
468 3468 3486 63486 06/1919 New England 05/02/1951 Doncaster 31.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1951 31.69
469 3469 3487 06/1919 Colwick 04/07/1947 Frodingham 28.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
470 3470 3488 63488 06/1919 Colwick 22/02/1952 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 32.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 28/02/1952 32.73
471 3471 3489 63489 06/1919 Colwick 22/07/1948 Doncaster 29.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1948 29.10
472 3472 3490 10/1919 New England 19/06/1947 Frodingham 27.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
473 3473 3491 63491 10/1919 New England 18/12/1950 Doncaster 31.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1950 31.19
474 3474 3492 10/1919 New England 10/05/1947 Frodingham 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
475 3475 3493 63493 10/1919 New England 19/02/1951 Doncaster 31.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 02/1951 31.36
476 3476 3494 63494 10/1919 New England 05/03/1948 Doncaster 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 03/1948 28.44