Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 165 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1396 Week
» 13101 Month
» 344590 Year
» 421177 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "O4" Class 2-8-0


GCR ROD LNWR LNER (1924) WD LNER (1946) LNER (1947) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
966 5966 3500 3572 63572 09/1911 18/11/1959 Frodingham 48.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
331 5331 3504 3585 63585 10/1911 19/12/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 52.17 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
332 5332 3505 3586 E3586 63586 10/1911 03/10/1965 Frodingham 54 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
333 5333 3506 3594 63594 11/1911 21/04/1964 22/11/1947
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 52.42 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
334 5334 3507 3598 63598 11/1911 03/11/1962 Gorton 51 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
335 5335 3508 3600 E3600 63600 11/1911 03/11/1962 Gorton 51 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
26 5026 3501 3577 63577 12/1911 03/12/1963 Langwith Junction 52
69 5069 043 3502 3580 63580 12/1911 03/12/1963 Gorton 52
93 5093 3503 3582 63582 12/1911 21/08/1959 Gorton 47.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
102 5102 3509 3601 63601 01/1912 16/06/1963 Frodingham 51.42 Prs Preserved
133 5133 3510 3607 E3607 63607 01/1912 05/09/1965 Colwick 53.67 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
155 5155 3511 3608 63608 02/1912 25/05/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 49.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
400 5400 3522 3658 63658 02/1912 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 50.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
402 5402 769 02/1912 26/10/1941 Mexborough 29.67
403 5403 3524 3660 63660 03/1912 14/09/1959 Frodingham 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
404 5404 3525 3664 63664 03/1912 23/09/1962 Langwith Junction 50.5 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
405 5405 3526 3669 63669 04/1912 14/11/1960 Mexborough 48.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
406 5406 3527 3671 63671 05/1912 13/06/1965 Frodingham 53.08 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
407 5407 3528 3677 63677 05/1912 02/03/1962 Doncaster 49.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
408 5408 3529 3678 63678 05/1912 18/07/1963 23/12/1944
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 51.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
346 5346 767 06/1912 04/10/1941 Mexborough 29.33
347 5347 3513 3617 63617 06/1912 12/12/1962 Frodingham 50.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
348 5348 3514 3625 63625 06/1912 16/04/1959 Barnsley 46.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
349 5349 3515 3632 63632 07/1912 16/01/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 51.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
350 5350 3516 3634 63634 07/1912 23/09/1962 Immingham 50.17 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
351 5351 3517 3635 63635 08/1912 09/05/1962 Langwith Junction 49.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
352 5352 3518 3640 63640 08/1912 Gorton 04/05/1959 Sheffield Darnall 46.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
353 5353 3519 3643 63643 08/1912 30/11/1960 Immingham 48.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
354 5354 724 09/1912 10/09/1941 Doncaster 29
355 5355 3521 3654 63654 10/1912 22/06/1959 Frodingham 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1183 6183 714 07/1912 10/09/1941 Mexborough 29.17
1184 6184 3531 3680 E3680 63680 07/1912 09/09/1959 Sheffield Darnall 47.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1185 6185 730 07/1912 14/09/1941 Mexborough 29.17
1186 6186 3533 3683 63683 07/1912 07/03/1965 Langwith Junction 52.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
1187 6187 3534 3684 63684 07/1912 12/12/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 51.42 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1188 6188 3535 3690 63690 07/1912 09/12/1962 Frodingham 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1189 6189 3536 3692 63692 07/1912 14/02/1965 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 52.58 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
1190 6190 3537 3693 63693 07/1912 19/11/1962 Frodingham 50.33 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1191 6191 3538 3698 63698 08/1912 09/12/1962 Doncaster 50.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1192 6192 3539 3700 63700 08/1912 20/12/1960 Gorton 48.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1193 6193 3540 3707 63707 08/1912 11/07/1965 Colwick 52.92 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1194 6194 3541 3710 E3710 63710 09/1912 13/07/1959 Sheffield Darnall 46.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1195 6195 3542 3711 63711 09/1912 17/11/1962 10/10/1944
to O1
Annesley 50.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1196 6196 701 09/1912 12/09/1941 Mexborough 29
1197 6197 771 09/1912 04/10/1941 Mexborough 29.08
1198 6198 3545 3719 63719 09/1912 01/08/1961 Gorton 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1199 6199 3546 3722 63722 09/1912 24/09/1963 Langwith Junction 51
1200 6200 3547 3723 63723 10/1912 09/11/1959 Mexborough 47.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1201 6201 3548 3727 63727 10/1912 01/02/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 51.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1202 6202 739 10/1912 19/09/1941 Annesley 28.92
1203 6203 3550 3736 63736 08/1912 29/08/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 51 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1204 6204 737 08/1912 19/09/1941 Cambridge 29.08
1205 6205 3552 3738 63738 08/1912 Sheffield Neepsend 09/12/1962 Doncaster 50.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1206 6206 3553 3743 63743 08/1912 09/06/1962 Gorton 49.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1207 6207 3554 3745 63745 08/1912 16/04/1959 Mexborough 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1208 6208 3555 3757 63757 08/1912 24/11/1961 Mexborough 49.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1209 6209 3556 3761 63761 08/1912 Mexborough 18/06/1959 Frodingham 46.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1210 6210 3557 3762 63762 08/1912 16/03/1962 Staveley (G.C.) 49.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1211 6211 3558 3772 E3772 63772 08/1912 03/03/1963 Staveley (G.C.) 50.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1212 6212 719 08/1912 10/09/1941 Annesley 29.08
1213 6213 3560 3773 63773 08/1912 18/10/1964 06/04/1946
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 52.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
1214 6214 3561 3777 63777 09/1912 27/10/1962 02/11/1946
to O1
Annesley 50.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1215 6215 042 3562 3778 63778 09/1912 22/02/1952 Frodingham 39.42
1216 6216 3563 3789 63789 09/1912 17/11/1962 19/01/1946
to O1
Annesley 50.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1217 6217 736 09/1912 19/09/1941 Annesley 29
1218 6218 3565 3797 63797 09/1912 27/02/1959 Sheffield Darnall 46.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1219 6219 3566 3799 63799 10/1912 24/11/1961 Frodingham 49.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1220 6220 3567 3803 63803 10/1912 17/03/1963 09/06/1945
to O1
March 50.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1221 6221 3568 3805 63805 10/1912 03/11/1962 Gorton 50.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1222 6222 040 3569 3809 63809 10/1912 22/02/1952 Langwith Junction 39.33
1223 6223 3570 E3570 63570 10/1912 Annesley 22/12/1961 Ardsley 49.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1224 6224 3571 63571 10/1912 Annesley 13/12/1964 27/08/1949
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 52.17 Cut Drapers (Hull)
1225 6225 732 11/1912 Annesley 14/09/1941 Langwith Junction 28.83
1226 6226 3573 63573 11/1912 Annesley 27/04/1961 Gorton 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1227 6227 3574 63574 11/1912 Annesley 23/09/1962 Sheffield Darnall 49.83 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1228 6228 3575 E3575 63575 11/1912 03/11/1962 Gorton 50 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1229 6229 3576 63576 11/1912 Staveley (G.C.) 29/11/1963 Frodingham 51 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1230 6230 772 11/1912 Staveley (G.C.) 18/10/1941 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28.92
1231 6231 3578 63578 11/1912 Staveley (G.C.) 17/11/1962 13/10/1945
to O1
Annesley 50 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1232 6232 3579 E3579 63579 11/1912 24/11/1962 13/03/1948
to O1
Annesley 50 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1233 6233 747 11/1912 Staveley (G.C.) 19/09/1941 Sheffield Neepsend 28.83
1234 6234 3581 63581 11/1912 10/02/1959 Sheffield Darnall 46.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1235 6235 773 11/1912 04/10/1941 Sheffield Neepsend 28.92
1236 6236 3583 63583 11/1912 30/06/1959 Sheffield Darnall 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1237 6237 3584 63584 11/1912 08/08/1962 Ardsley 49.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1238 6238 761 12/1912 19/09/1941 Annesley 28.75
1239 6239 705 12/1912 Gorton 21/09/1941 Frodingham 28.75
1240 6240 3587 63587 12/1912 23/09/1962 Colwick 49.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1241 6241 3588 63588 12/1912 08/08/1962 Wakefield 49.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1242 6242 3589 63589 12/1912 Immingham 11/07/1965 28/04/1949
to O1
Langwith Junction 52.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 25/10/1965 52.90
1243 6243 3590 63590 12/1912 11/07/1965 16/12/1944
to O1
Langwith Junction 52.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/10/1965 52.84
1244 6244 3591 63591 12/1912 17/11/1962 15/04/1944
to O1
Annesley 49.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1245 6245 3592 63592 12/1912 Immingham 23/07/1963 05/10/1946
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 50.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1246 6246 3593 63593 12/1912 Sheffield Neepsend 03/10/1965 Doncaster 52.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1247 6247 774 12/1912 Sheffield Neepsend 04/10/1941 Woodford Halse 28.83
1248 6248 3595 63595 12/1912 21/04/1961 Frodingham 48.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1249 6249 3596 63596 12/1912 29/08/1963 30/07/1949
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 50.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1250 6250 3597 63597 12/1912 18/05/1961 Langwith Junction 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1251 6251 782 01/1913 04/10/1941 Colwick 28.75
1252 6252 3599 E3599 63599 01/1913 09/02/1962 Sheffield Darnall 49.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
375 5375 768 04/1913 11/10/1941 Annesley 28.5
376 5376 763 04/1913 10/09/1941 Mexborough 28.42
377 5377 3602 63602 05/1913 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 49.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
378 5378 3603 63603 05/1913 21/07/1962 Gorton 49.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
379 5379 3604 63604 06/1913 01/05/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 50.92 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
380 5380 3605 63605 06/1913 08/08/1962 Ardsley 49.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
381 5381 3606 63606 07/1913 13/06/1965 Frodingham 51.92 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
382 5382 713 07/1913 10/09/1941 Colwick 28.17
383 5383 711 08/1913 10/09/1941 Colwick 28.08
384 5384 3609 63609 09/1913 23/09/1962 Sheffield Darnall 49 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
385 5385 3610 63610 12/1913 24/11/1962 29/07/1944
to O1
Annesley 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
386 5386 3611 E3611 63611 01/1914 26/03/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 50.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
387 5387 3612 63612 01/1914 14/11/1965 Langwith Junction 51.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
388 5388 3613 63613 02/1914 25/07/1965 Doncaster 51.42 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
389 5389 3614 63614 02/1914 28/04/1959 Colwick 45.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
390 5390 3615 63615 02/1914 07/09/1964 Langwith Junction 50.58 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
391 5391 3616 E3616 63616 03/1914 Mexborough 23/09/1962 Colwick 48.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
392 5392 746 03/1914 Mexborough 19/09/1941 March 27.5
393 5393 3618 63618 03/1914 Gorton 24/02/1963 Doncaster 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
394 5394 3619 63619 04/1914 21/10/1963 17/03/1945
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 49.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
395 5395 3620 63620 04/1914 23/02/1959 Sheffield Darnall 44.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
396 5396 3621 63621 05/1914 23/09/1962 Sheffield Darnall 48.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
397 5397 3622 63622 05/1914 01/05/1963 Langwith Junction 49 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
398 5398 3623 63623 05/1914 Mexborough 09/02/1962 Mexborough 47.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
399 5399 3624 63624 06/1914 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 48.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
271 5271 756 08/1914 05/10/1941 Mexborough 27.17
1805 6562 3735 63735 09/1917 29/12/1962 Staveley (G.C.) 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1806 2921 6563 783 09/1917 18/10/1941 Immingham 24.08
1807 2922 6564 3737 63737 09/1917 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich)
1809 2923 6565 709 09/1917 09/09/1941 Colwick 24
1811 6285 3739 63739 10/1917 03/10/1965 Langwith Junction 48 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
1812 6566 3740 63740 10/1917 17/11/1962 04/08/1945
to O1
Annesley 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1815 2962 6567 3741 E3741 63741 10/1917 04/04/1965 Frodingham 47.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1816 6568 3742 63742 10/1917 10/02/1963 Sheffield Darnall 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich)
1817 6569 742 10/1917 21/09/1941 Frodingham 23.92
1819 6284 3744 63744 10/1917 19/07/1963 Frodingham 45.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1820 2879 6570 760 10/1917 19/09/1941 Woodford Halse 23.92
1821 2963 6571 3746 E3746 63746 10/1917 27/02/1964 27/11/1948
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 46.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1824 6572 3747 63747 11/1917 18/05/1961 Frodingham 43.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1258c 1827 2926 6258 3748 63748 11/1917 19/11/1962 Frodingham 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1829 2965 6573 3749 63749 11/1917 31/10/1959 Staveley (G.C.) 41.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1278c 1831 6278 3750 63750 11/1917 09/03/1964 Colwick 46.33 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon)
1833 6574 3751 63751 12/1917 12/03/1959 Mexborough 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1834 6575 3752 E3752 63752 12/1917 17/11/1962 17/11/1945
to O1
Annesley 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1836 2931 6576 3753 63753 12/1917 02/12/1959 Mexborough 42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1839 6577 3754 63754 12/1917 07/02/1964 Colwick 46.17 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon)
1840 2966 6578 3755 63755 12/1917 26/11/1962 21/10/1944
to O1
Tyne Dock 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1255c 1841 6255 3756 63756 01/1918 18/06/1959 Mexborough 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1651 2903 6356 3670 63670 09/1917 04/06/1964 16/03/1946
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 46.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
1355c 1652 2904 6355 720 09/1917 09/09/1941 March 24
1653 2905 6354 3672 63672 10/1917 05/12/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 46.17 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1654 2957 6352 3673 63673 10/1917 08/05/1959 Mexborough 41.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1655 2958 6351 3674 63674 10/1917 15/01/1966 Colwick 48.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering)
1656 2906 6353 3675 63675 10/1917 15/01/1966 Colwick 48.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering)
1657 2907 6350 3676 63676 11/1917 24/11/1962 27/01/1945
to O1
Annesley 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1658 2908 6348 753 11/1917 05/10/1941 Immingham 23.92
1659 2909 6332 755 11/1917 19/09/1941 Doncaster 23.83
1325c 1661 6325 3679 63679 12/1917 23/05/1965 Langwith Junction 47.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1662 2910 6346 757 12/1917 27/09/1941 Thornton Junction 23.75
1663 6347 3681 63681 12/1917 24/02/1962 Gorton 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1664 6548 3682 63682 12/1917 06/03/1959 Sheffield Darnall 41.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1665 6549 700 01/1918 20/09/1941 West Hartlepool 23.67
1666 2911 6345 731 01/1918 14/09/1941 Doncaster 23.67
1667 2912 6344 3685 63685 01/1918 31/03/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 46.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
1668 6495 3686 63686 02/1918 15/09/1962 Gorton 44.58
1669 6324 3687 63687 02/1918 16/10/1963 29/12/1945
to O1
March 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1670 2913 6343 3688 E3688 63688 02/1918 26/09/1965 Doncaster 47.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1701 6554 3629 63629 12/1917 10/02/1959 Sheffield Darnall 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1712 6555 3630 63630 02/1918 11/07/1965 30/06/1945
to O1
Langwith Junction 47.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 25/10/1965 47.72
1713 6556 3631 63631 06/1918 15/09/1962 Gorton 44.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1716 6557 702 07/1918 13/09/1941 Doncaster 23.17
1717 2975 6536 3633 63633 07/1918 08/08/1962 Ardsley 44.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1718 6377 762 08/1918 19/09/1941 Grantham 23.08
1719 6537 748 08/1918 19/09/1941 Langwith Junction 23.08
1721 6376 3636 63636 10/1918 20/12/1964 Langwith Junction 46.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1722 6558 3637 63637 10/1918 09/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1723 6375 3638 63638 10/1918 12/03/1959 Colwick 40.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1724 6559 3639 63639 10/1918 19/12/1965 Colwick 47.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1601 2900 6373 790 01/1918 25/10/1941 Doncaster 23.75
1603 6543 3644 63644 01/1918 15/01/1966 Colwick 48 Cut Cohens (Kettering)
1604 6366 3645 63645 02/1918 14/04/1964 Langwith Junction 46.17 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
1605 2870 6374 3646 E3646 63646 02/1918 11/07/1965 15/09/1945
to O1
Langwith Junction 47.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/10/1965 47.67
1606 6544 3647 63647 02/1918 06/05/1964 Doncaster 46.25 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1607 2883 6372 3648 E3648 63648 02/1918 26/01/1962 Mexborough 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1608 6365 3649 63649 03/1918 24/03/1961 Gorton 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1609 6545 3650 63650 03/1918 27/06/1965 26/05/1945
to O1
Langwith Junction 47.25 Cut R A Kings (Norwich)
1610 6539 3651 63651 03/1918 11/07/1965 Frodingham 47.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1611 2901 6371 3652 63652 03/1918 11/11/1963 15/12/1945
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 45.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1612 2902 6370 3653 63653 04/1918 17/04/1966 Doncaster 48 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath)
1614 6369 743 05/1918 19/09/1941 March 23.33
1616 6364 3655 63655 06/1918 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1617 6363 3656 63656 06/1918 19/11/1962 Staveley (G.C.) 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1618 6546 3657 63657 06/1918 23/09/1962 Colwick 44.25 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1619 6368 715 07/1918 13/09/1941 Colwick 23.17
1620 6360 3659 63659 07/1918 09/12/1962 Mexborough 44.42 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1621 6547 738 07/1918 05/10/1941 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 23.25
1622 6540 3661 63661 07/1918 08/08/1965 Frodingham 47.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1624 6358 3662 63662 08/1918 18/05/1961 Frodingham 42.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1625 6359 3663 63663 08/1918 01/11/1964 16/06/1945
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 46.25 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)
1626 6541 751 08/1918 19/09/1941 Colwick 23.08
1627 6357 3665 63665 09/1918 17/12/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 45.25 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1628 6542 3666 63666 09/1918 15/12/1962 Frodingham 44.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1629 2956 6367 3667 63667 09/1918 19/01/1959 Langwith Junction 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1631 6361 3668 63668 10/1918 02/12/1958 Mexborough 40.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1632 6362 779 10/1918 18/10/1941 Frodingham 23
1671 2971 6341 3689 63689 03/1918 17/11/1962 11/08/1945
to O1
Annesley 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1672 6551 741 03/1918 20/09/1941 Dundee Tay Bridge 23.5
1673 2959 6342 3691 63691 04/1918 20/06/1965 Langwith Junction 47.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
1674 2914 6339 717 04/1918 14/09/1941 Annesley 23.42
1675 2915 6349 3694 63694 04/1918 30/10/1959 Colwick 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1676 6340 754 05/1918 05/10/1941 Immingham 23.42
1677 6496 3695 63695 05/1918 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1678 6323 3696 63696 05/1918 24/04/1959 Frodingham 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1679 2972 6338 3697 63697 06/1918 29/08/1965 Langwith Junction 47.17 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
1680 6322 752 06/1918 19/09/1941 Colwick 23.25
1682 2973 6337 3699 63699 06/1918 08/06/1959 Colwick 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1683 6497 706 07/1918 13/09/1941 Colwick 23.17
1684 6498 3701 63701 07/1918 01/08/1965 Langwith Junction 47.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 29/11/1965 47.41
1685 6321 3702 63702 07/1918 19/09/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 46.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 16/03/1965 46.70
1686 6336 3703 63703 08/1918 31/01/1965 Langwith Junction 46.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1647 6550 3704 63704 10/1918 17/03/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1649 6320 3705 63705 10/1918 14/04/1963 Staveley (G.C.) 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1650 6319 3706 63706 10/1918 26/09/1965 Langwith Junction 46.92 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
1687 6499 712 11/1918 13/09/1941 Woodford Halse 22.83
1688 6318 3708 63708 11/1918 23/09/1962 Immingham 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1845 6279 703 01/1918 13/09/1941 Colwick 23.67
1847 6276 3758 63758 12/1917 24/05/1962 Immingham 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1282c 1848 6282 3759 63759 12/1917 23/09/1962 Immingham 44.75 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1849 2933 6579 3760 63760 02/1918 26/11/1962 31/08/1946
to O1
Tyne Dock 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1854 2868 6580 765 03/1918 20/09/1941 Heaton 23.5
1855 6273 776 03/1918 11/10/1941 Annesley 23.58
1272c 1856 6272 3763 63763 03/1918 08/02/1964 Langwith Junction 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1857 2952 6581 3764 63764 03/1918 27/02/1966 Doncaster 47.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1858 6271 3765 63765 03/1918 11/10/1964 Langwith Junction 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1859 2979 6582 3766 63766 03/1918 26/08/1962 Gorton 44.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1860 6274 3767 63767 03/1918 03/11/1962 Gorton 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1861 6513 3768 63768 03/1918 11/07/1965 01/12/1945
to O1
Langwith Junction 47.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/11/1965 47.67
1862 6583 3769 63769 04/1918 06/03/1959 Doncaster 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1863 6584 3770 63770 04/1918 19/12/1965 Colwick 47.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1864 6270 3771 63771 04/1918 25/11/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1866 6585 758 04/1918 19/09/1941 Langwith Junction 23.42
1867 2935 6514 725 04/1918 20/09/1941 York (North) 23.42
1868 6268 3774 63774 04/1918 10/03/1963 Staveley (G.C.) 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1869 6586 3775 63775 04/1918 24/03/1962 Gorton 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1870 6267 3776 63776 04/1918 29/12/1962 Langwith Junction 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1873 6504 735 05/1918 19/09/1941 Doncaster 23.33
1874 6587 728 05/1918 14/09/1941 Colwick 23.33
1875 6588 3779 63779 05/1918 13/04/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1876 6505 3780 63780 05/1918 07/07/1963 28/04/1945
to O1
March 45.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1269c 1878 6269 3781 63781 05/1918 17/04/1966 Doncaster 47.92 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath)
1879 6506 3782 63782 05/1918 25/05/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 43
1880 2896 6589 3783 63783 05/1918 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1881 6507 3784 E3784 63784 05/1918 29/08/1963 24/06/1944
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1882 2897 6590 3785 63785 05/1918 27/03/1966 Doncaster 47.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1884 2894 6515 3786 63786 06/1918 27/09/1964 18/11/1944
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 46.25 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh)
1885 6591 3787 63787 06/1918 08/06/1962 Staveley (G.C.) 44 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1886 6592 3788 E3788 63788 06/1918 02/01/1966 Doncaster 47.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1887 2980 6593 745 07/1918 13/09/1941 Doncaster 23.17
1892 2940 6594 3790 63790 02/1918 12/03/1959 Sheffield Darnall 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1894 6510 3791 63791 02/1918 05/09/1965 Frodingham 47.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1283c 1895 6283 3792 63792 02/1918 27/10/1962 16/09/1944
to O1
Annesley 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1896 6280 3793 63793 02/1918 09/05/1965 Frodingham 47.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1898 6277 3794 63794 02/1918 03/11/1962 Gorton 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1899 2941 6595 3795 63795 02/1918 30/10/1963 12/02/1944
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1902 6596 3796 63796 03/1918 27/10/1962 27/04/1946
to O1
Annesley 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1903 2877 6597 707 03/1918 13/09/1941 Langwith Junction 23.5
1904 6275 3798 63798 03/1918 24/05/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1905 2869 6517 726 03/1918 05/10/1941 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 23.58
1907 6511 3800 63800 03/1918 16/05/1964 Langwith Junction 46.17 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1908 6598 3801 63801 03/1918 16/07/1963 Langwith Junction 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1910 6281 3802 63802 04/1918 23/06/1964 Frodingham 46.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1911 6599 734 04/1918 19/09/1941 Annesley 23.42
1913 6512 3804 63804 04/1918 11/12/1959 Staveley (G.C.) 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1914 6600 718 05/1918 14/09/1941 Colwick 23.33
1915 2884 6601 3806 63806 05/1918 24/11/1962 12/08/1944
to O1
Annesley 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1916 2871 6518 3807 63807 05/1918 25/09/1964 Frodingham 46.33 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
1917 2892 6519 3808 63808 05/1918 17/11/1962 10/02/1945
to O1
Annesley 44.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1920 6602 780 05/1918 04/10/1941 Staveley (G.C.) 23.42
1921 6603 789 05/1918 18/10/1941 Staveley (G.C.) 23.42
1922 2954 6520 723 05/1918 09/09/1941 March 23.33
1923 6265 3812 63812 06/1918 08/05/1959 Mexborough 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1925 6604 3813 63813 06/1918 07/03/1965 Staveley (G.C.) 46.75 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
1927 6605 764 06/1918 19/09/1941 Langwith Junction 23.25
1928 6266 777 06/1918 04/10/1941 Langwith Junction 23.33
1929 6606 3816 63816 06/1918 15/01/1966 Colwick 47.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering)
1933 6263 3817 63817 07/1918 17/11/1962 14/04/1945
to O1
Annesley 44.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1936 6264 3818 63818 07/1918 17/04/1966 Doncaster 47.75 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath)
1937 6262 3819 63819 07/1918 07/11/1965 Colwick 47.33 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1939 6607 722 08/1918 20/09/1941 Heaton 23.08
1689 6552 3709 63709 12/1918 23/02/1961 Gorton 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1690 2916 6335 740 12/1918 19/09/1941 Staveley (G.C.) 22.75
1691 6317 784 01/1919 18/10/1941 Sheffield Neepsend 22.75
1334c 1692 2917 6334 3712 63712 01/1919 26/11/1962 13/05/1944
to O1
Tyne Dock 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1693 6553 3713 E3713 63713 01/1919 10/08/1962 Gorton 43.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1694 6316 3714 63714 01/1919 20/03/1959 Sheffield Darnall 40.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1695 2898 6333 3715 63715 02/1919 28/01/1964 Langwith Junction 44.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1696 6310 3716 63716 02/1919 06/07/1960 Gorton 41.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1697 6314 3717 63717 03/1919 04/04/1965 Langwith Junction 46.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
1699 6313 3718 63718 03/1919 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 43.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1700 6315 759 04/1919 19/09/1941 Gorton 22.42
1943 2888 6521 3821 63821 10/1918 29/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 44.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Horwich)
1259c 1948 6259 3822 63822 10/1918 20/03/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 45.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1949 2944 6608 3823 63823 10/1918 08/08/1962 Ardsley 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1952 2889 6516 3824 E3824 63824 11/1918 16/06/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1953 6508 750 11/1918 05/10/1941 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22.92
1954 6509 704 11/1918 13/09/1941 Grantham 22.83
1306c 1956 2945 6306 3827 63827 11/1918 12/01/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 45.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1957 2946 6609 3828 63828 12/1918 29/08/1965 Langwith Junction 46.67 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
1959 2947 6304 3829 63829 12/1918 12/03/1964 Langwith Junction 45.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
1962 6610 729 01/1919 20/09/1941 Heaton 22.67
1963 2865 6301 710 01/1919 20/09/1941 Heaton 22.67
1969 2875 6303 3832 63832 02/1919 29/12/1962 Frodingham 43.83 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1971 6531 3833 63833 02/1919 19/01/1962 Langwith Junction 42.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1975 6260 775 10/1918 13/10/1941 Frodingham 23
1976 6611 3835 63835 10/1918 23/02/1959 Mexborough 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1978 2885 6522 3836 63836 10/1918 29/04/1964 Frodingham 45.5 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
1979 2893 6523 3837 63837 11/1918 29/12/1962 Colwick 44.08 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
1981 6261 3838 63838 11/1918 27/10/1962 04/06/1949
to O1
Annesley 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
1991 2861 6305 3839 63839 12/1918 03/04/1959 Colwick 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1993 6524 3840 63840 01/1919 18/09/1963 Langwith Junction 44.67
1995 2949 6302 3841 63841 02/1919 01/03/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 45.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1998 6257 3842 E3842 63842 02/1919 04/04/1965 Langwith Junction 46.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
2000 6612 3843 E3843 63843 02/1919 07/11/1965 Langwith Junction 46.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
2001 6613 749 02/1919 19/09/1941 Heaton 22.58
1 2005 5001 3626 63626 01/1919 22/06/1961 Frodingham 42.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
5 2006 5005 044 3627 63627 03/1919 22/02/1952 Langwith Junction 32.92
8 2007 5008 3628 63628 03/1919 05/09/1965 Frodingham 46.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1643 6311 3720 63720 05/1919 05/03/1964 Langwith Junction 44.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1645 2858 6331 3721 63721 06/1919 03/11/1962 Gorton 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1727 6560 708 09/1919 13/09/1941 Annesley 22
1728 6561 3641 63641 09/1919 15/09/1962 Gorton 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1729 6538 3642 63642 07/1919 18/11/1959 Frodingham 40.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1800 6298 3883 63883 04/1919 29/12/1962 Mexborough 43.67 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
2043 6614 3845 63845 05/1919 22/06/1961 Staveley (G.C.) 42.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1256c 2044 2836 6256 3846 63846 05/1919 02/06/1964 Langwith Junction 45.08 Cut W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)
2046 2837 6290 3847 63847 05/1919 04/05/1959 Staveley (G.C.) 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2047 2838 6291 3848 63848 05/1919 03/11/1962 Gorton 43.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2048 6615 041 3849 63849 06/1919 22/02/1952 Colwick 32.67
2052 2849 6294 3850 63850 06/1919 20/06/1965 Langwith Junction 46 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
2053 2854 6299 3851 63851 06/1919 16/04/1959 Mexborough 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2054 2855 6289 3852 E3852 63852 06/1919 30/01/1964 Staveley (G.C.) 44.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1292c 2055 2851 6292 3853 63853 06/1919 26/11/1963 Langwith Junction 44.42
2056 2850 6526 3854 63854 06/1919 17/11/1962 07/06/1946
to O1
Annesley 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2059 6616 3855 63855 06/1919 31/03/1959 Doncaster 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2062 2835 6617 3856 E3856 63856 06/1919 26/11/1962 22/10/1949
to O1
Tyne Dock 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2063 6618 3857 63857 07/1919 08/08/1962 Ardsley 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2064 6619 3858 E3858 63858 07/1919 17/04/1966 Doncaster 46.75 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath)
2065 6620 3859 63859 07/1919 18/10/1963 Colwick 44.25 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
2066 6621 3860 63860 07/1919 05/10/1961 Colwick 42.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2068 6622 3861 63861 07/1919 21/02/1965 Langwith Junction 45.58 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate)
2073 6532 3862 63862 08/1919 03/11/1962 Gorton 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2074 6533 3863 63863 08/1919 20/06/1965 01/09/1945
to O1
Staveley (Barrow Hill) 45.83 Cut R A Kings (Norwich)
2075 6534 3864 63864 08/1919 08/08/1962 Ardsley 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2076 6535 3865 E3865 63865 08/1919 17/11/1962 09/02/1946
to O1
Doncaster 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2078 6623 716 08/1919 13/09/1941 Woodford Halse 22.08
2079 6624 3867 63867 08/1919 17/11/1962 02/09/1944
to O1
Annesley 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2081 6625 3868 63868 08/1919 11/07/1965 24/02/1945
to O1
Langwith Junction 45.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/11/1965 46.25
2082 6626 3869 63869 08/1919 17/11/1962 02/12/1944
to O1
Annesley 43.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2084 6627 3870 E3870 63870 09/1919 26/01/1962 Langwith Junction 42.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2087 6628 786 10/1919 18/10/1941 Grantham 22
2094 2845 6525 3872 63872 05/1919 30/01/1964 18/05/1946
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 44.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
2095 6629 3873 63873 05/1919 15/01/1966 Colwick 46.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering)
2096 6630 3874 63874 06/1919 26/11/1962 10/06/1944
to O1
Tyne Dock 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2098 2856 6527 791 06/1919 18/10/1941 March 22.33
2099 2857 6528 3876 63876 06/1919 10/03/1959 Mexborough 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2101 2853 6529 3877 63877 06/1919 21/03/1965 Langwith Junction 45.75 Cut Arnott Young (Rawmarsh, Rotherham)
2104 2833 6631 3878 63878 06/1919 14/03/1965 Staveley (G.C.) 45.75 Cut Steelbreaking and Dismantling Co. (Chesterfield)
2110 6288 3879 63879 07/1919 11/07/1965 04/11/1944
to O1
Staveley (Barrow Hill) 46 Cut Drapers (Hull) 27/09/1965 46.24
2112 6286 3880 63880 07/1919 17/03/1963 Frodingham 43.67 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
2116 6632 3881 63881 07/1919 09/12/1962 Sheffield Darnall 43.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Derby)
2121 2978 6287 3882 63882 08/1919 23/05/1965 Langwith Junction 45.75 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)
2126 6633 3884 63884 08/1919 09/06/1964 Frodingham 44.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
2132 6634 3885 63885 09/1919 08/08/1962 Ardsley 42.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2133 6635 3886 63886 09/1919 27/10/1962 03/08/1946
to O1
Annesley 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
2134 6636 3887 63887 09/1919 02/03/1963 02/03/1946
to O1
Staveley (G.C.) 43.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2135 6637 3888 E3888 63888 09/1919 01/04/1960 Sheffield Darnall 40.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2136 6638 3889 E3889 63889 09/1919 02/12/1959 Sheffield Darnall 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2144 2846 6639 3890 63890 05/1919 17/03/1963 06/07/1946
to O1
March 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2145 2847 6295 3891 63891 05/1919 13/09/1961 Mexborough 42.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2147 2842 6297 785 06/1919 18/10/1941 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 22.33
2148 2852 6293 3893 E3893 63893 06/1919 20/06/1965 Langwith Junction 46 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1300c 2149 2843 6300 3894 63894 06/1919 11/07/1960 Mexborough 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2150 2840 6296 3895 63895 06/1919 21/07/1962 Gorton 43.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
2152 2841 6530 727 06/1919 13/09/1941 Colwick 22.25
2153 6254 3897 63897 06/1919 22/05/1963 Frodingham 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2157 6253 3898 63898 06/1919 02/05/1963 Frodingham 43.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2160 6640 3899 63899 10/1919 25/05/1963 Staveley (G.C.) 43.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2162 6641 3900 63900 11/1919 23/09/1962 Colwick 42.83 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
2165 6642 3901 63901 12/1919 17/11/1962 27/10/1945
to O1
Annesley 42.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
1636 6312 778 07/1919 11/10/1941 Woodford Halse 22.25
1638 6330 744 07/1919 19/09/1941 Gorton 22.17
1640 2831 6329 3724 E3724 63724 08/1919 08/08/1962 43 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1641 2832 6328 3725 63725 08/1919 11/07/1965 31/03/1945
to O1
Staveley (Barrow Hill) 45.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/10/1965 46.17
1737 6500 3726 63726 10/1919 23/04/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.5 Cut Hesslewoods (Attercliffe)
1738 2977 6327 788 10/1919 18/10/1941 March 22
1739 6308 3728 63728 10/1919 20/12/1964 Frodingham 45.17 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1309c 1741 6309 3729 63729 11/1919 31/03/1959 Colwick 39.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1743 2961 6326 3730 63730 11/1919 02/01/1966 Doncaster 46.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1746 6307 3731 63731 12/1919 29/10/1963 Langwith Junction 43.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton)
1747 6501 3732 63732 12/1919 05/09/1965 Langwith Junction 45.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
1748 6502 3733 63733 04/1920 14/01/1960 Sheffield Darnall 39.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
1749 6503 3734 63734 04/1920 08/08/1965 Doncaster 45.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/10/1965 45.52
412 5412 3902 63902 01/1918 11/04/1965 Langwith Junction 47.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
413 5413 770 03/1918 08/11/1941 Mexborough 23.67
414 5414 3904 E3904 63904 04/1918 23/11/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 43.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
415 5415 3905 63905 05/1918 08/04/1959 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 40.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
417 5417 3906 E3906 63906 06/1918 03/01/1965 Frodingham 46.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/04/1965 46.84
418 5418 3907 63907 08/1918 22/05/1964 Langwith Junction 45.75 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
419 5419 3908 63908 09/1918 01/10/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 45.08
420 5420 733 04/1919 14/09/1941 March 22.42
421 5421 781 07/1919 11/10/1941 March 22.25
422 5422 3911 63911 06/1919 09/12/1962 Mexborough 43.5 Cut Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)
10 5010 3912 63912 08/1919 09/12/1962 Langwith Junction 43.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
11 5011 3913 E3913 63913 08/1919 06/06/1965 Staveley (G.C.) 45.83 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)
12 5012 3914 63914 09/1919 28/05/1964 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 44.67 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)
13 5013 3915 63915 10/1919 23/06/1961 Gorton 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
14 5014 787 11/1920 25/10/1941 Mexborough 20.92
15 5015 3917 63917 12/1920 05/06/1962 Frodingham 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)
17 5017 766 12/1920 18/10/1941 Mexborough 20.83
19 5019 721 01/1921 14/09/1941 Frodingham 20.67
22 5022 3920 63920 02/1921 08/08/1962 Wakefield 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Gorton)