Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 862 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 4479 Week
» 16184 Month
» 347673 Year
» 424260 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "P1" Class 2-8-2


LNER (1924) LNER (1946) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2393 3990 27/06/1925 Doncaster 24/07/1945 New England 20.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
2394 3991 14/11/1925 Doncaster 05/07/1945 New England 19.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster)