Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 162 Today
» 1231 Yesterday
» 1393 Week
» 13098 Month
» 344587 Year
» 421174 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Robinson "Q4" Class 0-8-0


GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1052 6052 3200 63200 11/1902 05/09/1949 Ardsley 46.83
1053 6053 11/1902 Mexborough 28/02/1939 Barnsley 36.25
1054 6054 3201 63201 1902 22/01/1951 Barnsley 49.08
56 5056 3202 63202 09/1903 Barnsley 25/09/1951 Ardsley 48
57 5057 3203 09/1903 06/11/1950 Barnsley 47.17
58 5058 9925 69925 10/1903 Mexborough 13/08/1954 25/06/1942
to Q1
Eastfield 50.83
59 5059 3204 63204 10/1903 Barnsley 25/06/1951 Ardsley 47.67
64 5064 3205 10/1903 26/12/1950 Ardsley 47.17
65 5065 3206 10/1903 26/02/1949 Grantham 45.33
67 5067 3207 63207 10/1903 07/08/1950 Ardsley 46.83
68 5068 9934 69934 11/1903 Barnsley 20/08/1959 06/09/1944
to Q1
Frodingham 55.75
70 5070 9929 69929 11/1903 Sheffield Neepsend 28/08/1959 13/11/1943
to Q1
Frodingham 55.75
71 5071 11/1903 Staveley (G.C.) 07/06/1939 Barnsley 35.58
85 5085 3210 11/1903 10/10/1949 Ardsley 45.92
86 5086 11/1903 Staveley (G.C.) 10/04/1937 Staveley (G.C.) 33.42
87 5087 9933 69933 11/1903 Barnsley 11/12/1958 20/05/1944
to Q1
Selby 55.08
91 5091 11/1903 Barnsley 17/11/1937 Barnsley 34
92 5092 3212 11/1903 23/05/1949 Barnsley 45.5
135 5135 01/1904 Mexborough 10/06/1937 Ardsley 33.42
136 5136 3213 01/1904 19/06/1950 Ardsley 46.42
137 5137 3214 01/1904 Barnsley 16/05/1949 Barnsley 45.33
138 5138 9937 69937 02/1904 05/11/1956 08/09/1945
to Q1
Frodingham 52.75
139 5139 02/1904 Keadby 18/08/1934 Frodingham 30.5
140 5140 02/1904 Keadby 27/11/1937 Frodingham 33.75
142 5142 3216 63216 03/1904 Barnsley 05/09/1949 Barnsley 45.5
143 5143 03/1904 Keadby 17/11/1939 Barnsley 35.67
144 5144 03/1904 Immingham 14/05/1938 Ardsley 34.17
145 5145 03/1904 Mexborough 21/09/1936 Mexborough 32.5
146 5146 3217 63217 03/1904 14/03/1951 Ardsley 47
147 5147 9935 69935 03/1904 Keadby 03/09/1959 16/01/1945
to Q1
Frodingham 55.5
148 5148 04/1904 Mexborough 29/10/1938 Ardsley 34.5
149 5149 04/1904 Mexborough 09/12/1939 Barnsley 35.67
150 5150 04/1904 Keadby 06/03/1939 Frodingham 34.92
151 5151 05/1904 Mexborough 16/05/1939 Frodingham 35
152 5152 3219 05/1904 26/12/1949 Barnsley 45.58
153 5153 3220 63220 05/1904 Keadby 14/03/1951 Barnsley 46.83
1073 6073 07/1905 Mexborough 10/12/1935 Ardsley 30.42
1074 6074 07/1905 Keadby 20/01/1936 Frodingham 30.5
1075 6075 08/1905 06/01/1940 Ardsley 34.42
1076 6076 3221 E3221 08/1905 26/12/1950 Ardsley 45.33
1077 6077 3222 69930 08/1905 02/10/1958 11/12/1943
to Q1
Frodingham 53.17
1132 6132 3223 63223 02/1907 11/06/1951 Ardsley 44.33
1133 6133 3224 02/1907 26/02/1949 Ardsley 42
1134 6134 3225 63225 02/1907 25/09/1951 Ardsley 44.58
1135 6135 3226 03/1907 Langwith Junction 16/10/1950 Ardsley 43.58
1136 6136 3227 63227 03/1907 26/05/1951 Ardsley 44.17
1137 6137 03/1907 Langwith Junction 28/02/1939 Ardsley 31.92
1138 6138 03/1907 Langwith Junction 05/12/1934 Colwick 27.75
1139 6139 9927 69927 03/1907 Langwith Junction 18/04/1956 26/12/1942
to Q1
Eastfield 49.08
1140 6140 3228 03/1907 15/08/1949 Grantham 42.42
1141 6141 03/1907 Langwith Junction 31/01/1939 Langwith Junction 31.83
1142 6142 03/1907 Langwith Junction 22/05/1937 Langwith Junction 30.17
1143 6143 04/1907 Langwith Junction 16/05/1936 Ardsley 29.08
1144 6144 04/1907 Keadby 07/01/1938 Immingham 30.75
39 5039 3229 02/1909 Keadby 04/12/1950 Barnsley 41.83
44 5044 9931 69931 04/1909 Mexborough 26/11/1958 28/01/1944
to Q1
Selby 49.58
48 5048 9928 69928 05/1909 20/08/1959 20/03/1943
to Q1
Frodingham 50.25
49 5049 06/1909 17/11/1939 Mexborough 30.42
62 5062 06/1909 Mexborough 08/05/1937 Barnsley 27.92
63 5063 07/1909 Keadby 22/06/1936 Immingham 26.92
5212 08/1909 Staveley (G.C.) 12/03/1938 Barnsley 28.58
213 5213 09/1909 Sheffield Neepsend 13/07/1938 Barnsley 28.83
356 5356 10/1909 08/05/1937 Frodingham 27.58
159 5159 3231 10/1909 20/03/1950 Ardsley 40.42
160 5160 3232 63232 11/1909 05/06/1950 Ardsley 40.58
161 5161 3233 63233 11/1909 06/02/1950 Barnsley 40.25
162 5162 3234 63234 12/1909 05/03/1951 Ardsley 41.25
163 5163 3235 E3235 12/1909 07/05/1951 Barnsley 41.42
164 5164 3236 63236 12/1909 26/05/1951 Ardsley 41.42
401 5401 06/1910 Mexborough 22/12/1937 Mexborough 27.5
956 5956 08/1910 Keadby 04/07/1939 Immingham 28.92
957 5957 08/1910 Langwith Junction 28/04/1936 Langwith Junction 25.67
958 5958 08/1910 Mexborough 05/03/1937 Langwith Junction 26.58
959 5959 9932 69932 09/1910 12/11/1958 04/03/1944
to Q1
Frodingham 48.17
960 5960 10/1910 Mexborough 02/05/1936 Mexborough 25.58
961 5961 9926 69926 11/1910 03/02/1958 21/11/1942
to Q1
Frodingham 47.25
962 5962 3238 11/1910 06/02/1950 Barnsley 39.25
963 5963 1910 Mexborough 03/10/1936 Ardsley 26.83
964 5964 12/1910 Immingham 30/08/1938 Frodingham 27.67
965 5965 12/1910 Mexborough 29/10/1938 Ardsley 27.83
1174 6174 06/1910 Mexborough 05/06/1936 Ardsley 26
1175 6175 3239 06/1910 19/07/1943 Ardsley 33.08
1176 6176 3240 63240 07/1910 Langwith Junction 13/06/1951 Ardsley 40.92
1177 6177 3241 1910 17/04/1950 Ardsley 40.33
1178 6178 10/1910 15/08/1939 28.83
1179 6179 9936 69936 11/1910 Langwith Junction 15/09/1959 28/04/1945
to Q1
Frodingham 48.83
1180 6180 3243 E3243 63243 01/1911 15/10/1951 Ardsley 40.75
1181 6181 01/1911 Immingham 16/03/1939 Ardsley 28.17
1182 6182 02/1911 Mexborough 16/05/1939 Ardsley 28.25