Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 798 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1664 Week
» 26326 Month
» 285185 Year
» 796287 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NER/LNER Worsdell "Q5" Class 0-8-0


NER LNER (1946) BR (Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2116 3250 63250 08/1901 Annfield Plain 26/06/1948 West Hartlepool 46.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1948
2117 3251 63251 09/1901 Newport (Teeside) 20/12/1950 Borough Gardens 49.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
2118 3252 63252 10/1901 Shildon 07/02/1948 Haverton Hill 46.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1948
2119 3253 63253 10/1901 Shildon 22/11/1948 West Hartlepool 47.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 47.20
2120 3254 63254 10/1901 Newport (Teeside) 11/06/1948 Borough Gardens 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1948 46.70
2121 3255 63255 10/1901 Newport (Teeside) 03/11/1949 Selby 48.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 48.20
2122 3256 63256 11/1901 Newport (Teeside) 12/06/1950 Middlesbrough 48.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1950
2123 3257 63257 12/1901 Newport (Teeside) 27/11/1950 Borough Gardens 48.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1950 48.95
2124 3258 12/1901 Annfield Plain 26/04/1947 West Hartlepool 45.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
2125 3259 63259 12/1901 Shildon 09/05/1951 Borough Gardens 49.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
130 3260 E3260 63260 03/1902 Hull Dairycoates 21/06/1950 Middlesbrough 48.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1950
527 3261 E3261 63261 03/1902 Newport (Teeside) 31/10/1950 Borough Gardens 48.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1950
1002 3262 63262 03/1902 Hull Dairycoates 22/08/1950 Selby 48.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1950
1320 3263 63263 03/1902 Newport (Teeside) 01/11/1948 Middlesbrough 46.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 46.79
1700 3264 63264 04/1902 Newport (Teeside) 26/06/1948 Borough Gardens 46.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1948 46.20
1704 3265 04/1902 Newport (Teeside) 26/04/1947 Newport (Teeside) 45 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1708 3266 05/1902 Starbeck 22/11/1947 Middlesbrough 45.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1709 3267 63267 05/1902 Borough Gardens 06/06/1951 Borough Gardens 49.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1951 49.12
1717 3268 63268 06/1902 Starbeck 07/02/1948 Middlesbrough 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1948 45.70
1729 3269 06/1902 Stockton 19/07/1947 Middlesbrough 45.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1682 3270 63270 12/1902 Hull Dairycoates 10/08/1951 York (North) 48.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1951 48.70
1684 3271 63271 12/1902 Newport (Teeside) 22/11/1950 Borough Gardens 47.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1950 47.95
1685 3272 63272 12/1902 Newport (Teeside) 03/07/1950 Middlesbrough 47.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1950 47.61
1694 3273 63273 02/1903 Hull Dairycoates 28/03/1949 Middlesbrough 46.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1949 46.19
83 3274 63274 03/1903 Shildon 18/09/1950 Newport (Teeside) 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1950 47.62
162 3275 63275 06/1903 Haverton Hill 18/04/1949 Haverton Hill 45.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1949 45.95
1696 3276 63276 03/1903 Shildon 20/02/1950 Selby 46.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1950 46.96
410 3277 63277 04/1903 Newport (Teeside) 02/05/1949 Darlington 46.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1949 46.12
474 3278 63278 04/1903 Newport (Teeside) 30/08/1950 Selby 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1950 47.37
1186 3279 63279 05/1903 Newport (Teeside) 14/02/1948 Selby 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1948 44.79
650 3280 63280 06/1903 Newport (Teeside) 25/10/1950 Selby 47.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1950 47.45
651 3281 E3281 63281 06/1903 East Hartlepool 12/06/1950 Middlesbrough 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1950 47.03
1009 3282 63282 06/1903 Newport (Teeside) 11/12/1950 Middlesbrough 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
1731 3283 63283 06/1903 Newport (Teeside) 19/12/1950 Borough Gardens 47.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
1757 3284 63284 06/1903 Newport (Teeside) 13/06/1951 Borough Gardens 48 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1951 48.03
715 3285 63285 09/1903 Hull Dairycoates 27/09/1950 Selby 47 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1950 47.12
785 3286 63286 09/1903 Hull Dairycoates 11/04/1949 Selby 45.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1949 45.61
792 3287 63287 10/1903 Newport (Teeside) 29/11/1950 Borough Gardens 47.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1950 47.12
1128 3288 10/1903 Stockton 02/08/1947 Haverton Hill 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1218 3289 63289 11/1903 Newport (Teeside) 21/08/1950 Middlesbrough 46.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1950 46.78
1110 3290 63290 12/1903 Newport (Teeside) 25/07/1950 Selby 46.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 07/1950 46.61
1669 3291 63291 12/1903 Newport (Teeside) 12/02/1949 Middlesbrough 45.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 45.20
411 3292 63292 03/1904 Haverton Hill 08/11/1948 Middlesbrough 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 44.78
430 3293 63293 02/1904 Newport (Teeside) 09/01/1950 Middlesbrough 45.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1950 45.95
443 3294 63294 03/1904 Hull Dairycoates 03/11/1949 Selby 45.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1949 45.70
444 3295 63295 03/1904 Shildon 22/11/1948 Middlesbrough 44.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 44.78
1111 3296 E3296 63296 03/1904 Haverton Hill 22/08/1949 Borough Gardens 45.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 08/1949 45.45
1149 3297 63297 04/1904 Scarborough 22/02/1949 West Hartlepool 44.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 44.87
1150 3298 63298 04/1904 Newport (Teeside) 27/02/1948 Borough Gardens 43.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1948 43.87
1173 3299 63299 05/1904 Hull Dairycoates 12/02/1949 Haverton Hill 44.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 44.79
578 3300 63300 06/1907 Hull Springhead 16/05/1949 Newport (Teeside) 41.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1949 42.03
660 3301 63301 06/1907 Stockton 31/12/1948 Haverton Hill 41.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 41.70
939 3302 06/1907 Shildon 18/09/1947 Blaydon 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1031 3303 63303 08/1907 Blyth (North) 23/04/1951 Borough Gardens 43.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1951 43.78
1032 3304 09/1907 19/07/1947 Darlington 39.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
1054 3305 63305 09/1907 Blyth (North) 16/05/1949 Middlesbrough 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1949 41.78
1062 3306 63306 10/1907 Hull Dairycoates 20/12/1948 Haverton Hill 41.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 41.20
1177 3307 63307 10/1907 Hull Dairycoates 16/05/1949 Darlington 41.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1949 41.61
1178 3308 63308 10/1907 Newport (Teeside) 12/02/1949 Middlesbrough 41.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 41.37
1215 3309 11/1907 Hull Dairycoates 07/12/1946 West Hartlepool 39.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
644 3310 63310 12/1907 Blyth (North) 11/06/1948 Selby 40.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 06/1948 40.53
645 3311 E3311 63311 12/1907 Hull Dairycoates 29/09/1951 Haverton Hill 43.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
646 3312 63312 12/1907 Shildon 22/08/1949 Selby 41.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1949 42.03
647 3313 63313 12/1907 Selby 21/11/1949 Selby 41.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 09/1950 42.78
648 3314 E3314 63314 03/1908 Newport (Teeside) 03/09/1951 Haverton Hill 43.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
652 3315 63315 03/1908 Hull Dairycoates 25/03/1948 Neville Hill 40 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1948 40.11
653 3316 63316 03/1908 Shildon 04/04/1949 Middlesbrough 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 04/1949 41.11
654 3317 63317 04/1908 Borough Gardens 12/02/1949 Middlesbrough 40.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1948 39.86
655 3318 63318 05/1908 Annfield Plain 27/06/1949 Middlesbrough 41.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1949
656 3319 63319 05/1908 Hull Springhead 18/04/1951 Selby 42.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1951 43.03
642 3320 06/1911 Shildon 22/03/1947 Hull Botanic Gardens 35.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
643 3321 63321 06/1911 Annfield Plain 06/03/1948 Borough Gardens 36.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1948
657 3322 63322 06/1911 Shildon 12/02/1949 Middlesbrough 37.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 37.70
658 3323 63323 1911 Shildon 08/11/1948 Middlesbrough 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948
659 3324 06/1911 Newport (Teeside) 16/10/1947 36.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
661 3325 07/1911 Selby 22/03/1947 Tyne Dock 35.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
669 3326 E3326 63326 07/1911 Hull Dairycoates 06/10/1951 Borough Gardens 40.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 11/1951 40.36
764 3327 63327 08/1911 Hull Springhead 22/11/1948 Newport (Teeside) 37.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 12/1948 37.36
767 3328 63328 08/1911 Tyne Dock 13/01/1951 Middlesbrough 39.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1951
769 3329 08/1911 East Hartlepool 21/12/1946 Selby 35.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
770 3330 63330 09/1911 Blyth (North) 28/12/1949 Darlington 38.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1950 38.36
771 3331 63331 09/1911 Hull Dairycoates 12/02/1949 Haverton Hill 37.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1949 37.45
772 3332 63332 09/1911 Shildon 22/03/1949 Middlesbrough 37.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 03/1949 37.52
773 3333 63333 09/1911 Hull Dairycoates 21/12/1950 Middlesbrough 39.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1951 39.45
774 3334 63334 10/1911 Shildon 16/05/1949 Darlington 37.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 05/1949 37.61
781 3335 63335 10/1911 Shildon 29/08/1949 Darlington 37.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 1949
783 3336 63336 10/1911 East Hartlepool 16/10/1950 Selby 39 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 10/1950 39.03
789 3337 11/1911 Newport (Teeside) 02/08/1947 Darlington 35.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
793 3338 63338 11/1911 Blyth (North) 01/10/1949 Newport (Teeside) 37.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington)
794 3339 63339 11/1911 Newport (Teeside) 07/02/1948 Middlesbrough 36.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 02/1948 36.28