NER/LNER Worsdell "T1" Class 4-8-0T
NER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1350 | 9910 | 69910 | 09/1909 | 17/10/1959 | 50.08 | 50.12 | ||||||
1351 | 9911 | 69911 | 09/1909 | 19/03/1957 | 47.5 | 47.61 | ||||||
1352 | 9912 | 69912 | 10/1909 | 17/10/1959 | 50 | 50.20 | ||||||
1353 | 9913 | 69913 | 11/1909 | 08/01/1958 | 48.17 | 48.20 | ||||||
1354 | 9914 | 69914 | 12/1909 | 15/08/1955 | 45.67 | 45.70 | ||||||
1355 | 12/1909 | 05/1937 | 27.42 | 27.43 | ||||||||
1356 | 9915 | 69915 | 02/1910 | 16/03/1959 | 49.08 | 49.11 | ||||||
1357 | 9916 | 69916 | 03/1910 | 12/08/1957 | 47.42 | 47.45 | ||||||
1358 | 04/1910 | 05/1937 | 27.08 | 27.10 | ||||||||
1359 | 9917 | 69917 | 04/1910 | 02/11/1959 | 49.58 | 49.62 | ||||||
1656 | 9918 | 69918 | 11/1925 | 01/10/1958 | 32.92 | 32.94 | ||||||
1657 | 9919 | 69919 | 11/1925 | 21/02/1955 | 29.25 | 29.43 | ||||||
1658 | 9920 | 69920 | 11/1925 | 12/01/1959 | 33.17 | 33.19 | ||||||
1659 | 9921 | 69921 | 12/1925 | 12/06/1961 | 35.5 | 35.52 | ||||||
1660 | 9922 | 69922 | 12/1925 | 22/10/1956 | 30.83 | 30.85 |