Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 1210 Yesterday
» 7332 Week
» 21909 Month
» 385154 Year
» 461741 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V1" Class 2-6-2T


LNER (Orig) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2900 7600 67600 09/1930 29/12/1962 03/1956
to V3
32.25 33.10
2901 7601 67601 10/1930 22/01/1962 31.25 31.94
2902 7602 67602 10/1930 07/05/1962 31.58 32.19
2903 7603 67603 10/1930 02/04/1962 31.5 32.52
2904 7604 67604 11/1930 29/12/1962 11/1952
to V3
32.08 32.68
2905 7605 67605 11/1930 29/12/1962 10/1953
to V3
32.08 32.77
2906 7606 67606 12/1930 29/12/1962 12/1952
to V3
32 32.69
2907 7607 67607 12/1930 29/12/1962 04/1958
to V3
32 32.94
2908 7608 67608 12/1930 29/12/1962 02/1961
to V3
32 32.60
2909 7609 67609 02/1931 05/02/1962 10/1953
to V3
31 32.02
2910 7610 67610 04/1931 06/1961 30.17 30.27
2911 7611 67611 04/1931 29/12/1962 07/1953
to V3
31.67 32.52
2912 7612 67612 04/1931 01/1961 09/1953
to V3
29.75 30.27
2913 7613 67613 05/1931 25/01/1962 04/1956
to V3
30.67 31.69
2914 7614 67614 06/1931 30/07/1962 09/1958
to V3
31.08 31.19
2915 7615 67615 06/1931 29/12/1962 12/1953
to V3
31.5 32.19
2916 7616 67616 07/1931 29/12/1962 05/1960
to V3
31.42 32.27
2917 7617 67617 08/1931 08/1962 10/1957
to V3
31 32.11
2918 7618 67618 08/1931 29/12/1962 09/1958
to V3
31.33 32.27
2919 7619 67619 08/1931 29/12/1962 02/1957
to V3
31.33 32.19
2920 7620 67620 10/1931 11/1964 07/1953
to V3
33.08 33.86
2921 7621 67621 10/1931 29/12/1962 12/1959
to V3
31.17 32.02
2922 7622 67622 10/1931 05/03/1962 Parkhead 30.42 31.44
2923 7623 67623 11/1931 25/01/1962 05/1959
to V3
30.17 31.85
2924 7624 67624 11/1931 09/1960 11/1952
to V3
28.83 29.10
2925 7625 67625 12/1931 29/12/1962 08/1953
to V3
31 31.94
2926 7626 67626 12/1931 29/12/1962 05/1953
to V3
31 31.85
2927 7627 67627 12/1931 08/1961 09/1953
to V3
29.67 29.77
2928 7628 67628 12/1934 11/1964 01/1957
to V3
29.92 30.19
2929 7629 67629 02/1935 07/05/1962 27.25 27.68
2930 7630 67630 03/1935 29/12/1962 27.75 28.69
2931 7631 67631 03/1935 05/03/1962 27 28.10
2932 7632 67632 03/1935 29/12/1962 05/1957
to V3
27.75 28.69
2933 7633 67633 04/1935 29/12/1962 02/1960
to V3
27.67 28.52
417 7634 67634 04/1935 16/04/1962 10/1940
to V3
27 27.19
446 7635 67635 04/1935 09/1953 10/1960
to V3
18.42 28.61
477 7636 67636 05/1935 11/1964 11/1952
to V3
29.5 30.27
479 7637 67637 05/1935 24/05/1962 27 27.94
481 7638 67638 05/1935 11/1964 01/1955
to V3
29.5 29.78
484 7639 67639 06/1935 22/10/1962 27.33 27.69
486 7640 67640 06/1935 11/1964 12/1960
to V3
29.42 29.69
487 7641 67641 06/1935 22/10/1962 27.33 27.69
497 7642 67642 07/1935 06/1964 04/1960
to V3
28.92 29.11
498 7643 67643 07/1935 11/1964 05/1956
to V3
29.33 29.61
402 7644 67644 08/1935 07/05/1962 07/1958
to V3
26.75 27.60
414 7645 67645 08/1935 29/12/1962 11/1959
to V3
27.33 28.19
415 7646 67646 10/1935 11/1964 05/1956
to V3
29.08 29.36
416 7647 67647 11/1935 21/01/1963 12/1959
to V3
27.17 27.60
418 7648 67648 12/1935 25/01/1962 11/1959
to V3
26.08 27.19
2897 7649 67649 12/1935 09/07/1962 26.58 27.68
419 7650 67650 01/1936 08/1961 09/1958
to V3
25.58 27.77
422 7651 67651 01/1936 05/1964 05/1956
to V3
28.33 28.60
423 7652 67652 01/1936 12/1963 10/1952
to V3
27.92 28.02
428 7653 67653 02/1936 09/1963 09/1954
to V3
27.58 27.85
440 7654 67654 03/1936 09/1963 10/1954
to V3
27.5 27.69
2898 7655 67655 03/1936 05/03/1962 26 27.44
454 7656 67656 03/1936 12/1963 07/1952
to V3
27.75 27.94
455 7657 67657 04/1936 29/12/1962 02/1956
to V3
26.67 27.10
461 7658 67658 04/1936 09/1963 01/1960
to V3
27.42 27.85
465 7659 67659 05/1936 12/02/1962 25.75 25.85
466 7660 67660 07/1936 05/02/1962 05/1956
to V3
25.58 26.02
2899 7661 67661 10/1936 05/02/1962 02/1959
to V3
25.33 25.52
404 7662 67662 07/1938 14/01/1963 02/1955
to V3
24.5 25.02
407 7663 67663 07/1938 09/1963 02/1956
to V3
25.17 25.44
420 7664 67664 07/1938 29/12/1962 24.42 25.27
424 7665 67665 08/1938 06/1961 22.83 23.02
425 7666 67666 08/1938 05/02/1962 01/1961
to V3
23.5 24.02
447 7667 67667 09/1938 02/08/1962 08/1958
to V3
23.92 25.27
448 7668 67668 10/1938 29/12/1962 05/1954
to V3
24.17 24.85
451 7669 67669 10/1938 09/1961 01/1943
to V3
22.92 23.43
467 7670 67670 10/1938 08/1961 06/1956
to V3
22.83 23.02
469 7671 67671 10/1938 07/1960 21.75 21.85
472 7672 67672 11/1938 29/12/1962 03/1943
to V3
24.08 25.10
478 7673 67673 11/1938 01/10/1962 23.92 24.43
480 7674 67674 11/1938 29/12/1962 08/1957
to V3
24.08 24.76
483 7675 67675 12/1938 12/1962 10/1942
to V3
24 24.85
485 7676 67676 29/12/1938 30/07/1962 09/1960
to V3
23.58 24.81
488 7677 67677 07/01/1939 01/10/1962 09/1958
to V3
23.75 23.87
489 7678 67678 02/1939 11/1964 10/1958
to V3
25.75 26.02
490 7679 67679 02/1939 25/01/1962 10/1953
to V3
22.92 24.09
491 7680 67680 02/1939 29/12/1962 23.83 24.68
496 7681 67681 02/1939 16/11/1961 11/1957
to V3
22.75 23.18