Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V3" Class 2-6-2T


LNER (Orig) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2900 7600 67600 09/1930 03/1956
from V1
29/12/1962 32.25 33.10
2904 7604 67604 11/1930 11/1952
from V1
29/12/1962 32.08 32.68
2905 7605 67605 11/1930 10/1953
from V1
29/12/1962 32.08 32.77
2906 7606 67606 12/1930 12/1952
from V1
29/12/1962 32 32.69
2907 7607 67607 12/1930 04/1958
from V1
29/12/1962 32 32.94
2908 7608 67608 12/1930 02/1961
from V1
29/12/1962 32 32.60
2909 7609 67609 02/1931 10/1953
from V1
05/02/1962 31 32.02
2911 7611 67611 04/1931 07/1953
from V1
29/12/1962 31.67 32.52
2912 7612 67612 04/1931 09/1953
from V1
01/1961 29.75 30.27
2913 7613 67613 05/1931 04/1956
from V1
25/01/1962 30.67 31.69
2914 7614 67614 06/1931 09/1958
from V1
30/07/1962 31.08 31.19
2915 7615 67615 06/1931 12/1953
from V1
29/12/1962 31.5 32.19
2916 7616 67616 07/1931 05/1960
from V1
29/12/1962 31.42 32.27
2917 7617 67617 08/1931 10/1957
from V1
08/1962 31 32.11
2918 7618 67618 08/1931 09/1958
from V1
29/12/1962 31.33 32.27
2919 7619 67619 08/1931 02/1957
from V1
29/12/1962 31.33 32.19
2920 7620 67620 10/1931 07/1953
from V1
11/1964 33.08 33.86
2921 7621 67621 10/1931 12/1959
from V1
29/12/1962 31.17 32.02
2923 7623 67623 11/1931 05/1959
from V1
25/01/1962 30.17 31.85
2924 7624 67624 11/1931 11/1952
from V1
09/1960 28.83 29.10
2925 7625 67625 12/1931 08/1953
from V1
29/12/1962 31 31.94
2926 7626 67626 12/1931 05/1953
from V1
29/12/1962 31 31.85
2927 7627 67627 12/1931 24/10/1953
from V1
08/1961 29.67 29.77
2928 7628 67628 12/1934 01/1957
from V1
11/1964 29.92 30.19
2932 7632 67632 03/1935 05/1957
from V1
29/12/1962 27.75 28.69
2933 7633 67633 04/1935 02/1960
from V1
29/12/1962 27.67 28.52
417 7634 67634 04/1935 10/1940
from V1
16/04/1962 27 27.19
446 7635 67635 04/1935 10/1960
from V1
09/1953 18.42 28.61
477 7636 67636 05/1935 11/1952
from V1
11/1964 29.5 30.27
481 7638 67638 05/1935 19/02/1955
from V1
11/1964 29.5 29.78
486 7640 67640 06/1935 12/1960
from V1
11/1964 29.42 29.69
497 7642 67642 07/1935 02/04/1960
from V1
06/1964 28.92 29.11
498 7643 67643 07/1935 05/1956
from V1
11/1964 29.33 29.61
402 7644 67644 08/1935 07/1958
from V1
07/05/1962 26.75 27.60
414 7645 67645 08/1935 11/1959
from V1
29/12/1962 27.33 28.19
415 7646 67646 10/1935 05/1956
from V1
11/1964 29.08 29.36
416 7647 67647 11/1935 12/1959
from V1
21/01/1963 27.17 27.60
418 7648 67648 12/1935 11/1959
from V1
25/01/1962 26.08 27.19
419 7650 67650 01/1936 09/1958
from V1
08/1961 25.58 27.77
422 7651 67651 01/1936 05/1956
from V1
05/1964 28.33 28.60
423 7652 67652 01/1936 10/1952
from V1
12/1963 27.92 28.02
428 7653 67653 02/1936 23/10/1954
from V1
09/1963 27.58 27.85
440 7654 67654 03/1936 10/1954
from V1
09/1963 27.5 27.69
454 7656 67656 03/1936 07/1952
from V1
12/1963 27.75 27.94
455 7657 67657 04/1936 02/1956
from V1
29/12/1962 26.67 27.10
461 7658 67658 04/1936 01/1960
from V1
09/1963 27.42 27.85
466 7660 67660 07/1936 05/1956
from V1
05/02/1962 25.58 26.02
2899 7661 67661 10/1936 02/1959
from V1
05/02/1962 25.33 25.52
404 7662 67662 07/1938 02/1955
from V1
14/01/1963 24.5 25.02
407 7663 67663 07/1938 02/1956
from V1
09/1963 25.17 25.44
425 7666 67666 08/1938 01/1961
from V1
05/02/1962 23.5 24.02
447 7667 67667 09/1938 08/1958
from V1
02/08/1962 23.92 25.27
448 7668 67668 10/1938 05/1954
from V1
29/12/1962 24.17 24.85
451 7669 67669 10/1938 01/1943
from V1
09/1961 22.92 23.43
467 7670 67670 10/1938 06/1956
from V1
08/1961 22.83 23.02
472 7672 67672 11/1938 03/1943
from V1
29/12/1962 24.08 25.10
480 7674 67674 11/1938 08/1957
from V1
29/12/1962 24.08 24.76
483 7675 67675 12/1938 10/1942
from V1
12/1962 24 24.85
485 7676 67676 29/12/1938 12/11/1960
from V1
30/07/1962 23.58 24.81
488 7677 67677 07/01/1939 09/1958
from V1
01/10/1962 23.75 23.87
489 7678 67678 02/1939 10/1958
from V1
11/1964 25.75 26.02
490 7679 67679 02/1939 19/12/1953
from V1
25/01/1962 22.92 24.09
496 7681 67681 02/1939 11/1957
from V1
16/11/1961 22.75 23.18
390 7682 67682 09/1939 09/1963 24 24.18
391 7683 67683 10/1939 09/1963 23.92 24.18
392 7684 67684 10/1939 11/1964 25.08 25.85
393 7685 67685 12/1939 10/12/1962 23 23.35
395 7686 67686 12/1939 09/1963 23.75 24.02
396 7687 67687 12/1939 29/12/1962 23 23.52
397 7688 67688 02/1940 29/12/1962 22.83 23.35
398 7689 67689 02/1940 29/12/1962 22.83 23.60
399 7690 67690 03/1940 11/1964 24.67 24.94
401 7691 67691 04/1940 11/1964 24.58 24.85