Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Hill "Y4" Class 0-4-0T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR BR (Dept) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
227 7227 8125 68125 07/1913 Stratford 19/09/1955 Stratford 42.17 Cut
228 7228 8126 68126 10/1914 Stratford 23/10/1957 Stratford 43 Cut
226 7226 8127 68127 09/1914 Stratford 23/04/1956 Stratford 41.58 Cut
229 7229 8128 68128 01/1921 Stratford 08/10/1956 Stratford 35.75 Cut
210 7210 8129 68129 33 01/1921 12/1963 42.92