Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 96 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5674 Week
» 25407 Month
» 322421 Year
» 399008 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Webb "18" Passenger Tank" Class 0-6-2T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
6876 46876 09/1898 08/1949 Stafford 50.92
6878 46878 09/1898 28/02/1948 Monument Lane 49.42 49.86
6881 46881 08/1899 24/07/1948 Bushbury 48.92 49.28
6883 46883 08/1899 22/05/1948 Shrewsbury 48.75 48.87
6899 46899 08/1900 07/1952 Monument Lane 51.92
6900 46900 08/1900 02/1953 Monument Lane 52.5 52.62
6906 46906 08/1900 05/1951 Bangor 50.75 50.78
6909 46909 05/1901 27/03/1948 Shrewsbury 46.83 47.20
6912 46912 05/1901 12/1951 Monument Lane 50.58
6917 46917 05/1901 30/04/1949 Shrewsbury 47.92
6920 46920 03/1902 01/05/1948 Monument Lane 46.17 46.20
6922 46922 03/1902 07/1951 Monument Lane 49.33
6924 46924 03/1902 12/1949 Monument Lane 47.75
6926 46926 03/1902 14/02/1948 Bangor 45.92 46.12
6931 46931 06/1902 03/1949 Monument Lane 46.75