Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 130 Today
» 1283 Yesterday
» 3896 Week
» 26877 Month
» 390122 Year
» 466709 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 9F" Class 2-10-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
92000 31/01/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 07/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 11.5 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 11/1965 11.80
92001 31/01/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 01/1967 Wakefield 13 Cut Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge) 05/1967 13.29
92002 31/01/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 13.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 14.21
92003 31/01/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 03/1965 Radyr 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1965 11.46
92004 31/01/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 03/1968 Barrow in Furness 14.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 14.46
92005 28/02/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 08/1965 York (North) 11.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 12/1965 11.80
92006 28/02/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 04/1967 Wakefield 13.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1967 13.72
92007 28/02/1954 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 11.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 11.97
92008 31/03/1954 Wellingborough 10/1967 Warrington Dallam 13.58 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 08/1968 14.39
92009 31/03/1954 Wellingborough 03/1968 Barrow in Furness 14 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1968 14.30
92010 31/05/1954 March 04/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.92 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 06/1966 12.05
92011 31/05/1954 March 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 13.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1968 13.64
92012 31/05/1954 March 10/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 28/02/1968 13.76
92013 31/05/1954 March 10/1966 Saltley 12.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1967 12.96
92014 31/05/1954 March 10/1967 Croes Newydd 13.42 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1968 13.80
92015 30/09/1954 Wellingborough 04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1967 13.13
92016 31/10/1954 Wellingborough 10/1967 Barrow in Furness 13 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 04/1968 13.47
92017 31/10/1954 Wellingborough 12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.17 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 04/1968 13.47
92018 31/10/1954 Wellingborough 04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 08/1967 12.80
92019 31/10/1954 Wellingborough 06/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1968 13.22
92020 21/03/1955 Wellingborough 10/1967 Croes Newydd 12.58 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1968 13.08
92021 21/03/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1968 12.83
92022 21/03/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 13.08
92023 21/03/1955 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 13.08
92024 11/06/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 05/1968 12.94
92025 18/06/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 12.84
92026 18/06/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 12.84
92027 25/06/1955 Wellingborough 08/1967 Speke Junction 12.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1967 12.48
92028 09/07/1955 Wellingborough 10/1966 Saltley 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 11.53
92029 09/07/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.33 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 12.65
92030 07/11/1954 New England 02/1967 Wakefield 12.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 07/1967 12.69
92031 11/11/1954 March 01/1967 Newton Heath 12.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 05/1967 12.52
92032 17/11/1954 New England 04/1967 Croes Newydd 12.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 12.92
92033 19/11/1954 New England 09/1965 Northampton 10.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 12/1965 11.08
92034 02/12/1954 New England 05/1964 Immingham 9.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 08/1965 10.71
92035 03/12/1954 New England 02/1966 Immingham 11.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 11.37
92036 02/12/1954 New England 12/1964 New England 10 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1965 10.46
92037 08/12/1954 New England 02/1965 Immingham 10.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1965 10.53
92038 14/12/1954 New England 04/1965 Colwick 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 10.59
92039 17/12/1954 New England 10/1965 Colwick 10.83 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1966 11.09
92040 23/12/1954 New England 08/1965 Colwick 10.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 10.90
92041 31/12/1954 New England 08/1965 Colwick 10.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 10.88
92042 12/01/1955 New England 12/1965 Colwick 10.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 11.26
92043 18/01/1955 March 07/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/1966 11.75
92044 29/01/1955 March 04/1965 Colwick 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 10.47
92045 05/02/1955 Wellingborough 09/1967 Croes Newydd 12.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 28/02/1968 13.07
92046 12/02/1955 Wellingborough 10/1967 Croes Newydd 12.67 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1968 13.18
92047 19/02/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 13.16
92048 26/02/1955 Wellingborough 09/1967 Croes Newydd 12.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 28/02/1968 13.01
92049 12/03/1955 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 12.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 06/1968 13.27
92050 20/08/1955 Toton 09/1967 Warrington Dallam 12.08 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 28/02/1968 12.53
92051 27/08/1955 Toton 10/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 12.52
92052 27/08/1955 Toton 08/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1968 12.39
92053 17/09/1955 Toton 02/1966 Warrington Dallam 10.42 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 07/1966 10.83
92054 24/09/1955 Toton 05/1968 Speke Junction 12.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 06/1968 12.73
92055 24/09/1955 Toton 12/1967 Speke Junction 12.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1968 12.57
92056 31/10/1955 Toton 11/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 12.34
92057 31/10/1955 Toton 10/1965 Croes Newydd 10 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 12/1965 10.13
92058 31/10/1955 Toton 11/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 28/02/1968 12.34
92059 31/10/1955 Toton 09/1966 Croes Newydd 10.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 01/1967 11.22
92060 30/11/1955 Tyne Dock 10/1966 Tyne Dock 10.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 11.38
92061 30/11/1955 Tyne Dock 09/1966 Tyne Dock 10.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 10.97
92062 30/11/1955 Tyne Dock 06/1966 Tyne Dock 10.58 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 10/1966 10.88
92063 30/11/1955 Tyne Dock 11/1966 Tyne Dock 11 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 04/1967 11.38
92064 31/12/1955 Tyne Dock 11/1966 Tyne Dock 10.92 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 04/1967 11.30
92065 31/12/1955 Tyne Dock 04/1967 Wakefield 11.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 08/1967 11.63
92066 31/12/1955 Tyne Dock 05/1965 Tyne Dock 9.42 Cut Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell) 09/1965 9.72
92067 31/12/1955 Doncaster 11/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 02/1967 11.13
92068 31/12/1955 Doncaster 30/01/1966 Derby 10.08 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 04/1966 10.30
92069 31/12/1955 Doncaster 05/1968 Speke Junction 12.42 Cut Arnott Young (Rawmarsh, Rotherham) 10/1968 12.80
92070 31/01/1956 Doncaster 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 12.08
92071 31/01/1956 Doncaster 11/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 12.08
92072 29/02/1956 Doncaster 30/01/1966 Derby 9.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1966 10.30
92073 29/02/1956 Doncaster 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 12.01
92074 31/03/1956 Doncaster 04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1967 11.55
92075 31/03/1956 Doncaster 09/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1967 10.88
92076 31/03/1956 Doncaster 02/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1967 11.21
92077 31/03/1956 Toton 06/1968 Barrow in Furness 12.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/1968 12.55
92078 31/03/1956 Toton 05/1967 Warrington Dallam 11.17 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1968 11.80
92079 30/04/1956 Toton 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 11.97
92080 30/04/1956 Toton 05/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 11/1967 11.55
92081 31/05/1956 Toton 02/1966 Newton Heath 9.75 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 06/1966 10.05
92082 31/05/1956 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 11.88
92083 31/05/1956 Wellingborough 02/1967 Croes Newydd 10.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 11.13
92084 31/05/1956 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 11.80
92085 30/06/1956 Wellingborough 12/1966 Croes Newydd 10.5 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 07/1980 24.06
92086 30/06/1956 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.42 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 11.80
92087 31/08/1956 Doncaster 02/1967 Barrow in Furness 10.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1967 10.79
92088 31/10/1956 Doncaster 04/1968 Carnforth 11.5 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 10/1968 11.96
92089 30/09/1956 Doncaster 02/1967 Croes Newydd 10.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 10.79
92090 30/11/1956 Doncaster 05/1967 Croes Newydd 10.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1967 10.88
92091 30/11/1956 Doncaster 05/1968 Barrow in Furness 11.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1968 11.97
92092 31/12/1956 Doncaster 10/1966 Croes Newydd 9.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 10.29
92093 31/01/1957 Doncaster 09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 11.08
92094 28/02/1957 Doncaster 05/1968 Speke Junction 11.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1968 11.55
92095 31/03/1957 Annesley 10/1966 Warrington Dallam 9.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 10.05
92096 30/04/1957 Annesley 02/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 9.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1967 10.13
92097 30/06/1956 Tyne Dock 10/1966 Tyne Dock 10.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 10.80
92098 31/07/1956 Tyne Dock 07/1966 Tyne Dock 10 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 10.21
92099 31/07/1956 Tyne Dock 09/1966 Tyne Dock 10.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 10.30
92100 31/08/1956 Toton 05/1967 Croes Newydd 10.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 11.21
92101 31/08/1956 Toton 10/1967 Croes Newydd 11.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1968 11.63
92102 31/08/1956 Toton 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 11.55
92103 31/08/1956 Toton 05/1967 Croes Newydd 10.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 11.21
92104 31/08/1956 Toton 02/1967 Croes Newydd 10.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 10.88
92105 30/09/1956 Wellingborough 01/1967 Croes Newydd 10.33 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 05/1967 10.63
92106 30/09/1956 Wellingborough 07/1967 Croes Newydd 10.83 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 12/1967 11.21
92107 30/09/1956 Wellingborough 02/1967 Croes Newydd 10.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 10.79
92108 13/10/1956 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 11.38
92109 20/10/1956 Toton 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 11.41
92110 27/10/1956 Toton 12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 11.17 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1968 11.39
92111 30/11/1956 Cricklewood East 10/1967 Croes Newydd 10.92 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 28/02/1968 11.25
92112 30/11/1956 Cricklewood East 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 11 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 11.30
92113 30/11/1956 Westhouses 10/1967 Croes Newydd 10.92 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1968 11.38
92114 30/11/1956 Westhouses 07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 11.25
92115 31/12/1956 Westhouses 02/1966 Speke Junction 9.17 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 06/1966 9.46
92116 31/12/1956 Westhouses 11/1966 Warrington Dallam 9.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 10.54
92117 31/12/1956 Westhouses 12/1967 Speke Junction 11 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1968 11.30
92118 31/12/1956 Westhouses 05/1968 Barrow in Furness 11.42 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 09/1968 11.72
92119 28/02/1957 Westhouses 09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 11.01
92120 28/02/1957 Westhouses 07/1967 Croes Newydd 10.42 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 28/02/1968 11.01
92121 28/02/1957 Wellingborough 07/1967 Croes Newydd 10.42 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1968 10.88
92122 28/02/1957 Wellingborough 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 10.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 11.01
92123 31/03/1957 Wellingborough 10/1967 Croes Newydd 10.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 28/02/1968 10.92
92124 31/03/1957 Wellingborough 12/1966 Warrington Dallam 9.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1967 10.05
92125 31/03/1957 Wellingborough 12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 04/1968 11.05
92126 31/03/1957 Wellingborough 08/1967 Warrington Dallam 10.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1968 10.80
92127 30/04/1957 Wellingborough 08/1967 Croes Newydd 10.33 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1967 10.63
92128 30/04/1957 Toton 11/1967 Carnforth 10.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 05/1968 11.05
92129 30/04/1957 Saltley 07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1967 10.55
92130 30/04/1957 Saltley 05/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 9.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1966 9.55
92131 31/05/1957 Saltley 09/1967 Croes Newydd 10.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 28/02/1968 10.75
92132 31/05/1957 Saltley 10/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 10.75
92133 30/06/1957 Saltley 07/1967 Croes Newydd 10.08 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1968 10.55
92134 30/06/1957 Saltley 12/1966 Croes Newydd 9.5 Prs Preserved
92135 30/06/1957 Saltley 06/1967 Wakefield 10 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1968 10.72
92136 31/07/1957 Saltley 10/1966 Saltley 9.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 02/1967 9.55
92137 31/07/1957 Saltley 09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 10.59
92138 31/07/1957 Saltley 07/1967 Speke Junction 10 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 12/1967 10.38
92139 31/07/1957 Saltley 09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 10.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 28/02/1968 10.59
92140 31/07/1957 New England 04/1965 Colwick 7.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 7.96
92141 31/12/1957 12/1965 Colwick 8 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 8.29
92142 31/07/1957 New England 02/1965 New England 7.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 02/1966 8.55
92143 31/08/1957 New England 02/1965 New England 7.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 05/1965 7.71
92144 31/08/1957 New England 12/1965 Colwick 8.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 8.63
92145 31/08/1957 New England 02/1966 Immingham 8.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 8.63
92146 31/08/1957 New England 04/1966 Doncaster 8.67 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 06/1966 8.79
92147 30/09/1957 New England 04/1965 Immingham 7.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1965 7.88
92148 30/09/1957 New England 12/1965 Colwick 8.25 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 8.55
92149 31/10/1957 New England 06/1965 Colwick 7.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 10/1965 7.96
92150 31/10/1957 Westhouses 04/1967 Wakefield 9.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1967 9.71
92151 31/10/1957 Saltley 04/1967 Croes Newydd 9.5 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1968 10.46
92152 31/10/1957 Saltley 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 10.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 10.38
92153 31/10/1957 Toton 30/01/1968 Speke Junction 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1968 10.63
92154 31/10/1957 Wellingborough 07/1967 Speke Junction 9.75 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1968 10.21
92155 30/11/1957 Saltley 11/1966 Speke Junction 9 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 9.38
92156 30/11/1957 Toton 07/1967 Warrington Dallam 9.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1968 10.30
92157 30/11/1957 Toton 08/1967 Croes Newydd 9.75 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1968 10.13
92158 30/11/1957 Toton 07/1966 Speke Junction 8.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1966 8.96
92159 30/11/1957 Wellingborough 07/1967 Croes Newydd 9.67 Cut T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton) 01/1968 10.13
92160 30/11/1957 Wellingborough 06/1968 Barrow in Furness 10.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/1968 10.88
92161 31/12/1957 Westhouses 12/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 9 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1967 9.38
92162 31/12/1957 Westhouses 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 05/1968 10.38
92163 30/04/1958 Kettering 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 9.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 05/1968 10.05
92164 30/04/1958 Leicester Midland 07/1966 Saltley 8.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 8.47
92165 30/04/1958 Saltley 03/1968 Speke Junction 9.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1968 10.13
92166 31/05/1958 Saltley 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 9.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 03/1968 9.80
92167 31/05/1958 Saltley 06/1968 Barrow in Furness 10.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1968 10.47
92168 31/12/1957 Doncaster 06/1965 Doncaster 7.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 7.88
92169 31/12/1957 Doncaster 05/1964 Doncaster 6.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1965 7.05
92170 31/12/1957 Doncaster 05/1964 Doncaster 6.42 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 01/1965 7.05
92171 28/02/1958 Doncaster 05/1964 New England 6.25 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1965 7.05
92172 31/01/1958 Doncaster 04/1966 Doncaster 8.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 06/1966 8.38
92173 28/02/1958 Doncaster 03/1966 Doncaster 8.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1966 8.21
92174 28/02/1958 Doncaster 12/1965 Doncaster 7.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1966 8.21
92175 28/02/1958 Doncaster 05/1964 Doncaster 6.25 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 02/1965 6.97
92176 31/03/1958 Doncaster 05/1964 New England 6.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1965 6.96
92177 31/03/1958 Doncaster 05/1964 Doncaster 6.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 08/1964 6.38
92178 30/09/1957 New England 10/1965 Colwick 8.08 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 12/1965 8.21
92179 31/10/1957 New England 14/11/1965 Colwick 8.08 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 03/1966 8.38
92180 30/11/1957 New England 04/1965 Colwick 7.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1965 7.63
92181 30/11/1957 New England 02/1965 New England 7.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 07/1965 7.63
92182 31/12/1957 New England 04/1966 Doncaster 8.33 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 06/1966 8.46
92183 31/12/1957 New England 03/1966 Doncaster 8.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 07/1966 8.54
92184 31/01/1958 New England 02/1965 Immingham 7.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1965 7.38
92185 31/01/1958 New England 02/1965 Immingham 7.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 06/1965 7.38
92186 31/01/1958 New England 08/1965 Colwick 7.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 02/1966 8.05
92187 28/02/1958 New England 02/1965 Colwick 7 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1965 7.21
92188 28/02/1958 New England 02/1965 Colwick 7 Cut Drapers (Hull) 05/1965 7.21
92189 21/03/1958 Mexborough 12/1965 Colwick 7.75 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 8.07
92190 31/03/1958 Mexborough 10/1965 Doncaster 7.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/1966 7.80
92191 30/04/1958 Sheffield Darnall 12/1965 Colwick 7.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1966 7.96
92192 31/05/1958 Doncaster 02/1965 Frodingham 6.75 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1965 6.96
92193 31/05/1958 Doncaster 06/1965 Immingham 7.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 7.47
92194 30/06/1958 Doncaster 05/12/1965 Immingham 7.5 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 7.71
92195 30/06/1958 Doncaster 05/1965 Colwick 6.92 Cut Drapers (Hull) 11/1965 7.38
92196 31/08/1958 Doncaster 12/1964 Immingham 6.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/1966 7.38
92197 30/09/1958 Doncaster 09/1965 Immingham 7 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/1966 7.30
92198 31/10/1958 Doncaster 08/1964 Frodingham 5.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1965 6.63
92199 31/10/1958 Doncaster 08/1964 Frodingham 5.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1965 6.63
92200 30/11/1958 Doncaster 10/1965 Colwick 6.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 12/1965 7.05
92201 05/12/1958 Doncaster 03/1966 Doncaster 7.25 Cut W George, Station Steel (Wath) 07/1966 7.61
92202 31/12/1958 Doncaster 12/1965 Immingham 7 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1966 7.21
92203 30/04/1959 St Philips Marsh 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 8.58 Prs Preserved
92204 30/04/1959 St Philips Marsh 12/1967 Speke Junction 8.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1968 8.88
92205 31/05/1959 St Philips Marsh 06/1967 Wakefield 8.08 Cut Drapers (Hull) 28/02/1968 8.75
92206 31/05/1959 St Philips Marsh 05/1967 Wakefield 8 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 09/1967 8.30
92207 30/06/1959 St Philips Marsh 12/1964 Cardiff Canton 5.5 Prs Preserved
92208 30/06/1959 Laira 10/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 8.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 28/02/1968 8.67
92209 30/06/1959 Laira 12/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 6.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1966 6.71
92210 31/08/1959 Cardiff Canton 11/1964 Cardiff Canton 5.25 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1965 5.54
92211 30/09/1959 Old Oak Common 05/1967 Wakefield 7.67 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 8.21
92212 30/09/1959 Banbury 30/01/1968 Barrow in Furness 8.33 Prs Preserved
92213 31/10/1959 St Philips Marsh 11/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 7.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 02/1967 7.30
92214 31/10/1959 Cardiff Canton 09/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 5.92 Prs Preserved
92215 30/11/1959 Banbury 06/1967 Wakefield 7.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 03/1968 8.30
92216 31/12/1959 Cardiff Canton 10/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 5.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 6.29
92217 31/12/1959 Cardiff Canton 07/1966 Wadebridge 6.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1966 6.79
92218 31/01/1960 St Philips Marsh 05/1968 Speke Junction 8.33 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 07/1968 8.46
92219 31/01/1960 Cardiff Canton 09/1965 Radyr 5.67 Prs Preserved
92220 31/03/1960 Cardiff Canton 03/1965 Radyr 5 Prs Preserved
92221 31/05/1958 05/1965 York (North) 7 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 09/1965 7.30
92222 30/06/1958 Banbury 03/1965 Southall 6.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1965 7.05
92223 30/06/1958 Banbury 04/1968 Barrow in Furness 9.83 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 09/1968 10.22
92224 30/06/1958 Banbury 09/1967 Warrington Dallam 9.25 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1968 9.97
92225 30/06/1958 Banbury 07/1965 Cardiff Canton 7.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1965 7.22
92226 30/06/1958 Banbury 09/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 7.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 7.47
92227 31/07/1958 Banbury 11/1967 Speke Junction 9.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 01/1968 9.47
92228 31/07/1958 Banbury 01/1967 Speke Junction 8.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1967 8.88
92229 31/07/1958 11/1964 Cardiff Canton 6.33 Cut Cox and Danks (North Acton) 02/1965 6.55
92230 31/08/1958 Banbury 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 7.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1966 7.54
92231 31/08/1958 Pontypool Road 11/1966 York (North) 8.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 8.63
92232 31/08/1958 Pontypool Road 12/1964 Radyr 6.33 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 03/1965 6.54
92233 31/08/1958 Pontypool Road 02/1968 Speke Junction 9.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 08/1968 9.96
92234 31/08/1958 Pontypool Road 11/1967 Birkenhead Mollington Street 9.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 28/02/1968 9.50
92235 31/08/1958 Pontypool Road 18/11/1965 Bristol Barrow Road 7.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 7.63
92236 30/09/1958 Pontypool Road 03/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 6.5 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 08/1965 6.88
92237 30/09/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 09/1965 Cardiff Canton 7 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 7.13
92238 30/09/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 09/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 7 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 7.21
92239 30/09/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 11/1966 York (North) 8.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 8.55
92240 31/10/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 09/1965 Southall 6.92 Prs Preserved
92241 31/10/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 07/1965 Southall 6.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1965 6.88
92242 31/10/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 06/1965 Severn Tunnel Junction 6.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 6.79
92243 31/10/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 12/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 7.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 7.46
92244 30/11/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 7.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 7.38
92245 30/11/1958 Old Oak Common 12/1964 Southall 6.08
92246 31/12/1958 Old Oak Common 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 7 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 7.29
92247 31/12/1958 Old Oak Common 10/1966 Newton Heath 7.83 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 8.29
92248 31/12/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 06/1965 Radyr 6.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 6.63
92249 31/12/1958 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 05/1968 Speke Junction 9.42 Cut Arnott Young (Rawmarsh, Rotherham) 09/1968 9.72
92250 31/12/1958 Banbury 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 7 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1966 7.54