Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 322 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6299 Week
» 22497 Month
» 187397 Year
» 698499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 2" Class 2-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
78000 12/1952 Oswestry 06/1965 Derby 12.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 13.09
78001 12/1952 Oswestry 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 13 Cut Birds (Morriston) 03/1966 13.25
78002 12/1952 Oswestry 06/1966 Lostock Hall 13.5 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 10/1966 13.84
78003 12/1952 Oswestry 12/1966 Kidderminster 14 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 14.76
78004 01/1953 Oswestry 18/11/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 12.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 13.09
78005 02/1953 Oswestry 09/1964 Gloucester Horton Road 11.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 12.08
78006 03/1953 Oswestry 12/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 12.75 Cut Birds (Morriston) 03/1966 13.01
78007 03/1953 Oswestry 05/1967 Bolton 14.17 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1967 14.76
78008 03/1953 Oswestry 10/1966 St Blazey 13.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 13.85
78009 04/1953 Oswestry 02/1964 Gloucester Barnwood 10.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 12/1964 11.68
78010 12/1953 West Auckland 09/1966 Crewe South 12.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1966 13.01
78011 12/1953 West Auckland 09/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 11.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 12/1965 12.01
78012 01/1954 West Auckland 05/1967 Bolton 13.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 13.76
78013 01/1954 West Auckland 05/1967 Bolton 13.33 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 13.76
78014 02/1954 West Auckland 09/1965 Trafford Park (LMS) 11.58 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 12/1965 11.84
78015 02/1954 West Auckland 11/1963 Darlington 9.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Darlington) 01/1964 9.92
78016 03/1954 West Auckland 08/1966 Stranraer 12.42 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 05/1967 13.18
78017 03/1954 West Auckland 12/1966 Kidderminster 12.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1967 13.59
78018 03/1954 West Auckland 11/1966 Kidderminster 12.67 Prs Preserved
78019 03/1954 Kirkby Stephen 11/1966 Crewe South 12.67 Prs Preserved
78020 04/1954 Kettering 05/1967 Lostock Hall 13.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1967 13.59
78021 05/1954 Kettering 05/1967 Lostock Hall 13 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1967 13.51
78022 05/1954 Sheffield Millhouses 09/1966 Lostock Hall 12.33 Prs Preserved
78023 05/1954 Sheffield Millhouses 05/1967 Bolton 13 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 13.43
78024 05/1954 Sheffield Millhouses 02/1965 Gorton 10.75 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 10/1965 11.43
78025 06/1954 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 02/1965 Gorton 10.67 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 11/1965 11.43
78026 06/1954 Canklow 08/1966 Corkerhill 12.17 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 12/1966 12.51
78027 06/1954 Canklow 09/1965 Kettering 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 11.68
78028 07/1954 Leicester Midland 02/1967 Bolton 12.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 12.93
78029 07/1954 Leicester Midland 10/1965 Willesden 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 11.51
78030 09/1954 Preston 10/1965 Crewe South 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1965 11.26
78031 09/1954 Lancaster Green Ayre 10/1966 Crewe South 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 12.50
78032 09/1954 Rhyl 10/1965 Willesden 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 11.34
78033 09/1954 Rhyl 10/1965 Willesden 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 11.18
78034 10/1954 Rhyl 01/1966 Crewe South 11.25 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1966 11.51
78035 06/11/1954 Rhyl 12/1965 Kidderminster 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1966 11.45
78036 13/11/1954 Preston 12/1966 Kidderminster 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1967 12.76
78037 13/11/1954 Preston 05/1967 Lostock Hall 12.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1967 13.01
78038 20/11/1954 Bescot 08/1966 Kidderminster 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 12.08
78039 27/11/1954 Rhyl 10/1966 Kidderminster 11.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 12.30
78040 11/12/1954 Bank Hall 01/1966 Lostock Hall 11.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 05/1966 11.43
78041 18/12/1954 Bank Hall 05/1967 Lostock Hall 12.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1967 12.92
78042 25/12/1954 Bank Hall 09/1965 Toton 10.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 12/1965 10.98
78043 25/12/1954 Bank Hall 10/1965 Willesden 10.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 11.07
78044 12/1954 Bank Hall 05/1967 Bolton 12.42 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 12.84
78045 12/10/1955 Kittybrewster 01/1966 Bathgate 10.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 10.52
78046 20/10/1955 Hawick 11/1966 St Margarets 11.08 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 06/1967 11.66
78047 25/10/1955 Hawick 09/1966 St Margarets 10.92 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 01/1967 11.23
78048 28/10/1955 St Margarets 07/1964 Hawick 8.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1965 9.47
78049 11/1955 St Margarets 08/1966 St Margarets 10.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1966 11.09
78050 11/1955 Motherwell 01/1966 Bathgate 10.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 10.42
78051 11/1955 Motherwell 11/1966 Ayr 11 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1967 11.34
78052 11/1955 Motherwell 01/1966 Bathgate 10.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 10.42
78053 11/1955 Motherwell 07/1964 Fort William 8.67 Cut P.W. McLellan (Bo'ness) 04/1965 9.42
78054 12/1955 Motherwell 12/1965 Bathgate 10 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 03/1966 10.25
78055 08/1956 Chester Northgate 02/1967 Bolton 10.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1967 10.84
78056 08/1956 Chester Northgate 07/1966 Stoke 9.92 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 11/1966 10.26
78057 09/1956 Chester Northgate 05/1966 Lostock Hall 9.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 08/1966 9.92
78058 09/1956 Chester Northgate 12/1966 Kidderminster 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 11.01
78059 09/1956 Chester Northgate 11/1966 Crewe South 10.17 Prs Preserved
78060 13/10/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 10/1966 Kidderminster 10 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 10.42
78061 13/10/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 11/1966 Toton 10.08 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1967 10.42
78062 20/10/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 05/1967 Bolton 10.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 10/1967 10.99
78063 11/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 12/1966 Kidderminster 10.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 10.84
78064 11/1956 Wigan Central (L&Y) 12/1966 Toton 10.08 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 03/1967 10.33