Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 175 Today
» 835 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 26538 Month
» 285397 Year
» 796499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 3" Class 2-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
77000 09/02/1954 Darlington 07/12/1966 Stourton 12.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1967 13.10
77001 11/02/1954 Darlington 02/01/1966 Goole 11.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 02/1966 12.02
77002 11/03/1954 Darlington 12/06/1967 York (North) 13.25 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 10/1967 13.61
77003 25/02/1954 Darlington 07/12/1966 Stourton 12.83 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1967 13.06
77004 11/03/1954 Darlington 07/12/1966 Stourton 12.75 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 03/1967 13.02
77005 17/03/1954 Dawsholm 29/11/1966 Motherwell 12.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1967 13.09
77006 23/03/1954 Hamilton (West) 25/03/1966 Motherwell 12 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1966 12.24
77007 31/03/1954 Hamilton (West) 29/11/1966 Hurlford 12.67 Cut T W Ward (Wishaw) 04/1967 13.05
77008 23/04/1954 Perth South 23/06/1966 Motherwell 12.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 12.49
77009 05/06/1954 Perth South 12/05/1966 Motherwell 11.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 12.37
77010 10/06/1954 Darlington 25/11/1965 Stourton 11.42 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 02/1966 11.69
77011 16/06/1954 Darlington 05/02/1966 Northwich 11.67 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 05/1966 11.92
77012 23/06/1954 Darlington 12/06/1967 York (North) 13 Cut Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield) 10/1967 13.32
77013 01/07/1954 Darlington 30/03/1966 Stourton 11.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 06/1966 11.96
77014 07/07/1954 Darlington 09/07/1967 Guildford 13 Cut Birds (Risca) 12/1967 13.45
77015 29/07/1954 Hurlford 17/07/1966 Hurlford 12 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1966 12.31
77016 06/08/1954 Hurlford 03/03/1966 Hurlford 11.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 11.87
77017 20/08/1954 Hurlford 29/11/1966 Hurlford 12.25 Cut T W Ward (Wishaw) 04/1967 12.66
77018 26/08/1954 Hurlford 29/11/1966 Hurlford 12.25 Cut T W Ward (Wishaw) 04/1967 12.64
77019 03/09/1954 Hurlford 29/11/1966 Hurlford 12.17 Cut T W Ward (Wishaw) 04/1967 12.62