Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 322 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6299 Week
» 22497 Month
» 187397 Year
» 698499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 4" Class 2-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
76000 12/1952 Motherwell 05/1967 Motherwell 14.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1967 14.76
76001 12/1952 Motherwell 08/1966 Ayr 13.67 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 10/1966 13.84
76002 12/1952 Motherwell 12/1966 Motherwell 14 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1967 14.42
76003 12/1952 Motherwell 03/1966 Motherwell 13.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 13.51
76004 12/1952 Motherwell 10/1966 Polmadie 13.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1967 14.09
76005 12/1952 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 14.58 Cut Birds (Morriston) 11/1967 14.93
76006 01/1953 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 14.5 Cut Birds (Morriston) 11/1967 14.84
76007 01/1953 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 14.5 Cut Birds (Morriston) 11/1967 14.84
76008 02/1953 Eastleigh 05/1967 Bournemouth 14.25 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 12/1967 14.84
76009 02/1953 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 14.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 14.92
76010 03/1953 Eastleigh 09/1966 Bournemouth 13.5 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1967 14.01
76011 03/1953 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 14.33 Cut Birds (Morriston) 11/1967 14.68
76012 04/1953 Eastleigh 09/1966 Guildford 13.42 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1967 13.92
76013 04/1953 Eastleigh 09/1966 Bournemouth 13.42 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1967 13.92
76014 05/1953 Eastleigh 09/1966 Bournemouth 13.33 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1967 13.68
76015 05/1953 Eastleigh 10/1965 Bournemouth 12.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 01/1966 12.68
76016 05/1953 Eastleigh 10/1966 Guildford 13.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 14.09
76017 06/1953 Eastleigh 07/1965 Salisbury 12.08 Prs Preserved
76018 06/1953 Eastleigh 10/1966 Guildford 13.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 14.01
76019 07/1953 Eastleigh 02/1966 Eastleigh 12.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1966 12.93
76020 12/1952 Darlington 04/1966 Chester (MR) 13.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 07/1966 13.59
76021 12/1952 York (North) 10/1966 Hurlford 13.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 02/1967 14.18
76022 12/1952 Hull Dairycoates 08/1966 St Blazey 13.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1966 14.01
76023 12/1952 Sunderland 10/1965 Stoke 12.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 13.09
76024 01/1953 Gateshead 12/1966 Hurlford 13.92 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 14.25
76025 10/1953 Eastleigh 31/10/1965 Bournemouth 12 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 12.35
76026 10/1953 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 13.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1967 13.93
76027 10/1953 Eastleigh 10/1965 Bournemouth 12 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 01/1966 12.26
76028 10/1953 Eastleigh 05/1964 Eastleigh 10.58 Cut R A Kings (Norwich) 08/1964 10.84
76029 11/1953 Eastleigh 10/1964 Eastleigh 10.92 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 03/1965 11.34
76030 11/1953 Stratford 04/1965 Eastleigh 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 12.09
76031 11/1953 Stratford 07/1967 Guildford 13.67 Cut Birds (Morriston) 12/1967 14.09
76032 12/1953 Stratford 08/1964 Guildford 10.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 11.01
76033 12/1953 Stratford 01/1967 Guildford 13.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 13.76
76034 12/1953 Stratford 09/1964 Guildford 10.75 Cut P Woods (Shipbreaking) (Queenborough) 10/1964 10.84
76035 05/1954 Neasden 05/1966 Chester (MR) 12 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 12.26
76036 06/1954 Neasden 01/1967 Chester (MR) 12.58 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 07/1967 13.09
76037 06/1954 Neasden 06/1967 Croes Newydd 13 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 13.43
76038 07/1954 Neasden 09/1966 Machynlleth 12.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1966 12.43
76039 07/1954 Neasden 06/1967 Croes Newydd 12.92 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1967 13.43
76040 07/1954 Neasden 04/1967 Croes Newydd 12.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 09/1967 13.18
76041 07/1954 Neasden 04/1967 Chester (MR) 12.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 10/1967 13.26
76042 08/1954 Neasden 06/1966 St Blazey 11.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1966 12.26
76043 08/1954 Neasden 09/1966 Machynlleth 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1966 12.34
76044 08/1954 Neasden 10/1966 Chester (MR) 12.17 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 03/1967 12.59
76045 03/1955 Gateshead 01/1966 Carstairs 10.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 11.26
76046 03/1955 Gateshead 05/1967 Corkerhill 12.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 12.51
76047 03/1955 Gateshead 12/1966 Chester (MR) 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 12.26
76048 03/1955 Gateshead 02/1967 Croes Newydd 11.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1967 12.34
76049 01/04/1955 Gateshead 01/1966 Bathgate 10.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1966 11.13
76050 08/1956 Darlington 09/1965 Hawick 9.08 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 11/1966 10.26
76051 08/1956 York (North) 04/1967 Accrington 10.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1967 11.34
76052 08/1956 York (North) 12/1966 Chester (MR) 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 10.84
76053 21/04/1955 Redhill 01/1967 Guildford 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1967 12.33
76054 26/04/1955 Redhill 10/1964 Guildford 9.5 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 03/1965 9.89
76055 29/04/1955 Redhill 10/1965 Salisbury 10.5 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1966 10.72
76056 05/1955 Redhill 07/11/1965 Bournemouth 10.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1966 10.84
76057 05/1955 Redhill 10/1966 Bournemouth 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1967 12.18
76058 06/1955 Redhill 03/1967 Guildford 11.75 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 09/1966 11.26
76059 06/1955 Redhill 09/1966 Guildford 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 11.76
76060 07/1955 Redhill 12/1965 Eastleigh 10.42 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 10.84
76061 07/1955 Redhill 01/1967 Eastleigh 11.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 11.93
76062 07/1955 Redhill 10/1965 Eastleigh 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 10.60
76063 07/1956 Eastleigh 04/1967 Eastleigh 10.75 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 09/1966 10.18
76064 07/1956 Eastleigh 07/1967 Eastleigh 11 Cut Birds (Morriston) 11/1967 11.34
76065 07/1956 Eastleigh 10/1965 Eastleigh 9.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 06/1966 9.92
76066 07/1956 Eastleigh 07/1967 Eastleigh 11 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1967 11.34
76067 08/1956 Eastleigh 07/1967 Bournemouth 10.92 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 11/1967 11.26
76068 08/1956 Eastleigh 10/1965 Eastleigh 9.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 02/1966 9.51
76069 08/1956 Eastleigh 06/1967 Guildford 10.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 11.59
76070 09/1956 Motherwell 08/1966 Polmadie 9.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1967 10.34
76071 10/1956 Motherwell 01/1966 Polmadie 9.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 9.67
76072 10/1956 Dumfries 10/1964 Dumfries 8 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 05/1965 8.59
76073 10/1956 Dumfries 06/1966 Ayr 9.67 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 11/1966 10.09
76074 11/1956 Eastfield 10/1966 Ayr 9.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1967 10.17
76075 12/1956 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 10/1967 Carnforth 10.83 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1968 11.09
76076 12/1956 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 11/1966 Accrington 9.92 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 04/1967 10.34
76077 12/1956 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 12/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 11 Prs Preserved
76078 12/1956 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 12/1966 Accrington 10 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 04/1967 10.34
76079 02/1957 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 12/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 10.83 Prs Preserved
76080 02/1957 Lower Darwen 12/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 10.83 Cut Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) 04/1972 15.17
76081 02/1957 Lower Darwen 07/1967 Carnforth 10.42 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1967 10.84
76082 03/1957 Lower Darwen 10/1966 Accrington 9.58 Cut Drapers (Hull) 04/1967 10.09
76083 03/1957 Lower Darwen 10/1966 Accrington 9.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 10.01
76084 04/1957 Lower Darwen 12/1967 Springs Branch (Wigan) 10.67 Prs Preserved
76085 04/1957 Leicester Midland 06/1966 Colwick 9.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 9.59
76086 05/1957 Leicester Midland 09/1966 Croes Newydd 9.33 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1967 10.01
76087 05/1957 Trafford Park (LMS) 01/1967 St Blazey 9.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 10.34
76088 05/1957 Trafford Park (LMS) 06/1967 Chester (MR) 10.08 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1967 10.59
76089 06/1957 Trafford Park (LMS) 09/1966 Colwick 9.25 Cut Drapers (Hull) 12/1966 9.51
76090 06/1957 Corkerhill 12/1966 Beattock 9.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 9.84
76091 06/1957 Corkerhill 12/1966 Hurlford 9.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 9.84
76092 06/1957 Corkerhill 08/1966 Hurlford 9.17 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1966 9.42
76093 07/1957 Corkerhill 02/1967 Corkerhill 9.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1967 9.76
76094 08/1957 Corkerhill 05/1967 Beattock 9.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 10.09
76095 08/1957 Corkerhill 03/1967 Chester (MR) 9.58 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 09/1967 10.09
76096 09/1957 Corkerhill 12/1966 Ayr 9.25 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 07/1967 9.84
76097 09/1957 Corkerhill 07/1964 Ayr 6.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1965 7.34
76098 10/1957 Corkerhill 05/1967 Beattock 9.58 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 03/1968 10.42
76099 11/1957 Corkerhill 08/1966 Colwick 8.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1966 9.01
76100 05/1957 Dawsholm 08/1966 Ayr 9.25 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 06/1967 10.09
76101 06/1957 Dawsholm 12/1966 Ayr 9.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 05/1967 9.92
76102 06/1957 Parkhead 12/1966 Hurlford 9.5 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 05/1967 9.92
76103 06/1957 Parkhead 07/1966 Ayr 9.08 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1966 9.42
76104 07/1957 Kittybrewster 05/1967 Polmadie 9.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 10.18
76105 07/1957 Kittybrewster 01/1966 Polmadie 8.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 8.76
76106 07/1957 Kittybrewster 09/1965 Willesden 8.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1965 8.34
76107 08/1957 Kittybrewster 10/1965 Bathgate 8.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 06/1966 8.84
76108 08/1957 Kittybrewster 07/1966 Hurlford 8.92 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 11/1966 9.26
76109 08/1957 Thornton Junction 09/1966 Dunfermline Upper 9.08 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1967 9.42
76110 08/1957 Thornton Junction 12/1966 Dunfermline Upper 9.33 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 9.67
76111 08/1957 Thornton Junction 01/1966 Bathgate 8.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1966 8.67
76112 09/1957 Dumfries 10/1965 Stranraer 8.08 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 02/1966 8.42
76113 10/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Carstairs 9.17 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 9.50
76114 10/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Beattock 9.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 04/1967 9.50