Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 2 Tank" Class 2-6-2T


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
84000 04/07/1953 Crewe North 30/10/1965 Croes Newydd 12.25 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 02/1966 12.63
84001 06/07/1953 Crewe North 10/1964 Llandudno Junction 11.25 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/1965 11.54
84002 07/08/1953 Plodder Lane 17/04/1965 Bletchley 11.67 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1966 12.70
84003 10/08/1953 Plodder Lane 02/10/1965 Llandudno Junction 12.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1966 12.53
84004 19/08/1953 Plodder Lane 30/10/1965 Croes Newydd 12.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1966 12.66
84005 24/08/1953 Bedford 30/10/1965 Kettering 12.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1966 12.40
84006 26/08/1953 Burton 30/10/1965 Kettering 12.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1966 12.40
84007 31/08/1953 Burton 18/01/1964 Leicester Midland 10.42 Cut Albert Looms (Spondon) 10/1964 11.13
84008 31/08/1953 Burton 30/10/1965 Kettering 12.17 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1966 12.38
84009 03/09/1953 Royston 20/11/1965 Llandudno Junction 12.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 12.38
84010 08/09/1953 Low Moor 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.25 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 02/1966 12.45
84011 18/09/1953 Low Moor 24/04/1965 Fleetwood 11.58 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 12/1965 12.25
84012 17/09/1953 Low Moor 12/10/1963 Southport 10.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1963 10.08
84013 21/09/1953 Low Moor 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.25 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 12.49
84014 22/09/1953 Low Moor 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 12.57
84015 02/10/1953 Low Moor 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.17 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 02/1966 12.38
84016 07/10/1953 Bury 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.17 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 02/1966 12.37
84017 13/10/1953 Bury 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.17 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 12.43
84018 23/10/1953 Bury 24/04/1965 Fleetwood 11.5 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 11/1965 12.07
84019 31/10/1953 Bury 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 12.17 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 12.38
84020 27/03/1957 Ashford 10/1964 Llandudno Junction 7.58 Cut Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth) 01/1965 7.81
84021 30/03/1957 Ashford 05/09/1964 7.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1964 7.55
84022 30/03/1957 Ashford 05/09/1964 7.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1964 7.55
84023 05/04/1957 Ashford 05/09/1964 7.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1964 7.53
84024 10/04/1957 Ashford 05/09/1964 7.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 10/1964 7.52
84025 16/04/1957 Ramsgate 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 8.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 8.92
84026 18/04/1957 Ramsgate 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 8.67 Cut Arnott Young (Parkgate) 03/1966 8.91
84027 16/05/1957 Ramsgate 02/05/1964 Annesley 7 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 07/1964 7.17
84028 15/05/1957 Ramsgate 11/12/1965 Eastleigh 8.58 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 02/1966 8.76
84029 11/06/1957 Ramsgate 13/06/1964 Kettering 7 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1964 7.35