Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 66 Today
» 1210 Yesterday
» 7332 Week
» 21909 Month
» 385154 Year
» 461741 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 3 Tank" Class 2-6-2T


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
82000 04/04/1952 Tyseley 10/12/1966 Fleetwood 14.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1967 15.04
82001 18/04/1952 Tyseley 12/1965 Bristol Bath Road 13.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 13.84
82002 28/04/1952 Tyseley 02/1964 Exmouth Junction 11.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 30/05/1964 12.10
82003 02/05/1952 Tyseley 10/12/1966 Fleetwood 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1967 14.96
82004 14/05/1952 Tyseley 01/10/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 13.42 Cut Birds (Bridgend) 02/1966 13.77
82005 16/05/1952 Tyseley 19/09/1965 Nine Elms 13.33 Cut Birds (Risca) 02/1966 13.76
82006 27/05/1952 Tyseley 18/09/1966 Nine Elms 14.33 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 12/1966 14.56
82007 30/05/1952 Tyseley 29/06/1964 Bristol Bath Road 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 12.55
82008 05/06/1952 Tyseley 02/1964 Taunton 11.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 06/1964 12.04
82009 13/06/1952 Tyseley 05/11/1966 Fleetwood 14.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1967 14.76
82010 25/06/1952 Exmouth Junction 24/04/1965 Nine Elms 12.83 Cut Birds (Morriston) 09/1965 13.23
82011 01/07/1952 Exmouth Junction 30/08/1964 Nine Elms 12.08 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 12.38
82012 04/07/1952 Exmouth Junction 05/1964 Nine Elms 11.83 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 12.38
82013 09/07/1952 Exmouth Junction 14/06/1964 Nine Elms 11.92 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 12.36
82014 01/08/1952 Eastleigh 05/1964 Nine Elms 11.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1964 12.30
82015 13/08/1952 Eastleigh 06/12/1964 Nine Elms 12.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1965 12.68
82016 21/08/1952 Eastleigh 25/04/1965 Nine Elms 12.67 Cut Birds (Morriston) 10/1965 13.16
82017 08/08/1952 Exmouth Junction 25/04/1965 Nine Elms 12.67 Cut Birds (Morriston) 08/1965 13.03
82018 08/09/1952 Exmouth Junction 10/07/1966 Nine Elms 13.83 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 09/1966 14.03
82019 26/09/1952 Exmouth Junction 09/07/1967 Nine Elms 14.83 Cut Birds (Risca) 11/1967 15.15
82020 29/09/1954 Exmouth Junction 19/09/1965 Nine Elms 11 Cut Birds (Risca) 01/1966 11.30
82021 06/10/1954 Exmouth Junction 17/10/1965 Nine Elms 11 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 01/1966 11.28
82022 15/10/1954 Exmouth Junction 17/10/1965 Nine Elms 11 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1966 11.51
82023 22/10/1954 Exmouth Junction 02/10/1966 Nine Elms 12 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 12.40
82024 29/10/1954 Exmouth Junction 30/01/1966 Nine Elms 11.25 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 05/1966 11.55
82025 05/11/1954 Exmouth Junction 09/08/1964 Nine Elms 9.75 Cut Cohens (Morriston) 12/1964 10.12
82026 12/11/1954 Kirkby Stephen 26/06/1966 Nine Elms 11.58 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 10/1966 11.93
82027 23/11/1954 Kirkby Stephen 09/01/1966 Nine Elms 11.17 Cut Cox and Danks (Park Royal) 04/1966 11.40
82028 02/12/1954 Darlington 04/09/1966 Nine Elms 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1967 12.21
82029 13/12/1954 Darlington 09/07/1967 Nine Elms 12.58 Cut Birds (Risca) 01/1968 13.10
82030 21/12/1954 Barry 03/01/1966 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 11.32
82031 30/12/1954 Barry 10/12/1966 Fleetwood 12 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 12.47
82032 01/01/1955 Barry 01/05/1965 Bangor 10.33 Cut Birds (Morriston) 10/1965 10.79
82033 13/01/1955 Newton Abbot 19/09/1965 Nine Elms 10.67 Cut Birds (Risca) 02/1966 11.10
82034 28/01/1955 Newton Abbot 10/12/1966 Fleetwood 11.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 12.39
82035 03/03/1955 Barry 06/08/1965 Yeovil Town 10.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 10.71
82036 01/04/1955 Barry 21/07/1965 Bristol Bath Road 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 10.63
82037 20/04/1955 Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 25/08/1965 Bristol Bath Road 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 10.58
82038 04/05/1955 Newton Abbot 06/09/1965 Bristol Bath Road 10.33 Cut Birds (Bridgend) 10/1965 10.46
82039 10/05/1955 Barry 02/07/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 10.17 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 10/1965 10.44
82040 19/05/1955 Barry 02/07/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 10.17 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 10/1965 10.42
82041 17/06/1955 Barry 12/1965 Ryde (I.O.W.) 10.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1965 9.92
82042 20/06/1955 Barry 06/09/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 10.25 Cut Hayes (Bridgend) 02/1966 10.67
82043 27/06/1955 Barry 28/02/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 8.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 05/1964 8.89
82044 12/08/1955 Barry 18/11/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 10.25 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 02/1966 10.52