Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 119 Today
» 889 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 19637 Month
» 309029 Year
» 820131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Johnson "3F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3174 43174 10/1887 20/02/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 72.33 73.16
3178 43178 1887 12/03/1960 Manningham 73.25
3180 43180 1887 17/01/1959 Canklow 72.08
3181 43181 1887 13/04/1957 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 70.33
3183 43183 1887 27/06/1959 Normanton 72.5
3185 43185 1887 19/08/1961 Buxton (LNWR) 74.67
3186 43186 1887 03/01/1959 Bournville 72.08
3187 43187 1887 20/08/1960 Gorton 73.67
3188 43188 1887 23/04/1960 Burton 73.33
3189 43189 1887 03/12/1960 Warrington Dallam 74
3137 43750 1885 24/10/1959 Rowsley 74.83