Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 232 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 19558 Month
» 246319 Year
» 757421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Standard Class 5" Class 4-6-0


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
73000 04/1951 Derby 03/1968 Fleetwood 16.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1968 17.18
73001 05/1951 Derby 12/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 15.01
73002 05/1951 Derby 03/1967 Bath Green Park (S&D) 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1967 16.18
73003 05/1951 Leicester Midland 12/1965 Oxford 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1966 15.10
73004 06/1951 Leicester Midland 10/1967 Bolton 16.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 16.76
73005 06/1951 Perth South 06/1966 Corkerhill 15 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 15.35
73006 06/1951 Perth South 03/1967 Fleetwood 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1967 16.26
73007 07/1951 Perth South 03/1966 Fort William 14.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 14.93
73008 07/1951 Perth South 09/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 14.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1965 14.43
73009 07/1951 Perth South 07/1966 Corkerhill 15 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 09/1966 15.18
73010 08/1951 Holbeck (MR) 06/1968 Fleetwood 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1968 17.10
73011 08/1951 Holbeck (MR) 11/1967 Patricroft 16.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 30/03/1968 16.64
73012 08/1951 Holbeck (MR) 11/1964 Bristol Barrow Road 13.25 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 02/1965 13.52
73013 08/1951 Sheffield Millhouses 05/1966 Bolton 14.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1966 15.01
73014 09/1951 Sheffield Millhouses 07/1967 Bolton 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 16.35
73015 09/1951 Sheffield Millhouses 08/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 13.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 14.18
73016 09/1951 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 12/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 07/1967 15.84
73017 09/1951 Nottingham 10/1964 Bath Green Park (S&D) 13.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 13.51
73018 09/1951 Nottingham 07/1967 Guildford 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 16.35
73019 10/1951 01/1967 Bolton 15.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1967 15.59
73020 10/1951 07/1967 Guildford 15.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 16.26
73021 10/1951 08/1965 Oxford 13.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 14.10
73022 10/1951 04/1967 Nine Elms 15.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 15.93
73023 11/1951 Patricroft 08/1965 Oxford 13.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 14.01
73024 11/1951 11/1964 Oxford 13 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 03/1965 13.34
73025 11/1951 10/1967 Fleetwood 15.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 16.30
73026 11/1951 04/1967 Bolton 15.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1967 15.93
73027 12/1951 Blackpool Central 02/1964 Swindon 12.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 04/1964 12.34
73028 12/1951 Blackpool Central 12/1966 Bolton 15 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1967 15.34
73029 06/1953 Blackpool Central 07/1967 Nine Elms 14.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 30/03/1968 14.80
73030 07/1953 08/1965 Oxford 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 12.35
73031 07/1953 Derby 09/1965 Oxford 12.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1965 12.43
73032 07/1953 Carlisle Kingmoor 08/1965 Croes Newydd 12.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 12.35
73033 08/1953 Polmadie 30/01/1968 Fleetwood 14.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1968 14.76
73034 08/1953 Carlisle Kingmoor 03/1968 Fleetwood 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1968 14.84
73035 08/1953 Polmadie 30/01/1968 Fleetwood 14.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1968 14.76
73036 08/1953 Carlisle Kingmoor 09/1965 Kidderminster 12.08 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 12/1965 12.34
73037 09/1953 07/1967 Nine Elms 13.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 14.51
73038 09/1953 09/1965 Kidderminster 12 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1966 12.67
73039 09/1953 09/1967 Fleetwood 14 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 28/02/1968 14.46
73040 10/1953 Chester (MR) 05/1968 Patricroft 14.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 14.76
73041 10/1953 Chester (MR) 06/1965 Guildford 11.67 Cut Cohens (at Eastleigh Depot) 12/1965 12.18
73042 10/1953 Chester (MR) 08/1965 Bath Green Park (S&D) 11.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1966 12.26
73043 10/1953 Patricroft 07/1967 Nine Elms 13.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 14.42
73044 11/1953 Patricroft 03/1965 Oxford 11.33 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 08/1965 11.76
73045 11/1953 Holbeck (MR) 08/1967 Fleetwood 13.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 14.30
73046 11/1953 Leicester Midland 09/1964 Nine Elms 10.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 11.34
73047 12/1953 Sheffield Millhouses 12/1964 Kidderminster 11 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1967 13.34
73048 12/1953 Sheffield Millhouses 10/1967 Bolton 13.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 14.09
73049 12/1953 Leicester Midland 03/1965 Oxford 11.25 Cut Birds (Long Marston) 06/1965 11.51
73050 04/1954 Bath Green Park (S&D) 06/1968 Fleetwood 14.17 Prs Preserved
73051 05/1954 Bath Green Park (S&D) 08/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 11.51
73052 05/1954 Bath Green Park (S&D) 12/1964 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 10.58 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1965 10.93
73053 06/1954 Holbeck (MR) 03/1968 Fleetwood 13.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1968 13.93
73054 06/1954 Holbeck (MR) 08/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 11.34
73055 06/1954 05/1966 Polmadie 11.92 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 01/1967 12.59
73056 07/1954 06/1965 Aberdeen Ferryhill 10.92 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 09/1965 11.18
73057 07/1954 03/1966 Corkerhill 11.67 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 06/1966 11.93
73058 07/1954 11/1964 Aberdeen Ferryhill 10.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1965 10.67
73059 08/1954 05/1967 Polmadie 12.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 08/1967 13.01
73060 08/1954 Polmadie 05/1967 Polmadie 12.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 13.09
73061 09/1954 Polmadie 12/1964 Polmadie 10.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 03/1965 10.50
73062 10/1954 Polmadie 06/1965 Polmadie 10.67 Cut Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) 11/1965 11.09
73063 10/1954 Polmadie 06/1966 Polmadie 11.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 12.01
73064 10/1954 Polmadie 05/1967 Polmadie 12.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 12.93
73065 10/1954 Sheffield Millhouses 07/1967 Nine Elms 12.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 13.42
73066 10/1954 Holbeck (MR) 04/1967 Bolton 12.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 12.84
73067 10/1954 Nottingham 03/1968 Fleetwood 13.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1968 13.68
73068 10/1954 Derby 12/1965 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1966 11.51
73069 06/11/1954 Derby 08/1968 Barrow in Furness 13.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1969 14.36
73070 13/11/1954 Chester (MR) 04/1967 Bolton 12.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 13.01
73071 20/11/1954 Chester (MR) 09/1967 Fleetwood 12.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 13.28
73072 11/12/1954 Chester (MR) 10/1966 Polmadie 11.83 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 05/1967 12.43
73073 18/12/1954 Patricroft 11/1967 Fleetwood 12.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 13.21
73074 25/12/1954 Patricroft 09/1964 Nine Elms 9.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 10.23
73075 22/04/1955 Polmadie 12/1965 Polmadie 10.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 03/1966 10.90
73076 29/04/1955 Polmadie 07/1964 Polmadie 9.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1965 9.81
73077 13/05/1955 Eastfield 01/1965 Corkerhill 9.67 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 03/1965 9.85
73078 21/05/1955 Eastfield 07/1966 Carstairs 11.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 21/10/1966 11.43
73079 31/05/1955 Corkerhill 05/1967 Polmadie 12 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 09/1967 12.30
73080 06/1955 Norwood Junction 12/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 11.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1967 11.92
73081 06/1955 Stewarts Lane 07/1966 Guildford 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1966 11.34
73082 07/1955 Stewarts Lane 19/06/1966 Guildford 10.92 Prs Preserved
73083 07/1955 Stewarts Lane 09/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1967 11.60
73084 07/1955 Stewarts Lane 12/1965 Eastleigh 10.42 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1966 10.76
73085 08/1955 Stewarts Lane 07/1967 Nine Elms 11.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1968 12.68
73086 08/1955 Stewarts Lane 10/1966 Nine Elms 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 11.59
73087 08/1955 Stewarts Lane 10/1966 Guildford 11.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1967 11.67
73088 09/1955 Stewarts Lane 10/1966 Guildford 11.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 11.76
73089 09/1955 Stewarts Lane 09/1966 Guildford 11 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 11.76
73090 08/10/1955 Patricroft 10/1965 Kidderminster 10 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1966 10.28
73091 10/1955 Patricroft 05/1965 Gloucester Horton Road 9.58 Cut Birds (Risca) 08/1965 9.84
73092 10/1955 07/1967 Guildford 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 12.26
73093 11/1955 07/1967 Guildford 11.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 12.34
73094 11/1955 Patricroft 05/1967 Fleetwood 11.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 12.30
73095 11/1955 Patricroft 08/1966 Agecroft 10.75 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 01/1967 11.18
73096 11/1955 Patricroft 11/1967 Patricroft 12 Prs Preserved
73097 12/1955 Patricroft 05/1967 Fleetwood 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 11.84
73098 12/1955 Patricroft 03/1966 Polmadie 10.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1966 10.51
73099 12/1955 Patricroft 10/1966 Polmadie 10.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1967 11.51
73100 26/08/1955 Corkerhill 01/1967 Corkerhill 11.42 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 05/1967 11.73
73101 01/09/1955 Corkerhill 08/1966 Corkerhill 10.92 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1966 11.21
73102 14/09/1955 Corkerhill 12/1966 Corkerhill 11.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1967 11.59
73103 21/09/1955 Corkerhill 10/1965 Corkerhill 10.08 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1966 10.41
73104 27/09/1955 Corkerhill 10/1965 Corkerhill 10.08 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 02/1966 10.39
73105 12/1955 Eastfield 09/1966 Corkerhill 10.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1967 11.18
73106 12/1955 Eastfield 06/1965 Corkerhill 9.5 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 10/1965 9.84
73107 12/1955 Eastfield 09/1966 Motherwell 10.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 06/1967 11.51
73108 12/1955 Eastfield 12/1966 Carstairs 11 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1967 11.34
73109 01/1956 Eastfield 10/1964 Eastfield 8.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 02/1965 9.09
73110 10/1956 Nine Elms 01/1967 Guildford 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 10.67
73111 10/1956 Nine Elms 10/1965 Eastleigh 9 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1966 9.34
73112 10/1956 Nine Elms 06/1965 Nine Elms 8.67 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 11/1965 9.09
73113 10/1956 Nine Elms 01/1967 Bath Green Park (S&D) 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1967 10.59
73114 11/1956 Nine Elms 06/1966 Bath Green Park (S&D) 9.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1966 9.92
73115 11/1956 Nine Elms 03/1967 Guildford 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1967 11.01
73116 11/1956 Nine Elms 11/1964 Eastleigh 8 Cut Locomotive Works (Eastleigh) 02/1965 8.26
73117 11/1956 Nine Elms 03/1967 Guildford 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1967 10.75
73118 12/1956 Nine Elms 07/1967 Guildford 10.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 04/1968 11.34
73119 12/1956 Nine Elms 03/1967 Eastleigh 10.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1967 10.76
73120 01/1956 Perth South 12/1966 Corkerhill 10.92 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1967 11.25
73121 01/1956 Corkerhill 01/1966 Corkerhill 10 Cut P.W. McLellan (Langloan) 02/1966 10.09
73122 01/1956 Corkerhill 09/1965 Corkerhill 9.67 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1966 10.01
73123 02/1956 Corkerhill 05/1965 Corkerhill 9.25 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 07/1965 9.42
73124 02/1956 Corkerhill 12/1965 Corkerhill 9.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 03/1966 10.08
73125 07/1956 Shrewsbury 06/1968 Fleetwood 11.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1968 12.26
73126 07/1956 Shrewsbury 04/1968 Patricroft 11.75 Cut Drapers (Hull) 07/1968 12.01
73127 08/1956 Shrewsbury 11/1967 Fleetwood 11.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 11.55
73128 08/1956 Shrewsbury 05/1968 Patricroft 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1968 12.01
73129 08/1956 Shrewsbury 12/1967 Patricroft 11.33 Prs Preserved
73130 09/1956 Shrewsbury 01/1967 Fleetwood 10.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1967 10.42
73131 09/1956 Shrewsbury 30/01/1968 Fleetwood 11.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1968 11.67
73132 09/1956 Shrewsbury 03/1968 Fleetwood 11.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1968 11.84
73133 09/1956 Shrewsbury 06/1968 Fleetwood 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1968 12.09
73134 09/1956 Shrewsbury 06/1968 Fleetwood 11.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1968 12.09
73135 27/10/1956 Holyhead 03/1968 Fleetwood 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1968 11.89
73136 03/11/1956 Holyhead 03/1968 Fleetwood 11.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1968 11.62
73137 11/1956 Holyhead 06/1967 Fleetwood 10.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1968 11.17
73138 11/1956 Holyhead 04/1968 Patricroft 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1968 11.84
73139 11/1956 Holyhead 05/1967 Fleetwood 10.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1968 11.17
73140 11/1956 Leicester Midland 10/1967 Fleetwood 10.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 11.29
73141 12/1956 Leicester Midland 07/1967 Fleetwood 10.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 11.21
73142 12/1956 Leicester Midland 04/1968 Patricroft 11.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1968 11.76
73143 12/1956 Leicester Midland 06/1968 Fleetwood 11.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1968 11.93
73144 12/1956 Leicester Midland 08/1967 Fleetwood 10.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 11.21
73145 01/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 09/1966 Ayr 9.67 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 04/1967 10.25
73146 02/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 05/1967 Motherwell 10.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1967 10.75
73147 02/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 08/1965 St Rollox (Balornock) 8.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 11/1965 8.75
73148 03/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 09/1965 St Rollox (Balornock) 8.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1966 8.84
73149 03/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Fort William 9.75 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 10.09
73150 04/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Fort William 9.67 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 10.01
73151 04/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 08/1966 St Rollox (Balornock) 9.33 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 10/1966 9.51
73152 05/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1965 St Rollox (Balornock) 8.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 02/1966 8.76
73153 05/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Fort William 9.58 Cut Shipbreaking Industries (Faslane) 04/1967 9.92
73154 06/1957 St Rollox (Balornock) 12/1966 Motherwell 9.5 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 05/1967 9.92
73155 12/1956 Neasden 07/1967 Guildford 10.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 11.25
73156 12/1956 Neasden 11/1967 Bolton 10.92 Prs Preserved
73157 12/1956 Neasden 05/1968 Patricroft 11.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1968 11.67
73158 12/1956 Neasden 10/1967 Fleetwood 10.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 28/02/1968 11.21
73159 01/1957 Neasden 10/1967 Fleetwood 10.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1968 11.17
73160 01/1957 Gateshead 11/1967 Patricroft 10.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1968 11.17
73161 02/1957 Gateshead 12/1964 Exmouth Junction 7.83 Cut Buttigiegs (Newport) 04/1965 8.17
73162 02/1957 York (North) 05/1965 Oxford 8.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1965 8.50
73163 02/1957 York (North) 20/11/1965 Fleetwood 8.75 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 02/1966 9.01
73164 02/1957 York (North) 12/1964 Oxford 7.83 Cut J Friswell (Banbury) 04/1965 8.17
73165 02/1957 York (North) 09/1965 Fleetwood 8.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1966 9.08
73166 03/1957 York (North) 12/1965 Oxford 8.75 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1966 9.17
73167 04/1957 York (North) 08/1965 Kidderminster 8.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 10/1965 8.51
73168 04/1957 York (North) 12/1965 Eastleigh 8.67 Cut Birds (Bridgend) 04/1966 9.01
73169 04/1957 York (North) 10/1966 Eastleigh 9.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 06/1967 10.17
73170 04/1957 York (North) 06/1966 Eastleigh 9.17 Cut Cashmore's (Weymouth Goods yard) 01/1967 9.76
73171 05/1957 York (North) 10/1966 Eastleigh 9.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1967 9.84