Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 109 Today
» 1241 Yesterday
» 6955 Week
» 18502 Month
» 418184 Year
» 494771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BR Standard Riddles "Britannia" Class 4-6-2


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
70000 05/01/1951 Stratford 28/05/1966 Newton Heath 15.33 Prs Preserved
70001 14/02/1951 Stratford 03/09/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.58 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 12/1966 15.84
70002 06/03/1951 Stratford 14/01/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.83 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 16/05/1967 16.21
70003 01/03/1951 Stratford 25/03/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1967 16.72
70004 30/03/1951 Stratford 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.75 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 11/03/1968 16.96
70005 07/04/1951 Stratford 29/07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/01/1968 16.77
70006 12/04/1951 Stratford 20/05/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1967 16.52
70007 25/04/1951 Stratford 19/06/1965 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) 07/1965 14.23
70008 28/04/1951 Norwich Thorpe 14/01/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.75 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 16/05/1967 16.06
70009 04/05/1951 Norwich Thorpe 21/01/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.67 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 23/05/1967 16.06
70010 05/05/1951 Norwich Thorpe 23/09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 17/01/1968 16.72
70011 14/05/1951 Norwich Thorpe 23/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 07/03/1968 16.83
70012 21/05/1951 Norwich Thorpe 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 21/03/1968 16.85
70013 30/05/1951 Norwich Thorpe 17/08/1968 Barrow in Furness 17.25 Prs Preserved
70014 02/06/1951 Nine Elms 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.5 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 12/03/1968 16.79
70015 12/06/1951 Camden 05/08/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/1968 16.61
70016 18/06/1951 Holbeck (MR) 19/08/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.17 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/12/1967 16.47
70017 02/06/1951 Old Oak Common 01/10/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.33 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 01/1967 15.63
70018 25/06/1951 24/12/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.5 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 16/05/1967 15.90
70019 30/06/1951 Newton Abbot 12/03/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.75 Cut West of Scotland Shipbreaking (Troon) 06/1966 14.97
70020 31/07/1951 Old Oak Common 21/01/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.5 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 22/05/1967 15.82
70021 03/08/1951 Laira 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.33 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 26/04/1968 16.74
70022 16/08/1951 23/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.33 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 12/03/1968 16.58
70023 21/08/1951 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 26/04/1968 16.69
70024 06/10/1951 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.17 Cut T W Ward (Killamarsh) 25/04/1968 16.56
70025 13/09/1952 23/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15.25 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 01/1968 15.35
70026 07/10/1952 Cardiff Canton 14/01/1967 Stockport Edgeley 14.25 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 14/04/1967 14.53
70027 24/10/1952 Cardiff Canton 01/07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.75 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 16/11/1967 15.07
70028 27/10/1952 Cardiff Canton 16/09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 17/01/1968 15.23
70029 08/11/1952 Cardiff Canton 21/10/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 27/02/1968 15.31
70030 19/11/1952 Holyhead 25/06/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.58 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 13/10/1966 13.91
70031 29/11/1952 Holyhead 11/11/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 07/03/1968 15.28
70032 10/12/1952 Holyhead 09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.75 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/02/1968 15.15
70033 13/12/1952 Holyhead 15/07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.58 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 04/1968 15.35
70034 20/12/1952 Longsight 06/05/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/09/1967 14.74
70035 22/12/1952 Norwich Thorpe 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 15 Cut T W Ward (Inverkeithing) 11/03/1968 15.23
70036 23/12/1952 Stratford 15/10/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.83 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 01/1967 14.07
70037 24/12/1952 Stratford 05/11/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.92 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 01/02/1968 15.12
70038 29/01/1953 Stratford 12/08/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/1967 14.88
70039 09/02/1953 Norwich Thorpe 23/09/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 25/01/1968 14.97
70040 21/03/1953 Norwich Thorpe 15/04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 17/11/1967 14.67
70041 20/03/1953 Stratford 15/04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/09/1967 14.49
70042 09/04/1953 Stratford 13/05/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 14.08 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 10/1967 14.53
70043 04/06/1953 Longsight 07/08/1965 Crewe South 12.17 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 27/10/1965 12.41
70044 04/06/1953 Longsight 24/10/1966 Stockport Edgeley 13.33 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 20/02/1967 13.72
70045 14/06/1954 Holyhead 30/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.5 Cut T W Ward (Beighton) 27/02/1968 13.72
70046 22/06/1954 Holyhead 08/07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 11/1967 13.41
70047 25/06/1954 Holyhead 29/07/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.08 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 12/1967 13.48
70048 08/07/1954 Holyhead 06/05/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.83 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/09/1967 13.19
70049 28/07/1954 Holyhead 09/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.42 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 15/03/1968 13.64
70050 04/08/1954 Polmadie 06/08/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 12 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/1966 12.21
70051 11/08/1954 Polmadie 16/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 13.33 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 07/03/1968 13.58
70052 21/08/1954 Polmadie 01/04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.67 Cut Campbells (Airdrie) 10/1967 13.16
70053 03/09/1954 Polmadie 15/04/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.58 Cut J McWilliams (Shettleston) 12/09/1967 13.03
70054 13/09/1954 Polmadie 26/11/1966 Carlisle Kingmoor 12.17 Cut Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw) 16/05/1967 12.68