Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 102 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1024 Week
» 17222 Month
» 182122 Year
» 693224 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Johnson "3F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3723 43723 1901 03/09/1955 Toton 54.75
3191 43191 09/1888 22/05/1954 Derby 65.67 65.76
3192 43192 09/1888 22/08/1959 Stockport Edgeley 70.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1960 71.54
3193 43193 10/1888 22/03/1958 Westhouses 69.42 69.62
3200 43200 1890 29/04/1961 Derby 71.33
3203 43203 1890 01/10/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 70.83
3205 43205 1890 19/12/1959 Leicester Midland 70
3207 43207 1890 05/1960 Gorton 70.42
3208 43208 1890 09/08/1958 Canklow 68.67
3210 43210 1890 08/08/1959 Saltley 69.67
3212 43212 1890 09/07/1960 Heaton Mersey 70.58
3213 43213 1890 19/05/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 72.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963
3214 43214 1890 17/06/1961 Saltley 71.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961
3219 43219 1890 28/11/1959 Saltley 69.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1960
3222 43222 1890 27/06/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 69.5
3223 43223 1890 13/06/1959 Saltley 69.5
3224 43224 1890 11/1957 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 67.92
3225 43225 1890 29/04/1961 Canklow 71.33
3226 43226 1890 15/09/1956 Derby 66.75
3231 43231 1890 11/10/1958 Warrington Dallam 68.83
3232 43232 1890 03/09/1956 Leicester Midland 66.75
3233 43233 1890 11/1959 Royston 69.92
3234 43234 1890 04/02/1961 Canklow 71.17
3235 43235 1890 20/08/1960 Gorton 70.67
3237 43237 1890 30/05/1959 Warrington Dallam 69.42
3239 43239 1890 28/12/1957 Mansfield 68
3240 43240 1890 29/09/1962 Warrington Dallam 72.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1963
3241 43241 1890 20/06/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 69.5
3242 43242 1890 04/08/1962 Saltley 72.67
3243 43243 1890 30/07/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 70.58
3244 43244 1890 10/01/1959 Leicester Midland 69.08
3245 43245 1890 01/04/1961 Gorton 71.33
3246 43246 1890 27/10/1956 Saltley 66.83
3247 43247 1890 21/11/1959 Burton 69.92
3249 43249 1890 19/12/1959 Kettering 70
3250 43250 1890 13/05/1961 Rowsley 71.42
3251 43251 1890 19/12/1959 Toton 70
3252 43252 1890 18/06/1955 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 65.5
3253 43253 1890 02/05/1959 Saltley 69.42
3254 43254 1890 18/08/1962 Derby 72.67
3256 43256 1890 27/02/1960 Burton 70.17
3257 43257 1890 29/09/1962 Warrington Dallam 72.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963
3258 43258 12/1890 18/07/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 68.58 69.88
3259 43259 12/1890 16/02/1957 Derby 66.17 66.31
3261 43261 1891 08/12/1962 Gorton 72
3263 43263 1891 02/06/1962 Saltley 71.5
3265 43265 1891 29/05/1948 Cricklewood East 57.42
3266 43266 1891 18/03/1961 Westhouses 70.25
3267 43267 1891 22/04/1961 Royston 70.33
3268 43268 1891 17/06/1961 Buxton (LNWR) 70.5
3269 43269 1891 29/05/1948 Buxton (LNWR) 57.42
3271 43271 1891 19/12/1959 Lower Darwen 69
3273 43273 1891 22/10/1955 Rowsley 64.83
3274 43274 1891 10/01/1959 Buxton (LNWR) 68.08
3275 43275 1891 14/01/1956 Longsight 65.08
3277 43277 1891 15/07/1961 Leicester Midland 70.58
3278 43278 1891 19/12/1959 Buxton (LNWR) 69
3281 43281 1891 22/12/1956 Stockport Edgeley 66
3282 43282 1891 13/10/1962 Warrington Dallam 71.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963
3283 43283 1891 29/08/1953 Warrington Dallam 62.67
3284 43284 1891 03/06/1961 Saltley 70.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961
3286 43286 1891 14/09/1957 Burton 66.75
3287 43287 1891 19/12/1959 Kirkby in Ashfield 69
3290 43290 1891 28/12/1957 Rowsley 67
3292 43292 1891 03/1959 Derby 68.25
3293 43293 1891 05/12/1953 Lancaster Green Ayre 63
3294 43294 1891 14/11/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 68.92
3295 43295 1891 28/10/1961 Warrington Dallam 70.83
3296 43296 1891 13/03/1954 Buxton (LNWR) 63.25
3297 43297 1891 10/06/1950 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 59.5
3298 43298 1891 26/11/1955 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64.92
3299 43299 1891 14/08/1954 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 63.67
3300 43300 10/1891 13/12/1958 Buxton (LNWR) 67.17 68.42
3301 43301 10/1891 25/10/1958 Carlisle Kingmoor 67 67.71
3305 43305 12/1891 02/04/1960 Stockport Edgeley 68.33 68.55
3306 43306 12/1891 11/03/1961 Derby 69.25 69.55
3307 43307 12/1891 30/07/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 68.58 68.71
3308 43308 01/1892 17/10/1959 Warrington Dallam 67.75 68.79
3309 43309 01/1892 01/04/1961 Saltley 69.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1961 69.54
3310 43310 01/1892 10/12/1955 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 63.92 64.06
3312 43312 01/1892 18/01/1958 Derby 66 66.04
3313 43313 01/1892 14/04/1956 Bedford 64.25 64.35
3314 43314 28/02/1892 02/04/1960 Warrington Dallam 68.17 68.34
3315 43315 28/02/1892 22/08/1959 Derby 67.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1960 68.09
3317 43317 28/02/1892 15/10/1955 Westhouses 63.67 63.73
3318 43318 28/02/1892 22/08/1959 Derby 67.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 03/1960 68.09
3319 43319 28/02/1892 09/12/1950 Spital Bridge 58.83 58.99
3321 43321 03/1892 18/02/1961 Normanton 68.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1961 69.30
3323 43323 03/1892 06/1958 Rowsley 66.25 66.55
3324 43324 03/1892 04/04/1959 Derby 67.08 68.55
3325 43325 03/1892 18/02/1961 Watford 68.92 69.63
3326 43326 03/1892 30/07/1960 Leicester Midland 68.33 68.46
3327 43327 03/1892 19/12/1959 Burton 67.75 68.80
3329 43329 04/1892 04/06/1960 Buxton (LNWR) 68.17 68.29
3330 43330 04/1892 26/08/1961 Gorton 69.33 69.88
3331 43331 05/1892 03/12/1955 Westhouses 63.58 63.61
3332 43332 05/1892 10/05/1958 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 66 66.04
3333 43333 05/1892 21/01/1961 Coalville 68.67 68.86
3334 43334 05/1892 10/03/1956 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 63.83 63.90
3335 43335 05/1892 22/08/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 67.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1960 68.30
3336 43336 05/1892 23/08/1952 Saltley 60.25 60.33
3337 43337 06/1892 20/02/1960 Gloucester Barnwood 67.67 67.79
3338 43338 06/1892 27/03/1948 Rowsley 55.75
3339 43339 06/1892 22/08/1959 Saltley 67.17 68.21
3340 43340 1891 15/10/1960 Burton 69.83
3341 43341 1891 25/09/1957 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 66.75
3342 43342 1891 24/08/1963 Derby 72.67
3344 43344 1891 07/05/1960 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 69.42
3351 43351 1891 10/12/1955 Carlisle Kingmoor 65
3355 43355 1891 02/05/1959 Saltley 68.42
3356 43356 1891 19/07/1958 Yeovil Pen Mill 67.58
3357 43357 1891 02/1959 Stockport Edgeley 68.17
3359 43359 1891 20/08/1960 Saltley 69.67
3361 43361 1891 15/10/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 69.83
3364 43364 1891 26/12/1953 Derby 63
3367 43367 1891 04/01/1958 Kettering 67.08
3368 43368 1891 14/11/1961 Derby 70.92
3369 43369 1891 08/08/1959 Canklow 68.67
3370 43370 1892 21/11/1959 Rowsley 67.92
3371 43371 1892 26/08/1961 Canklow 69.67
3373 43373 1892 21/05/1960 Coalville 68.42
3374 43374 1892 24/06/1961 Gorton 69.5
3378 43378 1892 19/12/1959 Rhyl 68
3379 43379 1892 28/11/1959 Saltley 67.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1960
3381 43381 1892 27/06/1959 Saltley 67.5
3386 43386 1892 22/04/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 69.33
3387 43387 1892 19/12/1959 Warrington Dallam 68
3388 43388 1892 12/09/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 67.75
3389 43389 1892 04/08/1962 Saltley 70.67
3392 43392 1892 25/01/1958 Stourton 66.08
3394 43394 1892 09/07/1960 Woodford Halse 68.58
3395 43395 1892 11/03/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 69.25
3396 43396 1892 17/08/1957 Rhyl 65.67
3398 43398 1892 05/12/1959 Crewe South 68
3399 43399 1892 27/08/1960 Northampton 68.67
3400 43400 1893 10/03/1962 Gorton 69.25
3401 43401 1893 27/04/1957 Nottingham 64.33
3402 43402 1893 13/04/1957 Derby 64.33
3405 43405 1893 18/02/1961 Leicester Midland 68.17
3406 43406 1893 20/02/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 67.17
3408 43408 1893 08/04/1950 Stourton 57.33
3410 43410 1892 24/03/1962 Warrington Dallam 70.25
3411 43411 1892 27/05/1961 Leicester Midland 69.42
3419 43419 1892 06/09/1958 Yeovil Pen Mill 66.75
3427 43427 1892 01/07/1961 Yeovil Pen Mill 69.58
3428 43428 1892 08/12/1962 Coalville 71
3429 43429 1892 23/04/1960 Rowsley 68.33
3431 43431 1893 20/02/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 67.17
3433 43433 1893 05/12/1959 Saltley 67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1960
3435 43435 1893 21/04/1962 Saltley 69.33
3436 43436 1893 30/06/1962 Rose Grove 69.5
3439 43439 1893 19/06/1948 Bristol Barrow Road 55.5
3440 43440 1893 05/12/1959 Coalville 67
3441 43441 1893 29/11/1958 Saltley 65.92
3443 43443 1893 14/12/1957 Saltley 65
3444 43444 1893 22/11/1960 Bristol Barrow Road 67.92
3446 43446 1893 17/04/1962 Royston 69.33
3448 43448 1893 16/01/1954 Cricklewood East 61.08
3449 43449 1893 08/09/1962 Coalville 69.75
3453 43453 1893 02/03/1963 Coalville 70.25
3454 43454 1893 12/02/1955 Bedford 62.17
3456 43456 1893 23/04/1960 Stourton 67.33
3457 43457 1893 04/06/1960 Gorton 67.5
3458 43458 1893 04/1949 Nottingham 56.33
3459 43459 1893 08/04/1961 Derby 68.33
3462 43462 1894 07/04/1956 Bromsgrove 62.33
3463 43463 1894 09/02/1957 Canklow 63.17
3464 43464 1894 31/03/1962 Crewe South 68.25
3468 43468 1894 27/05/1961 Saltley 67.42 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961
3469 43469 1894 09/03/1957 Burton 63.25
3474 43474 1896 18/03/1961 Coalville 65.25
3476 43476 1896 18/05/1957 Royston 61.42
3482 43482 1896 01/04/1961 Saltley 65.33
3484 43484 1896 30/07/1960 Saltley 64.58
3490 43490 1896 19/12/1959 Saltley 64
3491 43491 1896 01/02/1958 Shrewsbury 62.17
3494 43494 1896 26/11/1955 Burton 59.92
3496 43496 1896 04/08/1962 Rowsley 66.67
3497 43497 1896 03/12/1955 Normanton 60
3499 43499 1896 04/08/1962 Gorton 66.67
3502 43502 1896 19/12/1959 Fleetwood 64
3506 43506 1897 02/05/1959 Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 62.42
3507 43507 1897 23/09/1961 Saltley 64.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1962
3509 43509 1897 12/03/1960 Normanton 63.25
3510 43510 1897 12/05/1962 Derby 65.42
3514 43514 1897 13/10/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 65.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963
3515 43515 1897 29/04/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 64.33
3520 43520 1897 05/12/1959 Coalville 63
3521 43521 1897 06/07/1963 Derby 66.58
3522 43522 1897 27/09/1958 Mansfield 61.75
3523 43523 1897 20/08/1960 Saltley 63.67
3524 43524 1897 05/11/1955 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 58.92
3529 43529 1897 26/08/1961 Saltley 64.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1962
3531 43531 1897 10/1959 Coalville 62.83
3538 43538 1897 05/12/1959 Buxton (LNWR) 63
3540 43540 1897 21/02/1953 Saltley 56.17
3544 43544 1897 03/12/1955 Saltley 59
3546 43546 1897 24/11/1956 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 59.92
3548 43548 1897 04/03/1961 Derby 64.25
3550 43550 1897 22/12/1956 Derby 60
3553 43553 1897 14/02/1959 Manningham 62.17
3558 43558 1897 22/08/1959 Heaton Mersey 62.67
3562 43562 1897 18/02/1961 Buxton (LNWR) 64.17
3565 43565 1897 23/06/1962 Coalville 65.5
3568 43568 1897 21/05/1955 Saltley 58.42
3570 43570 08/1899 04/06/1960 Derby 60.83 60.96
3572 43572 08/1899 26/11/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 61.25 61.71
3573 43573 08/1899 01/1948 48.42
3574 43574 08/1899 19/11/1960 Burton 61.25 61.87
3575 43575 09/1899 05/1958 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 58.67 59.04
3578 43578 09/1899 07/02/1959 Derby 59.42 61.46
3579 43579 09/1899 03/12/1960 Wakefield 61.25 61.31
3580 43580 10/1899 15/04/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 61.5 62.71
3581 43581 10/1899 09/07/1955 Shrewsbury 55.75 55.82
3582 43582 10/1899 05/05/1951 Burton 51.58 51.64
3583 43583 10/1899 04/08/1962 Saltley 62.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 63.62
3584 43584 10/1899 06/06/1959 Derby 59.67 60.79
3585 43585 10/1899 22/09/1962 Hellifield 62.92 63.15
3586 43586 10/1899 02/08/1962 Manningham 62.83 62.89
3587 43587 11/1899 17/10/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 59.92 60.87
3593 43593 01/1900 17/11/1962 Gloucester Barnwood 62.83 63.45
3594 43594 01/1900 29/10/1960 Saltley 60.75 61.03
3595 43595 01/1900 09/03/1957 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 57.17 57.24
3596 43596 01/1900 11/05/1957 Kirkby in Ashfield 57.33 57.53
3598 43598 01/1900 08/09/1956 Derby 56.67 56.70
3599 43599 02/1900 29/12/1962 Saltley 62.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1963 63.62
3600 43600 1899 07/05/1955 Shrewsbury 56.42
3604 43604 1899 05/12/1953 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 55
3605 43605 1899 24/09/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 62.75
3607 43607 1899 09/06/1956 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 57.5
3608 43608 1899 04/08/1962 Burton 63.67
3612 43612 1899 10/01/1959 Gorton 60.08
3615 43615 1899 13/10/1962 Warrington Dallam 63.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963
3618 43618 1899 24/03/1962 Rhyl 63.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1963
3619 43619 1899 29/08/1959 Warrington Dallam 60.67
3620 43620 1899 15/02/1964 Derby 65.17
3621 43621 1899 21/04/1962 Derby 63.33
3622 43622 1899 19/12/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 61
3623 43623 1899 22/08/1959 Burton 60.67
3624 43624 1899 13/05/1961 Gorton 62.42
3627 43627 1899 18/06/1960 Saltley 61.5
3629 43629 1899 11/04/1959 Leicester Midland 60.33
3630 43630 1900 19/05/1959 Gorton 59.42
3631 43631 1900 16/08/1958 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 58.67
3633 43633 1900 28/04/1956 Warrington Dallam 56.33
3634 43634 1900 02/11/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 60.92
3636 43636 1900 12/11/1955 Carlisle Kingmoor 55.92
3637 43637 1900 15/02/1964 Derby 64.17
3638 43638 1900 26/12/1959 Gorton 60
3639 43639 1900 20/08/1960 Saltley 60.67
3644 43644 1900 15/10/1960 Royston 60.83
3645 43645 1900 17/11/1962 Gloucester Barnwood 62.92
3650 43650 1900 22/10/1960 Trafford Park (LMS) 60.83
3651 43651 1900 25/07/1959 Warrington Dallam 59.58
3652 43652 1900 27/08/1960 Burton 60.67
3653 43653 1900 04/07/1953 Leicester Midland 53.58
3656 43656 1900 29/03/1958 Normanton 58.25
3657 43657 1900 13/10/1962 Warrington Dallam 62.83
3658 43658 1900 28/09/1963 Derby 63.75
3660 43660 1900 05/12/1959 Canklow 60
3661 43661 1900 27/11/1954 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 54.92
3662 43662 1900 08/08/1953 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 53.67
3664 43664 1900 12/03/1960 Canklow 60.25
3665 43665 1900 28/11/1959 Coalville 59.92
3667 43667 1900 03/04/1954 Bromsgrove 54.33
3668 43668 1900 04/08/1962 Saltley 62.67
3669 43669 1900 15/02/1964 Derby 64.17
3673 43673 04/1901 26/08/1961 Saltley 60.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1962 60.79
3674 43674 04/1901 22/08/1959 Saltley 58.33 59.38
3675 43675 04/1901 26/12/1959 Bournville 58.67 59.12
3676 43676 04/1901 15/10/1955 Leicester Midland 54.5 54.59
3678 43678 05/1901 05/12/1959 Carlisle Kingmoor 58.58 58.83
3679 43679 05/1901 27/01/1962 Derby 60.67 60.79
3680 43680 05/1901 04/08/1962 Saltley 61.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 62.04
3681 43681 05/1901 10/1961 Manningham 60.42 61.29
3682 43682 05/1901 25/08/1962 Yeovil Pen Mill 61.25 61.45
3683 43683 05/1901 06/11/1954 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 53.5 53.55
3684 43684 05/1901 25/05/1957 Saltley 56 56.29
3686 43686 05/1901 03/12/1955 Manningham 54.58 54.61
3687 43687 06/1901 04/08/1962 Saltley 61.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 61.96
3690 43690 1901 24/08/1957 Saltley 56.67
3693 43693 1901 26/12/1959 Saltley 59
3698 43698 1901 01/09/1956 Saltley 55.75
3705 43705 1901 03/12/1960 Wakefield 60
3709 43709 1901 04/08/1962 Burton 61.67
3710 43710 1901 15/03/1958 Leicester Midland 57.25
3711 43711 1901 05/12/1959 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 59
3712 43712 1901 10/01/1959 Bristol Barrow Road 58.08
3714 43714 1901 18/01/1962 Normanton 61.08
3715 43715 1901 15/02/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 60.17
3717 43717 1901 01/06/1957 Longsight 56.5
3721 43721 1901 17/03/1962 Gorton 61.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 06/1963
3724 43724 1901 13/12/1952 Rowsley 52
3727 43727 1901 04/07/1959 Derby 58.58
3728 43728 1901 05/12/1959 Leicester Midland 59 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1960
3729 43729 1901 27/04/1961 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 60.33
3731 43731 1901 03/07/1959 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 58.58
3734 43734 1901 22/09/1962 Rose Grove 61.75
3735 43735 1901 17/09/1960 Derby 59.75
3737 43737 1901 18/02/1961 Royston 60.17
3742 43742 1902 05/08/1958 Manningham 56.67
3745 43745 1902 11/1958 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 56.92
3747 43747 1902 10/11/1951 Canklow 49.92
3748 43748 1902 03/11/1956 Leicester Midland 54.92
3749 43749 1902 08/03/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 58.25
3751 43751 1901 26/08/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 60.67
3753 43753 1902 05/12/1959 Canklow 58
3754 43754 1902 17/11/1962 Gloucester Barnwood 60.92
3755 43755 1902 26/11/1955 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 53.92
3756 43756 1902 22/09/1962 Hellifield 60.75
3757 43757 1902 21/06/1958 Shrewsbury 56.5
3759 43759 1902 28/11/1959 Rowsley 57.92
3760 43760 1902 31/03/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 60.25
3762 43762 1902 25/03/1961 Bushbury 59.25
3763 43763 1902 10/03/1962 Gorton 60.25
3765 43765 01/1903 19/05/1951 Royston 48.33 48.45
3766 43766 01/1903 04/08/1962 Coalville 59.58 59.83
3767 43767 02/1903 03/10/1953 Toton 50.67 50.68
3769 43769 03/1903 12/06/1948 Hasland 45.25
3770 43770 03/1903 11/02/1956 Manningham 52.92 52.99
3771 43771 04/1903 02/1959 Saltley 55.83 57.88
3772 43772 04/1903 25/03/1950 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 46.92 47.01
3773 43773 05/1903 07/05/1960 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 57 57.13