Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 101 Today
» 922 Yesterday
» 1023 Week
» 17221 Month
» 182121 Year
» 693223 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Deeley "3F" Class 0-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3775 43775 07/1903 26/11/1955 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 52.33 52.42
3776 43776 08/1903 23/11/1957 Rowsley 54.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 12/1957 54.37
3777 43777 08/1903 08/09/1951 Bedford 48.08 48.19
3778 43778 09/1903 04/03/1961 Derby 57.5 57.60
3779 43779 09/1903 06/03/1954 Coalville 50.5 50.56
3781 43781 10/1903 26/11/1955 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 52.08 52.17
3782 43782 11/1903 30/01/1954 St Albans 50.17 50.28
3783 43783 11/1903 02/1949 Manningham 45.25
3784 43784 12/1903 17/09/1960 Manningham 56.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961 57.79
3785 43785 28/02/1904 21/11/1959 Rowsley 55.75 57.33
3786 43786 02/1904 26/10/1957 Northwich 53.67 53.87
3787 43787 03/1904 10/01/1959 Warrington Dallam 54.83 56.96
3789 43789 03/1904 09/06/1962 Gorton 58.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1963 59.62
3790 43790 04/1904 02/06/1956 Leicester Midland 52.17
3791 43791 04/1904 19/11/1955 Saltley 51.58 51.65
3792 43792 05/1904 25/04/1953 Bath Green Park (S&D) 48.92 50.04
3793 43793 05/1904 10/03/1962 Leicester Midland 57.83 59.12
3795 43795 06/1904 06/04/1957 Toton 52.83 53.04
3796 43796 06/1904 11/09/1948 Wellingborough 44.25
3797 43797 06/1904 13/06/1953 Wellingborough 49 49.05
3798 43798 07/1904 28/06/1958 Saltley 53.92 54.21
3799 43799 07/1904 26/12/1959 Leicester Midland 55.42 57.12
3800 43800 08/1904 04/02/1961 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 56.5 56.55
3801 43801 08/1904 29/09/1951 St Albans 47.08 47.21
3802 43802 08/1904 25/11/1950 Hasland 46.25 46.37
3803 43803 09/1904 10/09/1955 Saltley 51 51.06
3804 43804 09/1904 20/12/1952 Toton 48.25
3805 43805 01/1906 03/06/1950 Toton 44.42 44.45
3806 43806 01/1906 09/11/1957 Leicester Midland 51.83 51.87
3807 43807 01/1906 06/09/1952 Leicester Midland 46.67 46.79
3808 43808 02/1906 08/09/1962 Coalville 56.58 56.93
3809 43809 02/1906 22/04/1961 Gorton 55.17 55.28
3810 43810 02/1906 23/04/1955 Toton 49.17 49.25
3811 43811 12/1906 03/02/1951 Heaton Mersey 44.17 44.22
3812 43812 12/1906 17/06/1961 Saltley 54.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1961 54.79
3813 43813 01/1907 14/01/1950 Canklow 43 43.08
3814 43814 01/1907 15/10/1960 Canklow 53.75 53.87
3815 43815 01/1908 06/09/1958 Burton 50.67 51.45
3817 43817 28/02/1908 10/09/1955 Saltley 47.58 47.64
3818 43818 28/02/1908 13/05/1950 Toton 42.25 42.67
3819 43819 28/02/1908 20/02/1954 Toton 46 46.01
3820 43820 28/02/1908 28/06/1952 Toton 44.33 44.52
3821 43821 28/02/1908 10/04/1954 Toton 46.17 46.18
3822 43822 28/02/1908 11/08/1962 Buxton (LNWR) 54.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1963 55.41
3823 43823 28/02/1908 15/03/1958 Toton 50.08 50.16
3824 43824 03/1908 18/05/1951 Toton 43.17 43.55
3825 43825 03/1908 07/04/1962 Rowsley 54.08 54.20
3826 43826 03/1908 14/11/1961 Gorton 53.67 53.87
3827 43827 04/1908 16/12/1950 Toton 42.67 42.79
3828 43828 04/1908 16/01/1960 Staveley (Barrow Hill) 51.75 51.91
3829 43829 04/1908 14/11/1959 Coalville 51.58 52.45
3830 43830 04/1908 14/01/1950 Wellingborough 41.75 41.95
3831 43831 05/1908 08/05/1948 Toton 40
3832 43832 05/1908 14/11/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 53.5 53.71
3833 43833 05/1908 05/09/1953 Toton 45.33 55.38