Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Fowler "3P" Class 2-6-2T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1 40001 18/03/1930 21/01/1961 Heaton Mersey 30.83 31.02
2 40002 17/03/1930 07/11/1959 Bletchley 29.67 31.27
3 40003 21/03/1930 18/02/1961 Widnes 30.92 31.42
4 40004 24/03/1930 07/11/1959 Heaton Mersey 29.67 31.42
5 40005 28/03/1930 07/02/1959 Willesden 28.92 28.98
6 40006 01/04/1930 13/10/1962 Willesden 32.5 32.78
7 40007 08/04/1930 22/07/1961 Widnes 31.25 31.54
8 40008 12/04/1930 14/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 29.58 29.90
9 40009 23/04/1930 19/05/1962 Heaton Mersey 32.08 32.59
10 40010 01/05/1930 22/07/1961 Willesden 31.17 32.31
11 40011 07/05/1930 06/08/1960 Barrow in Furness 30.25 30.38
12 40012 13/05/1930 12/11/1960 Coalville 30.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 16/12/1960 30.62
13 40013 19/05/1930 12/12/1959 Newton Heath 29.58 29.84
14 40014 22/05/1930 07/05/1960 Newton Heath 30 30.09
15 40015 30/05/1930 04/03/1961 Newton Heath 30.83 31.48
16 40016 17/11/1930 08/07/1961 Barrow in Furness 30.67 30.93
17 40017 24/11/1930 07/11/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 29 30.91
18 40018 01/12/1930 22/07/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 30.58 31.56
19 40019 08/12/1930 05/12/1959 Kentish Town 29 29.45
20 40020 15/12/1930 08/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.58 32.19
21 40021 22/12/1930 12/09/1959 Kentish Town 28.75 29.67
22 40022 01/01/1931 15/12/1962 Cricklewood East 31.92 32.22
23 40023 12/01/1931 07/11/1959 Cricklewood East 28.83 29.36
24 40024 19/01/1931 03/03/1962 Kentish Town 31.17 31.34
25 40025 26/01/1931 05/12/1959 Kentish Town 28.92 29.11
26 40026 02/02/1931 01/12/1962 Kentish Town 31.83 32.23
27 40027 09/02/1931 07/11/1959 Kentish Town 28.75 29.28
28 40028 16/02/1931 03/12/1960 Kentish Town 29.83 30.85
29 40029 23/02/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.42 30.75
30 40030 02/03/1931 29/08/1959 Kentish Town 28.42 29.98
31 40031 09/03/1931 01/12/1962 Kentish Town 31.75 31.96
32 40032 16/03/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.33 30.69
33 40033 23/03/1931 23/09/1961 Kentish Town 30.5 30.67
34 40034 30/03/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.33 30.65
35 40035 08/04/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.25 30.63
36 40036 20/04/1931 04/06/1960 Cricklewood East 29.17 29.34
37 40037 27/04/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.25 30.58
38 40038 04/05/1931 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 30.17 30.64
39 40039 11/05/1931 05/12/1959 St Albans 28.58 28.95
40 40040 18/05/1931 12/12/1959 Kentish Town 28.58 28.93
41 40041 27/05/1931 01/10/1960 Barrow in Furness 29.42 29.49
42 40042 02/06/1931 22/07/1961 Willesden 30.08 31.06
43 40043 15/06/1931 21/11/1959 Willesden 28.42 28.94
44 40044 22/06/1931 21/11/1959 Willesden 28.42 28.92
45 40045 29/06/1931 21/11/1959 Willesden 28.42 28.90
46 40046 06/07/1931 07/11/1959 Willesden 28.33 28.88
47 40047 13/07/1931 07/11/1959 Willesden 28.33 28.53
48 40048 20/07/1931 14/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 28.33 29.26
49 40049 27/07/1931 22/07/1961 Willesden 30 31.18
50 40050 03/08/1931 03/06/1961 Mansfield 29.83 29.89
51 40051 10/08/1931 22/04/1961 Nuneaton 29.67 29.87
52 40052 14/08/1931 19/09/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 28.08 29.02
53 40053 09/1931 22/07/1961 Coalville 29.83 31.14
54 40054 14/09/1931 18/02/1961 Mansfield 29.42 30.44
55 40055 21/09/1931 07/11/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 28.17 29.92
56 40056 28/09/1931 21/11/1959 Trafford Park (LMS) 28.17 29.90
57 40057 05/10/1931 12/03/1960 Heaton Mersey 28.42 28.63
58 40058 12/10/1931 14/11/1959 Llandudno Junction 28.08 28.44
59 40059 19/10/1931 07/11/1959 Heaton Mersey 28.08 30.01
60 40060 06/11/1931 26/12/1959 Willesden 28.08 28.38
61 40061 21/09/1932 05/12/1959 Heaton Mersey 27.25 27.75
62 40062 27/09/1932 03/12/1960 Newton Heath 28.25 28.32
63 40063 10/1932 08/09/1962 Newton Heath 29.92 30.03
64 40064 05/10/1932 22/07/1961 Kentish Town 28.75 29.21
65 40065 11/10/1932 07/11/1959 Newton Heath 27.08 28.61
66 40066 19/10/1932 07/11/1959 Willesden 27.08 27.67
67 40067 25/10/1932 26/12/1959 Heaton Mersey 27.17 27.41
68 40068 02/11/1932 05/12/1959 Willesden 27.08 27.72
69 40069 09/11/1932 05/12/1959 Kentish Town 27.08 27.62
70 40070 16/11/1932 12/03/1960 Willesden 27.33 27.51