Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 70 Today
» 1139 Yesterday
» 2343 Week
» 22076 Month
» 319090 Year
» 395677 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "3P" Class 2-6-2T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
71 40071 15/02/1935 23/12/1961 Bangor 26.83 27.77
72 40072 15/02/1935 01/09/1962 Lower Darwen 27.58 28.26
73 40073 20/02/1935 18/08/1962 Mansfield 27.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 28.17
74 40074 25/02/1935 17/11/1961 Wakefield 26.75 26.82
75 40075 05/03/1935 08/07/1961 Normanton 26.33 26.63
76 40076 02/03/1935 20/10/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.58 26.89
77 40077 07/03/1935 08/07/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.33 26.63
78 40078 08/03/1935 01/12/1962 Bangor 27.75 27.87
79 40079 19/03/1935 21/10/1961 Mansfield 26.58 27.77
80 40080 18/03/1935 08/09/1962 Willesden 27.5 27.84
81 40081 27/03/1935 21/10/1961 Barrow in Furness 26.58 27.49
82 40082 25/03/1935 27/02/1962 Normanton 26.92 27.03
83 40083 27/03/1935 01/12/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 13/04/1963 28.07
84 40084 02/04/1935 21/11/1959 Longsight 24.58 26.22
85 40085 08/05/1935 07/07/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.04
86 40086 08/04/1935 24/11/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.12
87 40087 11/04/1935 24/11/1962 Nuneaton 27.58 28.36
88 40088 12/04/1935 21/07/1962 Mansfield 27.25 27.68
89 40089 17/04/1935 04/08/1962 Mansfield 27.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.10
90 40090 20/04/1935 21/07/1962 Southport 27.25 28.17
91 40091 09/05/1935 21/10/1961 Blackpool Central 26.42 27.71
92 40092 16/05/1935 20/05/1961 Leicester (G.C.) 26 26.18
93 40093 16/05/1935 27/01/1962 Llandudno Junction 26.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.02
94 40094 16/05/1935 07/10/1961 Mansfield 26.42 28.10
95 40095 22/05/1935 21/10/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.42 27.08
96 40096 23/05/1935 21/11/1959 Annesley 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1960 25.33
97 40097 25/05/1935 05/08/1961 Heaton Mersey 26.25 26.41
98 40098 29/05/1935 17/11/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.5 27.71
99 40099 30/05/1935 13/10/1962 Lower Darwen 27.42 27.98
100 40100 06/1935 18/08/1962 Kentish Town 27.17 27.71
101 40101 06/06/1935 21/10/1961 Birkenhead Mollington Street 26.33 26.79
102 40102 08/06/1935 21/10/1961 Birkenhead Mollington Street 26.33 26.79
103 40103 14/06/1935 21/10/1961 Blackpool Central 26.33 27.69
104 40104 20/06/1935 15/09/1962 Nuneaton 27.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 27.84
105 40105 25/06/1935 21/07/1962 Heaton Mersey 27.08 27.99
106 40106 27/06/1935 24/11/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.42 27.62
107 40107 29/06/1935 02/09/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.25 26.40
108 40108 03/07/1935 25/11/1961 Monument Lane 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1962 26.64
109 40109 06/07/1935 21/07/1962 Blackpool Central 27 27.88
110 40110 10/07/1935 05/05/1962 Willesden 26.83 26.95
111 40111 18/07/1935 20/10/1961 Kentish Town 26.25 27.68
112 40112 20/07/1935 19/11/1962 Copley Hill (Leeds) 27.33 28.18
113 40113 08/1935 21/07/1962 Heaton Mersey 26.92 27.85
114 40114 03/08/1935 19/11/1962 Copley Hill (Leeds) 27.25 27.80
115 40115 07/08/1935 21/10/1961 Mansfield 26.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.79
116 40116 14/08/1935 24/11/1962 Bangor 27.25 27.43
117 40117 14/08/1935 19/11/1962 Scarborough 27.25 28.44
118 40118 16/08/1935 19/08/1961 Barrow in Furness 26 26.18
119 40119 21/08/1935 18/08/1962 Cricklewood East 27 27.58
120 40120 23/08/1935 13/10/1962 Lower Darwen 27.17 27.75
121 40121 30/08/1935 21/10/1961 Birkenhead Mollington Street 26.17 26.56
122 40122 08/1935 23/06/1962 Llandudno Junction 26.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.77
123 40123 03/09/1935 21/10/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.08 26.88
124 40124 09/09/1935 02/09/1961 Mansfield 26 28.04
125 40125 07/09/1935 21/11/1959 Warrington Dallam 24.17 26.96
126 40126 11/09/1935 20/05/1961 Chester (MR) 25.67 25.78
127 40127 13/09/1935 21/11/1959 Upminster 24.17 26.02
128 40128 18/09/1935 21/07/1962 Llandudno Junction 26.83 27.18
129 40129 19/09/1935 21/10/1961 Monument Lane 26.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/09/1962 26.99
130 40130 21/09/1935 21/10/1961 Llandudno Junction 26.08 26.83
131 40131 26/09/1935 21/10/1961 Birkenhead Mollington Street 26.08 26.48
132 40132 28/09/1935 21/10/1961 Bangor 26.08 26.48
133 40133 03/10/1935 21/10/1961 Llandudno Junction 26 26.80
134 40134 04/10/1935 21/10/1961 Widnes 26 27.13
135 40135 08/10/1935 24/11/1962 Nuneaton 27.08 27.87
136 40136 10/10/1935 21/10/1961 Bangor 26 26.53
137 40137 15/10/1935 17/11/1962 Llandudno Junction 27.08 27.32
138 40138 17/10/1935 22/09/1962 Llandudno Junction 26.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.59
139 40139 19/10/1935 29/10/1959 Wakefield 24 24.17
140 40140 24/10/1935 04/11/1961 Holbeck (MR) 26.08 26.08
141 40141 30/10/1935 21/10/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 26 26.64
142 40142 01/11/1935 22/07/1961 Mansfield 25.67 26.31
143 40143 05/11/1935 21/10/1961 Widnes 25.92 27.30
144 40144 13/11/1935 23/12/1961 Willesden 26.08 26.87
145 40145 20/07/1937 22/09/1962 Southport 25.17 25.92
146 40146 04/08/1937 04/08/1962 Mansfield 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 25.71
147 40147 14/08/1937 19/11/1962 Wakefield 25.25 26.52
148 40148 20/08/1937 25/08/1962 Royston 25 26.59
149 40149 26/08/1937 28/10/1961 Toton 24.17 25.57
150 40150 02/09/1937 29/12/1962 Perth South 25.25 26.05
151 40151 09/09/1937 29/12/1962 Hurlford 25.25 26.28
152 40152 16/09/1937 08/01/1962 Dumfries 24.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1963 25.76
153 40153 22/09/1937 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 25.25 26.25
154 40154 24/09/1937 08/01/1962 Dawsholm 24.33 26.07
155 40155 10/1937 29/12/1962 Wakefield 25.17 23.76
156 40156 06/10/1937 28/10/1961 Mansfield 24 25.96
157 40157 09/10/1937 01/12/1962 Willesden 25.17 25.52
158 40158 14/10/1937 08/01/1962 Dawsholm 24.25 25.52
159 40159 21/10/1937 12/1962 Dawsholm 25.17 26.08
160 40160 28/10/1937 21/11/1959 Kentish Town 22.08 22.56
161 40161 04/11/1937 12/1960 Yeovil Pen Mill 23.08 23.22
162 40162 10/11/1937 28/10/1961 Lower Darwen 23.92 24.20
163 40163 16/11/1937 21/11/1959 Southport 22 25.18
164 40164 20/11/1937 13/10/1962 Lower Darwen 24.92 24.99
165 40165 25/11/1937 28/10/1961 Mansfield 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.48
166 40166 12/1937 28/10/1961 Blackpool Central 23.83 25.10
167 40167 07/12/1937 28/10/1961 Leicester (G.C.) 23.83 24.62
168 40168 10/12/1937 28/10/1961 Mansfield 23.83 26.12
169 40169 16/12/1937 23/10/1959 Wakefield 21.83 22.26
170 40170 18/12/1937 08/01/1962 Dumfries 24.08 24.93
171 40171 24/12/1937 20/05/1961 Chester (MR) 23.42 23.49
172 40172 12/1937 21/11/1959 Kentish Town 21.92 22.43
173 40173 05/01/1938 21/07/1962 Bangor 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.37
174 40174 08/01/1938 09/06/1962 Blackpool Central 24.42 24.95
175 40175 17/03/1938 28/10/1961 Mansfield 23.58 25.52
176 40176 24/03/1938 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 24.75 25.66
177 40177 04/1938 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 24.67 25.60
178 40178 08/04/1938 28/10/1961 Bolton 23.5 23.95
179 40179 14/04/1938 27/02/1962 Normanton 23.83 23.92
180 40180 22/04/1938 20/01/1962 Aston 23.75 23.91
181 40181 28/04/1938 30/03/1962 Normanton 23.92 25.73
182 40182 05/05/1938 28/10/1961 Mansfield 23.42 24.96
183 40183 12/05/1938 28/10/1961 Lower Darwen 23.42 24.19
184 40184 20/05/1938 28/10/1961 Mansfield 23.42 25.09
185 40185 18/10/1937 24/02/1962 Llandudno Junction 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 13/04/1963 25.50
186 40186 21/10/1937 29/12/1962 Motherwell 25.17 26.17
187 40187 26/10/1937 29/12/1962 Motherwell 25.17 25.99
188 40188 29/10/1937 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 25.17 26.06
189 40189 02/11/1937 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 25.08 26.05
190 40190 24/11/1937 19/11/1962 Darlington 25 26.24
191 40191 01/12/1937 22/09/1962 Southport 24.75 25.55
192 40192 09/12/1937 23/12/1961 Lower Darwen 24 24.87
193 40193 17/12/1937 25/08/1962 Royston 24.67 25.93
194 40194 20/12/1937 28/10/1961 Southport 23.83 25.09
195 40195 12/1937 25/11/1961 Southport 23.92 25.77
196 40196 03/01/1938 29/12/1962 Southport 24.92 25.19
197 40197 06/01/1938 21/07/1962 Southport 24.5 24.78
198 40198 10/01/1938 21/07/1962 Southport 24.5 25.44
199 40199 24/01/1938 28/10/1961 Southport 23.75 24.99
200 40200 27/01/1938 29/12/1962 Dawsholm 24.92 25.82
201 40201 03/02/1938 21/07/1962 Willesden 24.42 24.93
202 40202 14/02/1938 15/09/1962 Llandudno Junction 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.26
203 40203 21/02/1938 21/07/1962 Kentish Town 24.42 25.02
204 40204 03/03/1938 21/11/1959 Nuneaton 21.67 23.22
205 40205 09/03/1938 24/11/1962 Bangor 24.67 24.86
206 40206 18/03/1938 17/02/1962 Barrow in Furness 23.92 24.51
207 40207 21/04/1938 10/02/1962 Nuneaton 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1962 24.59
208 40208 22/04/1938 28/10/1961 Trafford Park (LMS) 23.5 24.58
209 40209 21/04/1938 28/10/1961 Birkenhead Mollington Street 23.5 24.08