Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 828 Today
» 1236 Yesterday
» 5799 Week
» 20376 Month
» 383621 Year
» 460208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1 15/08/1959
TOPS (Tops) 44001 27/02/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
SCAFELL PIKE 14/07/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 15/08/1959
Withdrawn 30/10/1976
Time in Service 17 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys
Cut Up 02/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) w/e 15/08/1959
17A Derby w/e 15/08/1959
1B Camden w/e 09/04/1960
9A Longsight w/e 21/05/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Withdrawn 30/10/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
15/08/1959 To Service To service as D1
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - New erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/03/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Test house.   Link
06/04/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Test house. SLS 7/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
27/02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44001    
30/10/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 44001    
02/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev