Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 302 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3764 Week
» 23497 Month
» 320511 Year
» 397098 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D10 20/02/1960
TOPS (Tops) 44010 26/02/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
TRYFAN 20/02/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 44
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Derby Works
To Service 20/02/1960
Withdrawn 12/05/1977
Time in Service 17 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 07/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Derby)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) 20/02/1960
17A Derby w/e 26/03/1960
1B Camden w/e 23/04/1960
5A Crewe North w/e 30/04/1960
18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962
D16 Nottingham Division 16/01/1965
   Stored 2w/e 07/02/1976
TO Toton 4w/e 17/04/1976
   Withdrawn 12/05/1977


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
20/02/1960 To Service To service as D10, name: TRYFAN
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop.   Link
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
26/02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 44010    
07/02/1976 Allocation      
07/02/1976 To Store To Store    
17/04/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
12/05/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 44010    
07/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby    

prev