Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1628 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15034 Week
» 68050 Month
» 187577 Year
» 3214430 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1000 |
29/12/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
29/12/1961 to Laira (83D) |
Withdrawn |
11/02/1974 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
12 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,240,000 miles |
Cut Up |
07/1974 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
DSNP |
Desert Sand bodywork over whole body. Red buffer beam. |
20/12/1961 |
DSP |
Desert Sand bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
05/11/1962 |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
08/10/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/06/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/03/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
29/03/1972 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
29/03/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/12/1961 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Desert Sand bodywork over whole body. Red buffer beam. |
|
|
29/12/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1000, name: WESTERN ENTERPRISE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/11/1962 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Desert Sand bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/10/1964 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
02/06/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
05/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
29/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
11/02/1974 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1000 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
07/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|