Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4414 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20026 Week
» 118671 Month
» 321335 Year
» 3348188 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
10001 |
10/07/1948 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D16/1 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
10/07/1948 to Camden (1B) |
Withdrawn |
12/03/1966 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys |
Total Mileage |
1,101,700 miles |
Cut Up |
m/e 02/1968 |
Cut At |
Cox and Danks (North Acton) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 10001 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
19/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10001 |
|
|
02/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: North Acton |
|
|