Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1005 18/06/1962

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN VENTURER 18/06/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/06/1962
Withdrawn 16/11/1976 off Laira (84A)
Time in Service 14 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys
Total Mileage 1,392,000 miles
Cut Up 17/06/1977
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Maroon bodywork including front of cab. 18/06/1962
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 18/01/1963
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 24/07/1967

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 18/06/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 03/11/1962
84A Laira 6w/e 13/04/1964
87E Landore 9w/e 18/03/1968
84A Laira 5w/e 15/03/1969
   Withdrawn 16/11/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
09/1972   Dual AWS Fitted  
09/1972   Dual Braked  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/12/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
18/06/1962 To Service To service as D1005, name: WESTERN VENTURER
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork including front of cab.
   
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
15/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
09/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
09/1972 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
16/11/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as D1005 from Laira (LA)    
17/06/1977 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev