Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 584 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 4132 Week
» 5022 Month
» 313003 Year
» 1197384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1008 04/09/1962

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN HARRIER 04/09/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Swindon Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 04/09/1962
Withdrawn 21/10/1974 off Laira (84A)
Time in Service 12 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys
Total Mileage 1,136,000 miles
Cut Up 10/10/1975
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Maroon bodywork including front of cab. 04/09/1962
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 22/01/1963
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front 19/03/1968
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 13/10/1970

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 04/09/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/10/1962
86A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 25/01/1964
87E Landore 2w/e 07/03/1965
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 20/02/1966
84A Laira 5w/e 01/05/1966
87E Landore 9w/e 18/03/1968
84A Laira 9w/e 25/01/1969
   Withdrawn 21/10/1974

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
13/10/1970   Dual Braked  
13/10/1970   Dual AWS Fitted  

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
04/09/1962 Power Unit 655201 'A' end 11/07/1963 Water in No. 5 cylinder
04/09/1962 Power Unit 655199 'B' end 22/01/1963 No. 7 con rod through crankcase
22/01/1963 Power Unit 655321 'B' end 22/03/1965 Routine Overhaul
11/07/1963 Power Unit 655166 'A' end 13/01/1964 Various
13/01/1964 Power Unit 655188 'A' end 12/11/1965 Routine overhaul
22/03/1965 Power Unit 655313 'B' end 30/11/1966 Low oil pressure
12/11/1965 Power Unit 655312 'A' end 10/01/1967 Ten cylinder heads fractured
30/11/1966 Power Unit 655211 'B' end 08/03/1967 Routine overhaul
10/01/1967 Power Unit 655189 'A' end 05/05/1967 Low oil pressure
08/03/1967 Power Unit 655228 'B' end 06/11/1967 Fracture in crankcase below No. 3 cylinder
05/05/1967 Power Unit 655274 'A' end 26/11/1968 Severe knock at drive end
06/11/1967 Power Unit 655269 'B' end 13/10/1970 Various
26/11/1968 Power Unit 655313 'A' end 09/05/1970 No. 5 liner fractured
09/05/1970 Power Unit 655322 'A' end 13/10/1970 Various
13/10/1970 Power Unit 655270 'A' end 21/07/1971 No. 7 cyclinder head studs
13/10/1970 Power Unit 655322 'B' end 08/06/1971 No. 9 liner fractured
08/06/1971 Power Unit 655189 'B' end 13/08/1971 Out for availability reasons
21/07/1971 Power Unit 655168 'A' end 13/08/1971 Out for availability reasons
13/08/1971 Power Unit 655194 'A' end 24/02/1972 Governor drive gear damaged
13/08/1971 Power Unit 655177 'B' end 25/11/1971 Con rod through crankcase
25/11/1971 Power Unit 655216 'B' end 07/10/1973 No. 2 liner seal leaking
24/02/1972 Power Unit 655312 'A' end 03/03/1972 Low oil pressure
03/03/1972 Power Unit 655176 'A' end 27/05/1974 No. 10 liner fractured
07/10/1973 Power Unit 655397 'B' end 04/12/1973 No. 7 con rod fractured
04/12/1973 Power Unit 655302 'B' end 11/09/1974 Engine removed, no replacement fitted
27/05/1974 Power Unit 655269 'A' end 10/09/1974 Engine removed, no replacement fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Cost Mileage
Swindon Works 25/06/1970 13/10/1970 111 days Unclassified  

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/12/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
04/09/1962 To Service To service as D1008, name: WESTERN HARRIER
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (83D)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork including front of cab.
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
22/01/1963 Livery Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel    
22/01/1963 Components Power Unit 655199 removed: No. 7 con rod through crankcase. Replaced with 655321 ('B' end)    
11/07/1963 Components Power Unit 655201 removed: Water in No. 5 cylinder. Replaced with 655166 ('A' end)    
13/01/1964 Components Power Unit 655166 removed: Various. Replaced with 655188 ('A' end)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
22/03/1965 Components Power Unit 655321 removed: Routine Overhaul. Replaced with 655313 ('B' end)    
12/11/1965 Components Power Unit 655188 removed: Routine overhaul. Replaced with 655312 ('A' end)    
20/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
30/11/1966 Components Power Unit 655313 removed: Low oil pressure. Replaced with 655211 ('B' end)    
10/01/1967 Components Power Unit 655312 removed: Ten cylinder heads fractured. Replaced with 655189 ('A' end)    
08/03/1967 Components Power Unit 655211 removed: Routine overhaul. Replaced with 655228 ('B' end)    
05/05/1967 Components Power Unit 655189 removed: Low oil pressure. Replaced with 655274 ('A' end)    
06/11/1967 Components Power Unit 655228 removed: Fracture in crankcase below No. 3 cylinder. Replaced with 655269 ('B' end)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
19/03/1968 Livery Change of livery to Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front    
26/11/1968 Components Power Unit 655274 removed: Severe knock at drive end. Replaced with 655313 ('A' end)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
09/05/1970 Components Power Unit 655313 removed: No. 5 liner fractured. Replaced with 655322 ('A' end)    
25/06/1970 13/10/1970 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/06/1970. Dep: 13/10/1970.
Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front
Modification: Air Brakes fitted
Modification: Dual AWS Fitted
   
08/06/1971 Components Power Unit 655322 removed: No. 9 liner fractured. Replaced with 655189 ('B' end)    
21/07/1971 Components Power Unit 655270 removed: No. 7 cyclinder head studs. Replaced with 655168 ('A' end)    
13/08/1971 Components Power Unit 655168 removed: Out for availability reasons. Replaced with 655194 ('A' end)    
13/08/1971 Components Power Unit 655189 removed: Out for availability reasons. Replaced with 655177 ('B' end)    
25/11/1971 Components Power Unit 655177 removed: Con rod through crankcase. Replaced with 655216 ('B' end)    
24/02/1972 Components Power Unit 655194 removed: Governor drive gear damaged. Replaced with 655312 ('A' end)    
03/03/1972 Components Power Unit 655312 removed: Low oil pressure. Replaced with 655176 ('A' end)    
07/10/1973 Components Power Unit 655216 removed: No. 2 liner seal leaking. Replaced with 655397 ('B' end)    
04/12/1973 Components Power Unit 655397 removed: No. 7 con rod fractured. Replaced with 655302 ('B' end)    
27/05/1974 Components Power Unit 655176 removed: No. 10 liner fractured. Replaced with 655269 ('A' end)    
21/10/1974 Withdrawn Condemned as D1008 from Laira (LA)    
10/10/1975 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev