Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 405 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6768 Week
» 9350 Month
» 273983 Year
» 1495548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1009 24/09/1962  

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN INVADER 24/09/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Swindon Works
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 3
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
To Service 24/09/1962
Withdrawn 10/11/1976 off Laira (84A)
Time in Service 14 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys
Total Mileage 1,376,000 miles
Cut Up 30/11/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
MNP: Maroon bodywork including front of cab. 24/09/1962
MSYP: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 02/07/1963
BFYE: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 23/03/1970

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 24/09/1962
84A Laira 4w/e 22/02/1964
87E Landore 9w/e 18/03/1968
84A Laira 9w/e 25/01/1969
87E Landore 9w/e 04/04/1970
84A Laira 9w/e 16/10/1971
   Withdrawn 10/11/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
31/03/1970   Dual Braked      
31/03/1970   Dual AWS Fitted      


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/12/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - body shell. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
24/09/1962 To Service To service as D1009, name: WESTERN INVADER
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork including front of cab.
   
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
31/03/1970 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Fitted    
31/03/1970 Modification Modification: Dual Braked    
04/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
28/09/1975 Sightings On Old Oak Common depot - Stabled by turntable.    
10/11/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as D1009 from Laira (LA)    
30/11/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev