20/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D101 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
10/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
06/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
03/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
17/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
27/06/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45061 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
16/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45061 from Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|