Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 587 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 587 Week
» 19913 Month
» 246674 Year
» 757776 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1013 13/12/1962

Names Carried
Name Date From
WESTERN RANGER 13/12/1962

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 13/12/1962
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 16/08/1968

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 13/12/1962
Withdrawn 28/02/1977 off Laira (LA)
Time in Service 14 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys
Total Mileage 1,320,000 miles
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
88A Cardiff Canton (New) 13/12/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/04/1963
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/05/1963
87E Landore 2w/e 07/03/1965
86A Cardiff Canton 5w/e 20/02/1966
84A Laira 5w/e 01/05/1966
87E Landore 10w/e 01/06/1968
84A Laira 9w/e 16/10/1971
   Withdrawn 28/02/1977

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
03/12/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - under construction - frames laid. SLS 1/1962 Link
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
13/12/1962 To Service To service as D1013, name: WESTERN RANGER
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel
   
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
07/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
20/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
09/01/1972 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In "A" shop RO 3/1972 Link
28/02/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as D1013 from Laira (LA)    

prev prev