Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3991 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13565 Week
» 78519 Month
» 281183 Year
» 3308036 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D102 |
18/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/1) |
45140 |
30/10/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
18/05/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
29/03/1988 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys |
Cut Up |
22/11/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 10/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/05/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/08/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
03/01/1963 |
Severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
St.Pancras-Manchester. Piston failure. |
Kettering |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D102 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/10/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45140 |
|
|
29/03/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45140 |
|
|
22/11/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|