Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 5920 Week
» 17467 Month
» 417149 Year
» 493736 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (Pre 1955) 10202 15/09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D16/2
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 15/09/1951
Withdrawn 07/12/1963
Time in Service 12 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys
Total Mileage 728,647 miles
Cut Up 05/1968
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Information Stored on 11th November, 1962
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 15/09/1951
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1952
1B Camden 4w/e 23/04/1955
1A Willesden w/e 21/11/1959
   Stored 11/11/1962
   Withdrawn 07/12/1963


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/09/1951 To Service To service as 10202
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
21/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
15/12/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. SLS 1/1962 Link
11/11/1962 To Store To Store    
07/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 10202    
05/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev