Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1436 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19239 Week
» 72255 Month
» 191782 Year
» 3218635 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1024 |
01/10/1963 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
52 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Spanner Mk 3 | AWS | Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
To Service |
01/10/1963 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
18/11/1973 off Laira (84A) |
Time in Service |
10 yrs, 1 mth , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
984,000 miles |
Cut Up |
14/08/1974 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
MSYP |
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
01/10/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
20/04/1967 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
22/08/1969 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/10/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
22/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
Dual AWS/ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/10/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1024, name: WESTERN HUNTSMAN Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel |
|
|
22/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
20/04/1967 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
22/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
18/11/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1024 from Laira (84A) |
|
|
14/08/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|