Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 132 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4947 Week
» 11081 Month
» 238965 Year
» 1460530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1024 on 09/01/1947

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/01/1947 COUNTY OF PEMBROKE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class County
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 358
To Service Tue 09/01/1947
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 09/01/1947
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/11/1950
83D Laira 4w/e 31/03/1951
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/10/1952
84K Chester West 4w/e 01/11/1952
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
82C Swindon 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW SRD Stafford Road m/e 31/01/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 83D Laira m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 82C Swindon 5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
12/11/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. SLS/196201
27/01/1963 Wolverhampton Works (In Works) In Works: 1013/24, 1656/64, 2855, 3628(86G), 3788, 4136, 5244(86B), 6357(87C), 6692, 6975(87A), 7213, 7443, 7824, 8405/37/64, 8720, 9612/69, 9724. In Yard: 2257, 6915/6(89A), 9768. SLS/196302
24/03/1963 Wolverhampton Works (Works) Works: 1020 (82B), 1024 (82A), 2879 (82C), 4130/7, 4158 (84E), 4278, 4671, 5070 (81A), 5215, 5606, 6114 (86E), 6134, 6347 (87F), 6424, 6667, 6833/71, 6911, 7000 (85B), 8446 (88C), 9619, 9782. Yard: 1424 (85B), 6900 (82C), 6910. SLS/196304
15/05/1963 Derby Works (Works) Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 41535, 42098 cut up, 44466, 44521, 47003, 73021/86, 75064, D102, D2236, D2396, D2509, D2911, D3023, ED6/7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D63, D88, D110, D5019, D5074; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5198, D5210-23new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D43, D85, D89, D95, D103/9/26/8, D140/9, D152/4, D5091. Test House: D71, D83, D124, D5002/86, D5145, D5205/6/7. Finishing Shop: D94, D119, D5208/9. Paint Shop: D5203/4. Yard (by Paint Shop): 42117 cut up, D4, D6, D7, D77, D127, D5010/93, D5200. Foundry Siding: 42100, 42429/72, 42500, 43599, 73001/67, 75012. Stone Pit: 42333, 42636 (badly damaged after falling into t.t. pit at Derby, 24th April), 44252, 47460. Stored Outside Offices: 10000/201/2/3. Waiting Works: 73032. SLS/196304
11/01/1964 Worcester Works 1024 (82C), 2232 (85A), 6954 (82B), 6981 (82B), 9490 (85A), 44691 (2E), D2123 (85A). In store awaiting scrap: 3207, 5022, 5205, 6807, 6948, 7000/31, W20, W23 an W26. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/01/1947 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 1024, name: COUNTY OF PEMBROKE
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1024    

prev prev