30/09/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730. New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764. Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates. No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates |
SLS/194811 |
31/07/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949. Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters. |
SLS/194909 |
10/08/1949 |
Swindon Stock Shed |
The Stock Shed contained Nos. 1025, 2462, 2948, 4121/68/69, 5153/62, 5411/17, 5563, 5761, 6129/66, 7209. Amongst various engines 'on shed' were Nos. 1503, (marked PDN), 2568 (ex Works), 3820 (ex 4856-oil-burning), 9008/11. |
SLS/194909 |
31/08/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. |
SLS/194910 |
19/02/1961 |
Swindon Works (Works Yard) |
Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. |
SLS/196104 |
30/12/1962 |
Western Regionboundary changes |
The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. |
SLS/196303 |