Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.



Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 307 Today
» 1144 Yesterday
» 2610 Week
» 24119 Month
» 93842 Year
» 604944 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)


In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1041 10/10/1962

Names Carried
Name Date From

Liveries Carried
Colour Date From
Maroon bodywork including front of cab. 10/10/1962
Maroon bodywork, small yellow warning panel 06/05/1963
Maroon bodywork, full yellow cab front 21/05/1968
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front 13/10/1969

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 52
Wheels C-C
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 10/10/1962
Withdrawn 23/02/1977 off Laira (LA)
Time in Service 14 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys
Total Mileage 1,384,000 miles
Status Preserved

Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) 10/10/1962
88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/04/1963
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/09/1963
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 25/01/1964
87E Landore 10w/e 01/06/1968
84A Laira 9w/e 09/11/1968
   Withdrawn 23/02/1977

Current Status Unknown

Start End Event Details Source See Also
10/10/1962 To Service To service as D1041, name: WESTERN PRINCE
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
Livery applied: Maroon bodywork including front of cab.
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965 Link
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
09/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (84A)    
23/02/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as D1041 from Laira (LA)    

prev prev