Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 31 Online
» 427 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2873 Week
» 14578 Month
» 346067 Year
» 422654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6100   19/06/1930
BR 46100   06/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/06/1930 THE KING'S DRAGOON GUARDSMAN
12/1933 ROYAL SCOT

Locomotive Specifics
Class Royal Scot (Scot)
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 19/06/1930
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Service Life 32 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys
Information Originally 6152, this loco swapped places with the original 6100 and retained the fake identity throughout it's career and in to preservation.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 22/06/1946
1B Camden 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16A Nottingham w/e 07/11/1959
17A Derby w/e 17/06/1961
16A Nottingham w/e 12/08/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 16A Nottingham 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 02/09/1961
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/06/1930 To Service To service as LMS Number 6100, name: THE KING'S DRAGOON GUARDSMAN
Built at Derby Works
   
12/1933 Naming Renamed 'ROYAL SCOT'    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Camden (1B)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46100    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
12/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 46100    

prev