Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 405 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2851 Week
» 14556 Month
» 346045 Year
» 422632 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6115   09/10/1927
BR 46115   01/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/10/1927 SCOTS GUARDSMAN

Locomotive Specifics
Class Royal Scot (Scot)
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service Sat 09/10/1927
Withdrawal Sat 01/01/1966
Service Life 38 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A Crewe North w/e 10/09/1960
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 06/05/1961
9A Longsight w/e 15/07/1961
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/06/1964
12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/07/1964
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 07/11/1964
   Withdrawn 01/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 9A Longsight 5w/e 05/08/1961
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 01/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/10/1927 To Service To service as LMS Number 6115, name: SCOTS GUARDSMAN
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 46115    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
06/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
01/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46115    

prev prev