Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 772 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 17924 Month
» 417606 Year
» 494193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 6229   09/1938
BR 46229   07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1938 DUCHESS OF HAMILTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class Coronation (Semi)
Company History LMS
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1938
Withdrawal During 02/1964
Service Life 25 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
5A Crewe North 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
1B Camden 4w/e 12/07/1952
5A Crewe North w/e 01/10/1960
8A Edge Hill w/e 11/04/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 1B Camden 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 01/04/1961
WDN   w/e 15/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1938 To Service To service as LMS Number 6229, name: DUCHESS OF HAMILTON
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 46229    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
01/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 46229    

prev prev